Liberatore v. Computor Town-Trantulas
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-06579

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 9, 2019 at 6:24 PM DT (1.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ronald Stevens Liberatore, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ID: #C-39610

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald Stevens Liberatore
v.
No Logo Computor Town-Trantulas, Defendant
No Logo State of California, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Reopen Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None Reopen Case PSP
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Prison Trust Fund Account Statement
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Prison Trust Fund Account Statement
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Clerk's Notice re: IFP
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          CLERK'S NOTICE: re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 12/6/2018. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ronald Stevens Liberatore. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  COMPLAINT Under the Civil Rights Act against Computor Town-Trantulas, State of California (Filing fee IFPP). Filed by Ronald Stevens Liberatore. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?