Hudson, Shawn v. Tesla, Inc et al
State Civil Lawsuit Circuit Court of the Ninth Judicial Circuit, Case No. 2018-CA-011812-O

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Shawn Hudson, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Oscar Enrique Gonzalez-Bustamante, Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Case Type CA - Products Liability
Location Div 39
UCN 482018CA011812A001OX
Judge Chad K Alvaro
Status Pending
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: None
HEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Motion - Alvaro, Chad K
    Blank 21 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: None
    Notice Cancellation of Hearing
      Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None
      Amended Complaint
        Blank 19 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None
        Amended Notice of Hearing: June 4, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. to 10:00 a.m.
          Blank 18 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: None
          Notice of Hearing: on 6/4/20
            Blank 17 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: None
            Notice of Cancellation of Deposition: for April 28, 2020
              Legal Document 16 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None
              Notice of Taking Deposition(s)
                Blank 15 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: None
                Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: None
                  Response to Request for Admissions
                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: None
                    Response to Request to Produce
                      Blank 12 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None
                      Order: canceling court's notice of lack of prosecution
                        Blank 11 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: None
                        Order Granting Comments: PRO HAC VICE ADMISSIONS
                          Blank 10 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: None
                          Correspondence
                            Blank 9 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None
                            Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice
                              Blank 8 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None
                              Notice of Discovery
                                Blank 7 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None
                                Notice Lack of Prosecution/Motion to Dism/Notice Hearing: Comments: 2/21/20 @ 2:30 Pm
                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/28/2018
                                  Motion to Dismiss: PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT by TESLA, INC
                                    Blank 5 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: 11/2/2018
                                    Summons Issued Electronically as to: Emailed to Atty
                                      Blank 4 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: 11/2/2018
                                      Summons Issued Electronically as to: Emailed to Atty
                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018
                                        Complaint
                                          Blank 2 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018
                                          Civil Cover Sheet
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018
                                            Case Initiated

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 284 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?