Lopez v. Purdue Pharma LP
Federal Civil Lawsuit Utah District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-00719
District Judge Dee Benson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 31, 2018 at 12:52 AM DT (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Michael Lopez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DEWSNUP KING OLSEN WOREL HAVAS MORTENSEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Eric Shelton +1 801 257 1554 rshelton@dkowlaw.com
v.
No Logo Actavis, Defendant
No Logo Actavis PLC, Defendant
No Logo Amerisourcebergen, Defendant
No Logo Cardinal Health, Defendant
No Logo Cephalon, Defendant
No Logo Endo Health Solutions, Defendant
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Defendant
No Logo Insys Therapeutics, Defendant
No Logo Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Defendant
No Logo Johnson & Johnson, Defendant
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Purdue Frederick Company, The"
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant
No Logo Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Defendant
No Logo Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Defendant
No Logo Watson Laboratories, Defendant
No Logo Watson Pharmaceuticals, Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Michael H. Park, for Plaintiff Michael Lopez. (tlh) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorneys William S. Consovoy and Thomas R. McCarthy, for Plaintiff Michael Lopez. (tlh) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorneys Ashley Keller, Travis Lenkner and Seth Meyer, for Plaintiff Michael Lopez. (tlh) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3101611) filed by Michael Lopez. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Dee Benson (Shelton, Richard) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dee Benson. Plaintiff Michael Lopez is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 10 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?