Johnson v. Milwaukee Police Department
Federal Civil Lawsuit Wisconsin Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-01733

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 16, 2019 at 1:08 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Marvin Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marvin Johnson +1 602 252 7461
v.
No Logo Jeff Lepianka, Defendant
No Logo K9 Bravo, Defendant
No Logo Milwaukee Police Department, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Response (non-motion)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None extension of time
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Letter from Court
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Letter from Clerk re Consent to MagistrateCourt Filing
                LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form and certified trust account be filed within 21 days (asc)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
                  PARTIAL Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Marvin Johnson. (asc)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
                    MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Marvin Johnson. (asc)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Complaint - Prisoner
                      PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Marvin Johnson. (asc)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 2 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?