Olin v. San Mateo County
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-06598

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 5, 2019 at 7:35 PM DT (1.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John Olin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michael E. Adams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Olin +1 650 599 9463
v.
No Logo San Mateo County, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall of Justice & Records

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Shryung Sheng +1 650 363 4792 +1 650 363 4034 psheng@smcgov.org
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: None Settlement Conference
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: None Settlement Conference
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Clerk's Notice Setting Telephone Conference
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/10/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/22/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Re-notice motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 notice of removal
                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ??1441(a) from San Mateo County Superior Court. Their case number is 18CIV05306. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12805461). Filed bySan Mateo County. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sheng, Paul) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?