GENEVA COLLEGE v. CHAO
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Western District Court, Case No. 2:06-cv-01663
District Judge Joy Flowers Conti, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 25, 2019 at 3:46 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ASSOCIATION OF FAITH-BASED ORGANIZATIONS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PALADIN LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Paladin, Jr. +1 412 244 0826 +1 412 244 1690 lpaladin@paladinlawoffices.com
No Logo GENEVA COLLEGE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PALADIN LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Paladin, Jr. +1 412 244 0826 +1 412 244 1690 lpaladin@paladinlawoffices.com
v.
Chao, Elaine L. Chao, Elaine L., Defendant
Officially listed as "ELAINE L. CHAO"
Unknown Role, NORWEST CORP
Unknown Role, PROTECTIVE LIFE CORP
News Corporation Unknown Role, News Corporation
Unknown Role, New Newscorp LLC
Unknown Role, Virginia Holdco, Inc.
Unknown Role, Ingersoll-Rand plc

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in her official capacity as Secretary of the United States Department of Labor Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
No Logo STEPHEN M. SCHMERIN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Pennsylvania Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kemal Alexander Mericli +1 412 565 7680 +1 412 565 3019 kmericli@attorneygeneral.gov
No Logo TEAM PENNSYLVANIA WORKFORCE INVESTMENT BOARD, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Pennsylvania Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kemal Alexander Mericli +1 412 565 7680 +1 412 565 3019 kmericli@attorneygeneral.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ELAINE L. CHAO answer due 5/11/2007. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 4/25/07. (smc ) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    STIPULATION of Dismissal by GENEVA COLLEGE, ASSOCIATION OF FAITH-BASED ORGANIZATIONS. (Paladin, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/26/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, filed by GENEVA COLLEGE,, ASSOCIATION OF FAITH-BASED ORGANIZATIONS, by ELAINE L. CHAO. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Freeborne, Paul) (Entered: 04/24/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. An additional period of time until April 26, 2007 is granted. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 4/16/07. (smc ) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          RESPONSE to Motion re 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File an answer or responsive pleading filed by GENEVA COLLEGE, ASSOCIATION OF FAITH-BASED ORGANIZATIONS. (Paladin, Lawrence) Modified on 4/12/2007 to correctly title document (ksa). (Entered: 04/11/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION for Extension of Time to File an answer or responsive pleading by STEPHEN M. SCHMERIN, TEAM PENNSYLVANIA WORKFORCE INVESTMENT BOARD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mericli, Kemal) Modified on 4/12/2007 to correctly title motion (ksa). (Entered: 04/11/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ELAINE L. CHAO answer due 4/26/2007. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 4/2/07. (smc ) (Entered: 04/03/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, filed by GENEVA COLLEGE,, ASSOCIATION OF FAITH-BASED ORGANIZATIONS, by ELAINE L. CHAO. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Freeborne, Paul) (Entered: 03/30/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due 4/12/2007. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 2/28/07. (smc ) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by STEPHEN M. SCHMERIN, TEAM PENNSYLVANIA WORKFORCE INVESTMENT BOARD. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mericli, Kemal) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Kemal Alexander Mericli on behalf of STEPHEN M. SCHMERIN, TEAM PENNSYLVANIA WORKFORCE INVESTMENT BOARD (Mericli, Kemal) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by GENEVA COLLEGE, ASSOCIATION OF FAITH-BASED ORGANIZATIONS. ELAINE L. CHAO served on 1/3/2007, answer due 3/5/2007. (Paladin, Lawrence) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Complaint, First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by ELAINE L. CHAO. (Freeborne, Paul) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Paul G. Freeborne on behalf of ELAINE L. CHAO (Freeborne, Paul) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Alberto R. Gonzales and Elaine L. Chao on 12/27/2006, filed by GENEVA COLLEGE, ASSOCIATION OF FAITH-BASED ORGANIZATIONS. (Paladin, Lawrence) (Entered: 02/07/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GENEVA COLLEGE, ASSOCIATION OF FAITH-BASED ORGANIZATIONS. STEPHEN M. SCHMERIN waiver sent on 12/27/2006, answer due 2/26/2007. (Paladin, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GENEVA COLLEGE, ASSOCIATION OF FAITH-BASED ORGANIZATIONS. TEAM PENNSYVLVANIA WORK FORCE INVESTMENT BOARD. waiver sent on 12/27/2006, answer due 2/26/2007. (Paladin, Lawrence). (Entered: 01/19/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Errata re 1 Complaint, by GENEVA COLLEGE, ASSOCIATION OF FAITH-BASED ORGANIZATIONS Reason for Correction: Exhibit A left off of complaint. (Paladin, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/08/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Disclosure Statement identifying None as Corporate Parent, by GENEVA COLLEGE, ASSOCIATION OF FAITH-BASED ORGANIZATIONS. (Paladin, Lawrence) (Entered: 12/21/2006)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        COMPLAINT against ELAINE L. CHAO, STEPHEN M. SCHMERIN, TEAM PENNSYLVANIA WORKFORCE INVESTMENT BOARD ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 1423), filed by GENEVA COLLEGE, ASSOCIATION OF FAITH-BASED ORGANIZATIONS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Summons as to Elaine Chao # 3 Summons as to Stephen M. Schmerin # 4 Summons as to Team Pennsylvania Workforce Investment Board # 5 Receipt)(jv) (Entered: 12/18/2006)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?