Romero v. Pompeo
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 6:18-cv-01184
Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2020 at 6:29 PM ST (1.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Elizabeth Reyes Romero, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hecht & Norman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raquel E. Hecht +1 541 465 2173 +1 541 465 2176 raquel@immigrationoregon.com
No Logo Rolando Vazquez Diaz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hecht & Norman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raquel E. Hecht +1 541 465 2173 +1 541 465 2176 raquel@immigrationoregon.com
v.
No Logo Carl Risch, Defendant
No Logo Daria L Darnell, Defendant
No Logo Jane Doe, Defendant
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael R Pompeo"
Citation Section 08 U.S.C. § 1182
Nature of Suit 465 - Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None Opinion and Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Return of Service Executed as to All Defendants. Service specifically made upon U.S. Attorney General. (Hecht, Raquel) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Summons Issued Electronically as to Carl Risch. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Summons Issued Electronically as to Michael R Pompeo. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Summons Issued Electronically as to Daria L Darnell. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Court Filing
              Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/6/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/6/2018. Pretrial Order is due by 12/6/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (bd) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Filing fee in the amount of $400.00 collected via pay.gov; Receipt No. 0979-5469670 issued. (bd) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                  Complaint. (In forma pauperis status selected) Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Elizabeth Reyes against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Summons). (Hecht, Raquel) Modified on 7/9/2018 to strike IFP status (bd). (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 7 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?