Feldman v. Stryker Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-01416
District Judge Karen Gren Scholer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 31, 2018 at 1:01 AM DT (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rebecca Feldman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Wilson Daniel Miles , III

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan J Duplechin +1 334 269 2343 +1 334 954 7555 Ryan.Duplechin@BeasleyAllen.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W. Roger Smith, III +1 334 269 2343 +1 334 954 7555 roger.smith@beasleyallen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Debra Susan Reynolds +1 214 891 6606 +1 972 731 4384 debra@rrlfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Rolf Reynolds +1 214 891 6606 +1 972 731 4384 rusty@rrlfirm.com
v.
No Logo aap Biomaterials GmbH, Defendant
No Logo aap Implantate AG, Defendant
No Logo aap Implants Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 09/18/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine Swan Wright +1 214 665 3644 +1 214 665 5937 wrightka@gtlaw.com
No Logo Howmedica Osteonics, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Harrty and Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin W. Walther +1 713 546 5662 bwalther@shb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gene M Williams +1 713 227 9508 gmwilliams@shb.com
No Logo Stryker Corporation, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: It is Ordered that all claims in this matter by Plaintiff Rebecca Feldman against Defendants aap Implantate AG and aap Implants Inc, are hereby dismissed without prejudice with each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/19/2018) (epm) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Without Prejudice of Defendants aap Implantate AG and aap Implants, Inc. by Rebecca Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Smith, William) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint. aap Implants Inc answer due 9/17/2018. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/24/2018) (zkc) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, Move, Or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by aap Implants Inc (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Wright, Katherine) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Order Dismissing Stryker Corporation. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/22/2018) (rekc) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Without Prejudice of Stryker Corporation by Rebecca Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Duplechin, Ryan) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Howmedica Osteonics identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Stryker Corporation for Howmedica Osteonics. (Williams, Gene) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ANSWER to 1 Complaint, filed by Howmedica Osteonics. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Williams, Gene) (dsr). (Entered: 08/20/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER GRANTING AAP IMPLANTS INC.'S 12 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT: aap Implants Inc.'s responsive pleading is now due 8/27/2018. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/9/2018) (sss) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting 9 Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading re 1 Complaint. Howmedica Osteonics answer due 8/20/2018. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/6/2018) (zkc) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond filed by aap Implants Inc (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Attorney Katherine Swan Wright added to party aap Implants Inc(pty:dft) (Wright, Katherine) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting 6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of W. Roger Smith, III. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/2/2018) (zkc) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting 8 Motion to Proceed Without Designating Local Counsel. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/2/2018) (zkc) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 1 Complaint, filed by Howmedica Osteonics. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Williams, Gene) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              MOTION to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Howmedica Osteonics (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Attorney Gene M Williams added to party Howmedica Osteonics(pty:dft) (Williams, Gene) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting 5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan J Duplechin. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/13/2018) (ndt) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9307794) filed by Rebecca Feldman (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Attorney William Roger Smith, III added to party Rebecca Feldman(pty:pla) (Smith, William) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9307620) filed by Rebecca Feldman (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Attorney Ryan J Duplechin added to party Rebecca Feldman(pty:pla) (Duplechin, Ryan) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Summons Issued as to Howmedica Osteonics, Stryker Corporation, aap Biomaterials GmbH, aap Implantate AG, aap Implants Inc. (ykp) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rebecca Feldman. (Reynolds, Debra) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Rebecca Feldman filed by Rebecca Feldman. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9227842) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons) (Reynolds, Debra) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?