IN RE: DIISOCYANATES ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Federal Court Proceeding Pennsylvania Western District Court, Case No. 2:18-mc-01001

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 21, 2021 at 10:31 PM DT (1.3 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY William Christopher Carmody +1 212 336 8334 +1 212 336 8340 bcarmody@susmangodfrey.com
No Logo ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian Barnes +1 202 220 9600 bbarnes@cooperkirk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Charles J. Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ccooper@cooperkirk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael William Kirk +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 mkirk@cooperkirk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Harold Smith Reeves +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 393 5719 hreeves@cooperkirk.com
No Logo EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bart D. Cohen +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 bcohen@bm.net
No Logo ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Boni and Zack LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael J. Boni +1 610 822 0200 +1 610 822 0206 mboni@bonizack.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Patrick E Cafferty +1 734 769 2144 pcafferty@caffertyclobes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cafferty Faucher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ellen Meriwether emeriwether@caffertyfaucher.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlson Lynch Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Edwin John Kilpela, Jr. +1 412 322 9243 +1 412 231 0246 ekilpela@carlsonlynch.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY GARY F. LYNCH +1 412 749 1677 +1 412 749 1686 glynch@carlsonlynch.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sharon K. Robertson +1 212 758 3042 +1 212 838 7745 srobertson@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jessica B. Weiner +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jweiner@cohenmilstein.com
No Logo FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Frohsin & Barger LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James Fredrick Barger, Jr. +1 205 933 4006 +1 205 933 4008 jim@frohsinbarger.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY J Elliott Walthall +1 205 933 4006 +1 205 933 4008 elliott@frohsinbarger.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pittman Dutton Kirby & Hellums, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Cory Bradley +1 205 322 8880 +1 205 328 2811 pdh-efiling@pittmandutton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jonathan S. Mann +1 205 322 8880 +1 205 328 2711 jonm@pittmandutton.com
No Logo ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Steve W. Berman +1 206 623 7292 +1 206 623 0594 steve@hbsslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Anthony D. Shapiro - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 206 623 7292 +1 206 623 0594 tony@hbsslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ronnie Seidel Spiegel +1 206 623 7292 ronnie@hbsslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jason Allen Zweig +1 212 687 1980 +1 212 687 7714 jzweig@kaplanfox.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY E. Powell Miller +1 248 841 2200 epm@millershea.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Miller Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sharon S Almonrode +1 248 841 2200 ssa@millerlawpc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvin B. Hollowell +1 248 841 2200 mbh@millerlawpc.com
No Logo NPC COATING, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Finkelstein & Partners, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew G Finkelstein +1 800 634 1212 +1 800 562 3492 afinkelstein@lawampm.com
No Logo Rhino Linings Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jason Louis Lichtman +1 212 355 9500 jlichtman@lchb.com
No Logo Tri-iso Tryline LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McKool Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven N. Williams +1 214 978 4000
No Logo UNICAST, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Grabar Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joshua H. Grabar +1 215 840 7112 +1 215 357 0269 jgrabar@grabarlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hoffman & Edelson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY MARC H. EDELSON +1 215 230 8043 +1 215 230 8735 medelson@edelson-law.com
No Logo UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Minto Law Group, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David B. Spear +1 412 201 5525 +1 412 201 5526 dspear@mintolaw.com
v.
No Logo BASF AG, Defendant
BASF Corporation BASF Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "BASF CORP."

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Debra Lee Bogo-Ernst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Marovitz +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 701 7711 amarovitz@mayerbrown.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Britt M. Miller - NOT SWORN +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 706 8763 bmiller@mayerbrown.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Richard Edward Nowak +1 312 701 8809 rnowak@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MAYER, BROWN & PLATT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Richard A. Spehr +1 212 506 2500

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP (IL-NA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas Lee Allen +1 412 288 3066 +1 412 288 3063 tallen@reedsmith.com
No Logo BASF SE, Defendant
No Logo BAYER A.G., Defendant
Bayer Corporation Bayer Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "BAYER CORP."

Toggle Switch Represented by Eckert, Seamans, Cherin & Mellott LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Albert G. Bixler +1 215 851 8412 abixler@eckertseamans.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Leslie A Hayes +1 215 851 8400 +1 215 851 8383 lhayes@eckertseamans.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Debra Lee Bogo-Ernst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Marovitz +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 701 7711 amarovitz@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John Terzaken +1 202 636 5858 +1 202 636 5502 john.terzaken@stblaw.com
Bayer Materialscience LLC Bayer Materialscience LLC, Defendant
No Logo COVESTRO AG, Defendant
No Logo Covestro Llc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Eckert, Seamans, Cherin & Mellott LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Albert G. Bixler +1 215 851 8412 abixler@eckertseamans.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Leslie A Hayes +1 215 851 8400 +1 215 851 8383 lhayes@eckertseamans.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Debra Lee Bogo-Ernst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Marovitz +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 701 7711 amarovitz@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John Terzaken +1 202 636 5858 +1 202 636 5502 john.terzaken@stblaw.com
No Logo DOW CHEMICAL CO., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Debra Lee Bogo-Ernst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Marovitz +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 701 7711 amarovitz@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of WILLIAM B WAHLHEIM , JR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Carl Stanley Burkhalter +1 205 254 1000 +1 205 254 1999 cburkhalter@maynardcooper.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Evan Patrick Moltz +1 205 254 1873 emoltz@maynardcooper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Wendy West Feinstein +1 412 560 7455 +1 412 560 7001 wendy.feinstein@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY WILLIAM T MCENROE +1 215 963 5265 william.mcenroe@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY DAVID BERNICK +1 212 373 3405
No Logo DOWDUPONT INC, Defendant
No Logo Huntsman Corp, Defendant
Officer/Director, Venator Materials PLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John E. Schmidtlein +1 202 434 5000 +1 202 434 5029 jschmidtlein@wc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Zachary K. Warren +1 202 434 5252 zwarren@wc.com
No Logo Huntsman International LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Debra Lee Bogo-Ernst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Marovitz +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 701 7711 amarovitz@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John E. Schmidtlein +1 202 434 5000 +1 202 434 5029 jschmidtlein@wc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Zachary K. Warren +1 202 434 5252 zwarren@wc.com
No Logo Huntsman Llc, Defendant
No Logo MCNS, Defendant
No Logo MCNS POLYURETHANES USA INC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Allen C Kim +1 213 896 6000 akim@sidley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ryan M. Sandrock +1 415 772 1219 +1 415 772 7400 rsandrock@sidley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WELSH & RECKER, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY ROBERT E. WELSH, JR. +1 215 972 6430 +1 215 972 6436 rewelsh@welshrecker.com
No Logo MITSUI CHEMICALS & SKC POLYURETHANES, INC, Defendant
No Logo Mitsui Chemicals America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Farmer Brownstein Jaeger & Goldstein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David Brownstein +1 415 962 2873 +1 415 520 5678 dbrownstein@fbj-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY William S. Farmer +1 415 962 2877 +1 415 520 5678 wfarmer@fbj-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David Mark Goldstein ,. +1 415 962 2875 +1 415 520 5678 dgoldstein@fbj-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by JAMES A. BACKSTROM, COUNSELLOR AT LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY JAMES A. BACKSTROM +1 215 864 7797 +1 801 469 9381 jabber@backstromlaw.com
No Logo Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Farmer Brownstein Jaeger & Goldstein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David Brownstein +1 415 962 2873 +1 415 520 5678 dbrownstein@fbj-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY William S. Farmer +1 415 962 2877 +1 415 520 5678 wfarmer@fbj-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David Mark Goldstein ,. +1 415 962 2875 +1 415 520 5678 dgoldstein@fbj-law.com
No Logo WANHUA CHEMICAL AMERICA CO. LTD, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Debra Lee Bogo-Ernst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Marovitz +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 701 7711 amarovitz@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Alden Lewis Atkins +1 202 639 6613 +1 202 879 8813 aatkins@velaw.com
No Logo WANHUA CHEMICAL GROUP CO. LTD, Defendant
No Logo WANHUA CHEMICAL US HOLDING, INC., Defendant
No Logo IN RE: DIISOCYANATES ANTITRUST LITIGATION, In Re
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 25
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
  Entries (290) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None Compel
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Documents Under Seal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 9/3/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Documents Under Seal
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 8/20/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 8/19/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Documents Under Seal
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 8/10/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 8/2/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 7/30/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 7/30/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 7/28/2021, Entered: None Compel
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 7/28/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Documents Under Seal
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Special Master for E-Discovery
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Documents Under Seal
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Special Master for E-Discovery
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: None Compel
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 9/8/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 9/8/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None Amend
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 6/10/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None Case Management Order
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 12/31/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: None Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: None Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 3/27/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/29/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Documents Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 138 Plaintiffs' Motion for Production of Documents Previously Produced to Department of Justice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 1/15/19. (sps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 138 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Production of Documents Previously Produced to Department of Justice) filed by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UNICAST, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Pietragallo, William) (Entered: 01/14/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to 138 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, filed by BASF CORP., BAYER CORP., COVESTRO LLC, DOW CHEMICAL CO., DOWDUPONT INC, HUNTSMAN CORP., HUNTSMAN INTERNATIONAL LLC, WANHUA CHEMICAL AMERICA CO. LTD, WANHUA CHEMICAL US HOLDING, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Warren, Zachary) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11-27-18 before Judge Donetta W. Ambrose. Court Reporter Barbara Metz Leo, Telephone number 412-583-7557. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 1/3/2019. Redaction Request due 1/17/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/27/2019. (bml) Modified text on 1/4/2019. (jjg) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 137 Motion for Jennifer M. Oliver to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 12/26/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 136 Motion for Jodie Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 12/26/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 135 Motion for Jonathan L. Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 12/26/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 134 Motion for Daniel Mogin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 12/26/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps) Modified text on 12/26/2018. (sps) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 133 Motion for Daniel J. Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 12/26/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF in Support re 138 Motion for Production of Documents Previously Produced to Department of Justice, filed by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, IN RE: DIISOCYANATES ANTITRUST LITIGATION, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UNICAST, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Pietragallo, William) Modified text on 12/26/2018. (jjg) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Jason S. Hartley in Support re 138 MOTION for Production of Documents Previously Produced to Department of Justice filed by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, IN RE: DIISOCYANATES ANTITRUST LITIGATION, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UNICAST, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Table of Contents, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2) (Pietragallo, William) Modified text on 12/26/2018. (jjg) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Production of Documents Previously Produced to Department of Justice by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC., C.U.E., INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC., ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC, IN RE: DIISOCYANATES ANTITRUST LITIGATION, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC, UNICAST, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Pietragallo, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for attorney Jennifer M. Oliver to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4975725) by RHINO LININGS CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Oliver, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for attorney Jodie M. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4975721) by RHINO LININGS CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Williams, Jodie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for attorney Jonathan L. Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4975719) by RHINO LININGS CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Rubin, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for attorney Daniel J. Mogin to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4975718) by RHINO LININGS CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Mogin, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for attorney Daniel J. Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4974897) by RHINO LININGS CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Proposed Order) (Walker, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 131 Motion for Eric Cramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 12/21/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: 12/20/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for attorney Eric L. Cramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4973299) by RHINO LININGS CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Proposed Order) (Cramer, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for telephone conference held before Judge Donetta W. Ambrose: Telephone Conference held on 12/20/2018. Briefing schedule regarding discovery dispute: Plaintiffs' Motion and Brief (limited to 10 pages) due by 12/21/2018, Defendants' Response to Motion (limited to 10 pages) due by 1/10/2019, Plaintiffs' Reply to Response (limited to 5 pages) due by 1/14/2019. (Court Reporter: none) (slh) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 127 Motion for Sean Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 12/20/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 126 Motion for Richard M. Paul III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 12/20/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: 12/19/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for attorney Sean Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4972090) by NPC COATING, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Cooper, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: 12/19/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for attorney Richard M. Paul III to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4972086) by NPC COATING, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Paul, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 122 Motion for Robert James D'Anniballe, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 12/12/18. (slh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 123 Motion for Steven N. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 12/12/18. (slh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: 12/11/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for attorney Steven N. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4961873) by TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Steven N. Williams, # 2 Proposed Order) (Williams, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: 12/11/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for attorney Robert J. D'Anniballe, Jr., Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4960795) by FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Proposed Order) (D'Anniballe, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: 12/11/2018 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 120 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Shaina R. Rogozen is withdrawn as attorney for Dow in this matter. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 12/11/18. (sps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: 12/10/2018 Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by DOW CHEMICAL CO.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Rogozen, Shaina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Paul, III on behalf of NPC COATING, INC.. (Paul, Richard) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 113 Motion for Joseph R. Saveri to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/30/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 112 Motion for David M. Bernick to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/30/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 111 Motion for Jeffrey B. Gittleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/30/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 110 Motion for Abram Ellis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/30/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 109 Motion for Jonathan R. Myers to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/30/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for attorney Joseph R. Saveri to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4949710) by TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Joseph R. Saveri, # 2 Proposed Order) (Saveri, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for attorney David M. Bernick to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4948819) by DOW CHEMICAL CO.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Bernick, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for attorney Jeffrey B. Gittleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4948596) by ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jeffrey B. Gittleman in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (w/Certificate of Good Standing), # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey B. Gittleman) (Gittleman, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for attorney Abram Ellis to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4948500) by BAYER CORP., COVESTRO LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Ellis, Abram)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for attorney Jonathan R. Myers to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4948436) by BAYER CORP., COVESTRO LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Myers, Jonathan )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/28/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 1. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/28/18. (slh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/28/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER APPOINTING PLAINTIFFS' INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL AND LIAISON COUNSEL: Megan E. Jones of Hausfeld LLP and Jason S. Hartley of Hartley LLP are appointed as Co-Lead Counsel and William Pietragallo, II of Pietragallo Gordon Alfano Bosick & Raspanti, LLP is appointed as Liaison Counsel. All other motions for appointment of counsel are denied. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/28/18. (slh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donetta W. Ambrose: Initial Status Conference held on 11/27/2018. (Court Reporter: Barb Leo) (slh) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: 11/26/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 99 Motion for Lin Chan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/26/18. (cha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order re 80 Motion to Appoint Counsel, Amended [Proposed] Order Re: Appointment of Interim Lead Class Counsel by ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Shapiro, Anthony) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: 11/26/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 100 Motion for Dean M. Harvey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/26/18. (cha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Miller on behalf of HUNTSMAN CORP., HUNTSMAN INTERNATIONAL LLC. (Miller, James) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ?? 455, the undersigned must disqualify herself in this proceeding. Lisa Pupo Lenihan, United States Magistrate Judge, therefore, recuses herself from all proceedings in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 11/23/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb) (Entered: 11/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for attorney Dean Michael Harvey to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4941879) by RHINO LININGS CORPORATION. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order) (Harvey, Dean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for attorney Lin Yee Chan to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4941850) by RHINO LININGS CORPORATION. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order) (Chan, Lin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 96 Motion for Beatrice Franklin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/21/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 95 Motion for Seth Ard to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/21/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: 11/20/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for attorney Beatrice Franklin to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4940777) by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Proposed Order) (Franklin, Beatrice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: 11/20/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for attorney Seth Ard to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4940739) by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Proposed Order) (Ard, Seth )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re 92 Motion to Appoint Counsel, by ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. (Katcher, Elana) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order re 91 Motion to Appoint Counsel, by ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC.. (Marcus, Bernard) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: 11/19/2018 Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appoint Counsel (APPLICATION IN SUPPORT OF INTERIM LEADERSHIP POSITION BY ELANA KATCHER OF KAPLAN FOX & KILSHEIMER LLP) by ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC., UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- firm resume) (Katcher, Elana) Modified text on 11/20/2018. (jjg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: 11/19/2018 Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Application in Support of Liaison Counsel Position by Bernard D. Marcus of Marcus & Shapira LLP) by ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit) (Marcus, Bernard) Modified text on 11/20/2018. (jjg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF in Support re 88 Motion to Appoint Counsel (Interim Lead Class Counsel) filed by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Resume of William Christopher Carmody) (Carmody, William) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Erin G. Allen on behalf of ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC.. (Allen, Erin) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: 11/19/2018 Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Interim Lead Class Counsel) by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Carmody, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C. Hill on behalf of ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC.. (Hill, Brian) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Moira E. Cain-Mannix on behalf of ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC.. (Cain-Mannix, Moira) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Bernard D. Marcus on behalf of ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC.. (Marcus, Bernard) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Robert N. Kaplan on behalf of ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC.. (Kaplan, Robert) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Elana Katcher on behalf of ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC.. (Katcher, Elana) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: 11/19/2018 Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Application for Appointment of Hausfeld LLP as Interim Lead Counsel) by UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Hearing Transcript, # 2 Exhibit B: Law360 Article, # 3 Exhibit C: Firm Resume, # 4 Proposed Order) (Spear, David) Modified text on 11/20/2018. (jjg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: 11/19/2018 Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Application for Appointment of Jason S. Hartley of Hartley LLP as Interim Lead Counsel) by C.U.E., INC., NPC COATING, INC., RHINO LININGS CORPORATION, TRI-ISO TRYLINE, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Proposed Order) (Hartley, Jason) Modified text on 11/20/2018. (jjg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: 11/19/2018 Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Brief in Support of Appointment of Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP as Interim Lead Counsel for the Proposed Plaintiff Class) by ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Hagens Berman Firm Resume, # 2 Proposed Order) (Shapiro, Anthony) Modified text on 11/20/2018. (jjg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order re 71 Motion to Appoint Counsel by FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC. (Pietragallo, William) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Case Management Order [Joint] by BASF CORP.. (Allen, Thomas) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Joint Proposed Agenda for Status Conference of November 27, 2018 by BASF CORP. (Allen, Thomas) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: 11/19/2018 Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Application for Appointment of Linda P. Nussbaum and Nussbaum Law Group, P.C. as Lead Interim Class Counsel) by EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Nussbaum, Linda) Modified text on 11/20/2018. (jjg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: 11/19/2018 Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Brief in Support of Application of Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC as Interim Lead Counsel) by ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Firm Resume, # 2 Proposed Order) (Robertson, Sharon ) Modified text on 11/20/2018. (jjg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: 11/19/2018 Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Application to Appoint Carlson Lynch Sweet Kilpela & Carpenter, LLP as Liaison Counsel) by ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED, ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Firm Resume, # 2 Proposed Order) (Lynch, Gary) Modified text on 11/20/2018. (jjg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Dasha Gorlov on behalf of FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC. (Gorlov, Dasha) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Peter S. Wolff on behalf of FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC. (Wolff, Peter) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: 11/19/2018 Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appoint Counsel by FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Pietragallo, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: 11/19/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 69 Motion for William Christopher Carmody to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/19/18. (cha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: 11/16/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for attorney William Christopher Carmody to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4935615) by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Carmody, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 66 Motion for James Backstrom to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/16/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 65 Motion for Michael Hausfeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/16/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: 11/16/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for attorney James A. Backstrom to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4935217) by MITSUI CHEMICALS AMERICA, INC. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Backstrom, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: 11/15/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for attorney Michael D. Hausfeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4934569) by UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Michael D. Hausfeld, # 2 Proposed Order) (Hausfeld, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: 11/15/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 47 Motion for Melinda R. Coolidge to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/14/18. (slh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 60 Motion for Ari Ruben to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/15/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 59 Motion for Arun Subramanian to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/15/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 56 Motion for Laura Alexander to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/15/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for attorney Ari S. Ruben to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4933019) by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Ari S. Ruben, # 2 Proposed Order) (Ruben, Ari)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for attorney Arun Subramanian to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4932855) by BRYN HILL INDUSTRIES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Subramanian, Arun)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 46 Motion for Megan E. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/14/18. (slh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 45 Motion for Brent W. Landau to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/14/18. (slh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for attorney Laura Alexander to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4931594) by ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Alexander, Laura)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 44 Motion for Ryan M. Sandrock to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/13/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 41 Motion for Jonathan Stephen Mann to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/13/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 40 Motion for Harold S. Reeves to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/13/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 39 Motion for Brian W. Barnes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/13/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 38 Motion for Michael W. Kirk to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/13/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 37 Motion for Charles J. Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/13/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 36 Motion for Elana Katcher to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/13/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 35 Motion for Robert N. Kaplan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/13/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sps) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for attorney Melinda R. Coolidge to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4930497) by UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Melinda R. Coolidge, # 2 Proposed Order) (Coolidge, Melinda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for attorney Megan E. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4930292) by UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Megan E. Jones, # 2 Proposed Order) (Jones, Megan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for attorney Brent W. Landau to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4930207) by UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Brent W. Landau, # 2 Proposed Order) (Landau, Brent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: 11/12/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for attorney Ryan M. Sandrock to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4929702) by MCNS POLYURETHANES USA INC. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Ryan M. Sandrock, # 2 Proposed Order) (Sandrock, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C. Pilsner on behalf of MCNS POLYURETHANES USA INC. (Pilsner, Matthew) (Entered: 11/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel W. Braver on behalf of MCNS POLYURETHANES USA INC. (Braver, Samuel) (Entered: 11/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: 11/12/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for attorney Jonathan Stephen Mann to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4929651) by FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Mann, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for attorney Harold S. Reeves to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4929367) by ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Reeves, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for attorney Brian W. Barnes to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4929364) by ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Barnes, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for attorney Michael W. Kirk to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4929362) by ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Kirk, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for attorney Charles J. Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4929356) by ELLIOTT COMPANY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for attorney Elana Katcher to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4929218) by UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Katcher, Elana)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for attorney Robert N. Kaplan to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4928319) by UTAH FOAM PRODUCTS, INC. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Kaplan, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by William Pietragallo, II on behalf of FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC. (Pietragallo, William) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 31 Motion for Kevin B. Love to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/8/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 30 Motion for Richard Koffman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/8/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: 11/7/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for attorney Kevin B. Love to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4925991) by ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Love, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: 11/7/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for attorney Richard A. Koffman to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4925311) by ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Koffman, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: 11/6/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 28 Motion for Linda Nussbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/6/18. (sps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: 11/5/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for attorney Linda Nussbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4921689) by EMMA CHEMICALS CO., INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Nussbaum, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: 11/5/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 23 Motion for Jason S. Hartley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/5/18. (cha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: 11/5/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 22 Motion for Charles Lincoln Wesley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/5/18. (cha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: 11/5/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 21 Motion for Craig P. Seebald to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/5/18. (cha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: 11/5/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 20 Motion for Christopher Theo Hellums to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/5/18. (cha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: 11/2/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for attorney Jason S. Hartley to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4920842) by RHINO LININGS CORPORATION. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jason S. Hartley, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order) (Hartley, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: 11/2/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for attorney Charles Lincoln Wesley to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4920822) by WANHUA CHEMICAL AMERICA CO. LTD. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Wesley, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: 11/2/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for attorney Craig P. Seebald to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4920731) by WANHUA CHEMICAL AMERICA CO. LTD. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Seebald, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: 11/2/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for attorney Christopher Theo Hellums to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4920005) by FINISHING SOLUTIONS LLC. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Hellums, Chris)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 15 Motion for Courtney Elgart to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/2/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER entered 13 granting Motion for Ryan Blake Streit to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/2/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask) Modified on 11/2/2018. (ask) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 12 Motion for Shaina Rogozen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/2/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask) Modified on 11/2/2018. (ask) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 11 Motion for Aidan Synnott to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/2/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ask) Modified on 11/2/2018. (ask) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: 11/1/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for attorney Courtney Elgart to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4918580) by ERA POLYMERS PROPRIETARY LIMITED. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Elgart, Courtney )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Ginevra Ventre on behalf of BASF CORP.. (Ventre, Ginevra) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: 11/1/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for attorney Ryan Blake Streit to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4918364) by DOW CHEMICAL CO.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Streit, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: 11/1/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for attorney Shaina Reiko Rogozen to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4918330) by DOW CHEMICAL CO.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Rogozen, Shaina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: 11/1/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for attorney Aidan Synnott to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4918317) by DOW CHEMICAL CO.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Synnott, Aidan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: 11/1/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 6 Motion for Ronnie S. Spiegel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/1/18. (ask)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: 11/1/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 5 Motion for Anthony D. Shapiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 11/1/18. (ask)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin J. Kilpela on behalf of ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Kilpela, Edwin) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Gary F. Lynch on behalf of ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Lynch, Gary) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: 10/31/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for attorney Ronnie S. Spiegel to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4916561) by ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Spiegel, Ronnie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: 10/31/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for attorney Anthony D. Shapiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4916554) by ISAAC INDUSTRIES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Shapiro, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        INITIAL ORDER: Initial Case Management set for 11/27/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3B before Judge Donetta W. Ambrose. On or before November 19, 2018, any counsel who wants to be considered for lead counsel shall file a resume and brief, not exceeding five pages, at the Master File Docket, Miscellaneous Action No. 18-1001 demonstrating lead counsel, MDL, and trial experience. On or before November 19, 2018, any counsel who wants to be considered for liaison counsel shall file a resume and brief, not exceeding five pages, at the Master File Docket Miscellaneous Action No. 18-1001 addressing the reasons counsel should be selected as liaison counsel. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 10/31/18. (slh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by IN RE: DIISOCYANATES ANTITRUST LITIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4) (Allen, Thomas) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Conditional Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation. (jjg) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/17/2018) (map). (Entered: 10/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER. (jjg) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 39 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?