Benton v. Auto Approval, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 8:18-cv-02646

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 21, 2019 at 7:04 PM DT (1.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER denying 8 Motion to Dismiss; granting 8 Motion to Compel Arbitration, and staying case pending arbitration. The Clerk is directed to administratively close this case in accord with the attached order. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/12/2018. (CCB)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Notice of pendency of related cases
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Related case order and track 2 notice
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 0 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?