S. Malik v. C. Tan, et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2015-1-CV-276557

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 31, 2018 at 10:32 PM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Malik, Sultan, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Ahn, Young, Defendant
No Logo Chen, Yi, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Vucinich, Jeffery Michael

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scheley, Paul Christian +1 650 758 1199
Coldwell Banker Corporation Coldwell Banker Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Coldwell Banker"
No Logo Meng, Ying, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Vucinich, Jeffery Michael

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scheley, Paul Christian +1 650 758 1199
No Logo Nrt West, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hoge Fenton Jones & Appel, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel W. Ballesteros +1 408 287 9501 dwb@hogefenton.com
No Logo Tan, Coco, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Vucinich, Jeffery Michael

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scheley, Paul Christian +1 650 758 1199
Case Type Other PI/PD/WD Unlimited (23)
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 42 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Notice-Settlement
unconditional
    Blank 41 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Minute Order
    Minutes Non-Criminal
      Blank 40 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Proof of Service
      CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 10/06/2015
        Blank 39 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Proof of Service
        and supporting documents; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 10/05/2015
          Blank 38 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Separate Statement
          CV Separate Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 10/02/2015
            Blank 37 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
            of Molly A. Sundstrom; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 10/02/2015
              Blank 36 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
              CV Memo:Ps & As/Suppt of Mtn; Decision = M; Closed = 10/02/2015
                Blank 35 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day
                CV Court Reporter Fee < 1 Hour; Decision = M; Closed = 10/02/2015
                  Blank 34 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Motion-Summary Judgment
                  atty: Sundstrom; 12/17/15, 9am, D8; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Mtn Summary Jgmt/Adjudication; Decision = M; Closed = 10/02/2015
                    Blank 33 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Order After Hearing - POSCourt Filing
                    Motion for trial setting is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Folan *See file for details*; Legacy Name = CV Ord After Hearing; Decision = G; Closed = 09/28/2015
                      Blank 32 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Notice of Hearing (no fee)
                      ARB-Ntc of Mediation Status Conf; Decision = M; Closed = 09/09/2015
                        Blank 31 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                        to mtn for preference and trial setting (atty: P Christian Scheley) 9/22/15 D-8 @9; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 09/09/2015
                          Blank 30 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Document: Other
                          non-opp to Plt Sultan Malik's mtn for preference & trial setting 09-22-15 9AM D-08 (Sundstrom); Legacy Name = CV Other
                            Blank 29 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Notice
                            of change of handling atty; ; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of...; Decision = M; Closed = 07/31/2015
                              Blank 28 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                              Nicole N. Hancock; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 07/31/2015
                                Blank 27 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day
                                CV Court Reporter Fee < 1 Hour; Decision = M; Closed = 07/31/2015
                                  Blank 26 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                  CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 07/31/2015
                                    Blank 25 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Motion (Other)
                                    for preference and trial setting ; Atty Hancock ; 9/22/15 @ 9:00am D-8; ; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Motion w/fee; Decision = M; Closed = 07/31/2015
                                      Blank 24 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                                      to nicole hancock and P.christian Scheley; Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc/Regular Mail; Decision = M; Closed = 07/29/2015
                                        Blank 23 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                        non-opposition to mtn for preference and trial setting; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 07/29/2015
                                          Blank 22 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day
                                          CV Court Reporter Fee < 1 Hour; Decision = M; Closed = 07/15/2015
                                            Blank 21 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                            CV Proof of Svc; Decision = M; Closed = 07/15/2015
                                              Blank 20 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                              Nicole N. Hancock; Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support; Decision = M; Closed = 07/15/2015
                                                Blank 19 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Motion (Other)
                                                For Preference and Setting Case for Trial; 8/11/15 @ 9:00AM D-08; Atty Hancock; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Motion w/fee; Decision = M; Closed = 07/15/2015
                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Notice of Hearing (no fee)
                                                  ARB-Ntc of Mediation Status Conf; Decision = M; Closed = 06/03/2015
                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                    Atty Bumatay; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 06/02/2015
                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Jury Fee Deposit
                                                      CV Jury Fee Deposit; Decision = M; Closed = 05/20/2015
                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                        atty:Breen; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 05/20/2015
                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Jury Fee Deposit
                                                          $150 for jury fees by def; Legacy Name = CV Jury Fee Deposit; Decision = M; Closed = 05/15/2015
                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                            ATTY HANCOCK; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 05/15/2015
                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None General Denial: Unlimited
                                                              Atty: Breen; Legacy Name = CV General Denial, Unltd; Decision = M; Closed = 04/22/2015
                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                Atty Scheley; Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees; Decision = M; Closed = 04/02/2015
                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Dismissal
                                                                  by atty Hancock as to def Young Ahn only; Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial W/O Prej; Decision = M; Closed = 03/19/2015
                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                    CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 03/12/2015
                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                                                      AMENDED; Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed; Decision = M; Closed = 02/27/2015
                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                        CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 02/20/2015
                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Complaint: Amendment To (New Party)
                                                                          doe 1-coldwell banker residential real estate, LLC; Legacy Name = CV Amendment to Complaint; Decision = M; Closed = 02/19/2015
                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                            CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 02/13/2015
                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                              CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 02/11/2015
                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 02/06/2015
                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                                                  CV Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 02/06/2015
                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                                                                    CV Summons Filed; Decision = M; Closed = 02/06/2015

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?