Hatch v. Jones
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-04146

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 30, 2020 at 8:06 AM DT (7.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John L Hatch, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Stevens Baldo & Freeman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space R. LYN STEVENS +1 409 835 5200 stevens@sbf-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. LYN STEVENS +1 409 835 5200 stevens@sbf-law.com
v.
No Logo Lawrence Kuykendall, Defendant
No Logo Melida Ramirez, Defendant
No Logo Nationwide Coin & Bullion Reserve, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Turner M. Jones, Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: None Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: None Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Entry of Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: None Entry Of Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None AO435 Transcript Request
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: None Enforce
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/29/2020, Entered: None AO435 Transcript Request
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Sanctions
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: None Surreply to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: None Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: None Reply
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/12/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: None Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None Sanctions
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Compel
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/30/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: None Adopting Report and Recommendations
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: None Costs
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: None Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: None Amend
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: None Other Notice
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Summons Issued/Not Issued
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Summons - Request for Issuance
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None Initial Disclosures
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None Entry Of Order
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Notice Regarding Initial Conference - FORM - Judge Ellison
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Notice of Resetting (FORM, noticing) - Civil
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: 11/1/2018 Order for Initial Conference - FORMCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/12/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: 10/31/2018 Complaint
                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21197938) filed by John L Hatch. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stevens, Raymond)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?