Williams v. Harris County Sheriff's Office
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-04128

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 21, 2019 at 6:53 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Brian Keith Williams, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian K. Williams Law Group Apc
v.
No Logo City Of Houston, Defendant
No Logo Harris County Sheriff's Office, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None USCA Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: None Notice of Non-Compliance (FORM, noticing) - Civil
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal (FORM,noticing) - Civil
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Mail Returned Undeliverable
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Mail Returned Undeliverable
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Mail Returned Undeliverable
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Judgment - Final
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Memorandum and Opinion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Memorandum and Opinion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Mail Returned Undeliverable
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Notice of change of address
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appoint
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (PRIVATE PDF)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None letter
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Appointment
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Notice to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening (FORM, noticing)
                                        NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (JenniferOlson, 4)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                          MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Brian Keith Williams, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/20/2018. (JenniferOlson, 4)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights
                                            Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against City Of Houston, Harris County Sheriff's Office (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Brian Keith Williams.(JenniferOlson, 4)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?