C. Dennis v. Live Nation Worldwide, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2015-1-CV-280456

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 31, 2018 at 11:59 PM EDT (3.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Dennis, Charles, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John L. Burris

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John L. Burris +1 510 839 5200 +1 510 839 3882 john.burris@johnburrislaw.com
No Logo Robinson, Roseanna M., Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Beason, Alexa, Defendant
No Logo City of Mountain View, Defendant
No Logo Def Jam Recordings, Defendant
No Logo Gilmore, Willie, Defendant
No Logo Jenkins, Jay Wayne, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald Aquinas Lancaster, Jr. +1 818 992 2924 +1 818 992 2925 dlancaster@thelancasterlawgroup.com
No Logo Johnson, Eric, Defendant
Officer/Director, Private Media Group Inc
No Logo Kuniansky-Altman, David, Defendant
No Logo Live Nation Worldwide, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Meadows, David W.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Geronimo Perez +1 310 943 4755 gperez@dfis-law.com
No Logo Marshall, Kena, Defendant
No Logo Maynard, Peter, Defendant
No Logo NPB Companies, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ericksen, Arbuthnot, Kilduff, Day & Linstrom, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Von Ryan Reyes +1 408 286 0880 vreyes@ericksenarbuthnot.com
No Logo Shoreline Amphitheatre, Ltd., Defendant
No Logo J.e, Minor - Plaintiff
No Logo Johnson, Eric, Defendant/Cross Defendant
Officer/Director, Private Media Group Inc
No Logo Live Nation Worldwide, Inc., Defendant/Cross Complainant
No Logo Robinson, Roseanna, Cross Defendant
No Logo State of California/California Victim Compensastioni Board, Claimant
Case Type Other PI/PD/WD Unlimited (23)
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
  Entries (102) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 102 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
    Blank 101 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Declaration
    HRG 10/23 Declaration for Trial Setting
      Blank 100 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
        Blank 99 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Declaration
        HRG-07/12/18 Declaration of Counsel Re Mediation and Trial Setting
          Blank 98 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Answer-Cross-Complaint
          Atty Schonbuch
            Blank 97 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
              Blank 96 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
                Blank 95 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Notice
                Notice of Non-Receipt
                  Blank 94 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
                    Blank 93 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Request Dismissal
                    Partial, as to Cross-Complaint filed by Def Eric Johnson, Sr. only.
                      Blank 92 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Motion-Strike
                      Punitive Damanges Claims from Cross-Complaint; Memo. of P.'s and A.'s in Support
                        Blank 91 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Answer-Amended Complaint
                        To 2nd amended complaint; Atty Schonbuch
                          Blank 90 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                          to Second Amended Complaint; Atty Reyes
                            Blank 89 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Request-Judicial Notice
                              Blank 88 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                              Of Donald Aquinas Lancaster
                                Blank 87 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Demurrer
                                SAC; Atty Lancaster, 03/13/2018, 9AM, D6
                                  Blank 86 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Motion-Strike
                                  SAC; Atty Lancaster, 03/13/2018, 9AM, D6
                                    Blank 85 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                      Blank 84 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Minute Order
                                        Blank 83 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Complaint - Amended
                                        2nd amended *no summons issued*
                                          Blank 82 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Order: Submitted MatterCourt Filing
                                          Def Jenkins demurrer to the FAC in the Dennis action is SUSTAINED WITH 10 DAYS LEAVE TO AMEND.; Def Jenkins demurrer to the original complaint in the Robinson action is OVERRULED. Signed by Judge Zayner *see file for details*
                                            Blank 81 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Answer/Response (No Fee)
                                            answer to complaint. Atty Lancaster
                                              Blank 80 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                              to demurrer to plts FAC
                                                Blank 79 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                to def's demurrer (Christopher T. Aumais) hrg 7/27/17 9am D-6
                                                  Blank 78 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                                                    Blank 77 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
                                                    atty: Lancaster
                                                      Blank 76 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                        Blank 75 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
                                                        The Law Office of Jason A. Pollack ; 12400 Wilshire Blvd. suite 800; Los Angeles, Ca. 90025
                                                          Blank 74 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                          1st amended complaint & Amended Summons
                                                            Blank 73 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                            of Demurring Party in Suppt of Automatic Extension
                                                              Blank 72 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None First Paper Filed - Fee
                                                              taken on Decl in Suppt of Extension
                                                                Blank 71 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Answer-Amended Complaint
                                                                  Blank 70 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                  amended summons and 1st amended complt
                                                                    Blank 69 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                      Blank 68 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                                                      For 1st amended complt.
                                                                        Blank 67 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                        1st amended complaint (no summons issued), by atty Gray.
                                                                          Blank 66 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          Stipulation for leave to file a 1st amended complaint is GRANTED, signed Judge Zayner.
                                                                            Blank 65 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                                                                            original signature missing from stip/order in support of plt's FAC
                                                                              Blank 64 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Order: ContinuanceCourt Filing
                                                                              Mediation status conference currently set on 2/9/17 shall be heard on 6/15/17 at 10:30AM, signed Judge Zayner.
                                                                                Blank 63 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                                                                                ntc/lien - All signatures must be originals or by fax; if by fax, it must state so on the document.
                                                                                  Blank 62 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                    Blank 61 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                      Blank 60 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                      Reply to Oppos to Mtn to Compel Further Discovery Response to Req for Prod of Docs (C. Aumais) 10-13-16 D6
                                                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                        opposition to plt's motion to compel further discovery responses to request 48 & 49, set two 10-13-16 9am dept.6
                                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                          Of Christopher Aumais mtn to compel
                                                                                            Blank 57 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Separate Statement
                                                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Court Reporter Fee < 1 hour
                                                                                                Blank 55 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Motion-Compel
                                                                                                DISCOVERY FROM LIVE NATION; MEMO OF P'S & A'S, ATTY: AUMAIS, 10/13/16, 9AM, D6
                                                                                                  Blank 54 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                  (lien claimant) of lien in the amount of $924 in favor of Erica Johnson
                                                                                                    Blank 53 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                    Minutes Non-Criminal
                                                                                                      Blank 52 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                        Blank 51 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                          Blank 50 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          Plt's mtc compliance w/subpoena is DENIED without prej. IT IS SO ORDERED. Judge Zayner (see order)
                                                                                                            Blank 49 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                            Minutes Non-Criminal
                                                                                                              Blank 48 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                              Def's opposition to motion to compel, 5/10/16 9am D-6, by atty Perez.
                                                                                                                Blank 47 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Court Reporter Fee < 1 hour
                                                                                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Motion-Compel
                                                                                                                  5-10-16, d.6, 9am; atty burris
                                                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                    Minutes Non-Criminal
                                                                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                      atty Pointer
                                                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          Def's Mtn to Consolidate is GRANTED. Cases 115CV280456 and 115CV282859 are CONSOLIDATED. Case 115CV280456 shall be the lead case, & all subsequent filings shall be under that case #. All further hrgs shall be in D-6. Any pending hrgs in D-3 on csae 115CV282859 are VACATED. Judge Zayner
                                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                            Minutes Non-Criminal
                                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                              Minutes Non-Criminal
                                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                Minutes Non-Criminal
                                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                  atty Pointer
                                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Non-Opposition
                                                                                                                                      to Mtn to Consolidate Case (Geronimo Perez) 2-11-16 D6
                                                                                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                        Minutes Non-Criminal
                                                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Court Reporter Fee < 1 hour
                                                                                                                                          02/11/16 @ 9am, dept. 21
                                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Request-Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Motion-Consolidate
                                                                                                                                              atty: Schonbuch, 02/11/16 @ 9am, dept. 21
                                                                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                                                    atty Aumais; Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees; Decision = M; Closed = 11/09/2015
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None Answer/Response (No Fee)
                                                                                                                                                      to Cross Complaint atty Schonbuch; Legacy Name = CV Answer - NO FEES DUE!; Decision = M; Closed = 09/24/2015
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None Answer/Response (No Fee)
                                                                                                                                                        atty Schonbuch; Legacy Name = CV Answer - NO FEES DUE!; Decision = M; Closed = 09/24/2015
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Order After Hearing - POSCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Def's Mtn to Strike the Complaint is DENIED. (Judge Cabrinha) hrg 9/22/15 9am D-21; Legacy Name = CV Ord After Hearing; Decision = D; Closed = 10/14/2015
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                            of Anthony Kohrs of reply brief; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 09/21/2015
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                              to opposition to motion to strike attorneys fees, punitive damages allegations, and improper wrongful death cause of action; Legacy Name = CV Reply; Decision = M; Closed = 09/21/2015
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                                                                                                to Defs' Mtn to Strike (Adante' L. Pointer) hrg 9/22/15 9am D-21; Legacy Name = CV Opposition; Decision = M; Closed = 09/08/2015
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Acknowledgement
                                                                                                                                                                  CV Acknowledge Receipt; Decision = M; Closed = 09/08/2015
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Acknowledgement
                                                                                                                                                                    CV Acknowledge Receipt; Decision = M; Closed = 09/01/2015
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                      a. pointer; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 09/01/2015
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                        atty aumais; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 08/31/2015
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                                                                          taken on cmc; Legacy Name = CV First Paper Def - Unltd; Decision = M; Closed = 08/31/2015
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Jury Fee Deposit
                                                                                                                                                                            $150 deposited; Legacy Name = CV Jury Fee Deposit; Decision = M; Closed = 08/28/2015
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                              a. kohrs; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 08/28/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                j. pollack; Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement; Decision = M; Closed = 08/26/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                                                                                                                                  CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 08/21/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Notice-Related Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                    CV Ntc:Related Cases; Decision = M; Closed = 08/18/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                                                                                                                                      CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons; Decision = M; Closed = 08/17/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day
                                                                                                                                                                                        CV Court Reporter Fee < 1 Hour; Decision = M; Closed = 08/05/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Motion (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Strike 9/22/15 @ 9am Dept 21 atty Michael Schonbuch sbn 150884 1801 Century Park East Ninth Floor Los Angeles Ca 90067 (310) 556-7900; Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Motion/no fee; Decision = M; Closed = 08/05/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                                                                                            taken on Notice of Motion to Strike; Legacy Name = CV First Paper Def - Unltd; Decision = M; Closed = 08/05/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                              CV Summons Filed; Decision = M; Closed = 08/03/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                                                                                                atty pollack; Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees; Decision = M; Closed = 08/03/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CV Cross-Complaint; Decision = M; Closed = 08/03/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Application and Order: Appoint Guardian ad Litem
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Ria Cotton appt guardian ad litem for Erica Johnson - P4 60.00; Legacy Name = CV Appl/Ord:Appt Guardian Ad Litem; Decision = G; Closed = 05/18/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Application and Order: Appoint Guardian ad Litem
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Ria Cotton appt guardian ad litem for Eric Johnson, III Pd $60.00; Legacy Name = CV Appl/Ord:Appt Guardian Ad Litem; Decision = G; Closed = 05/18/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                        CV Summons Filed; Decision = M; Closed = 05/11/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Adante D. Pointer SBN 236229; Law Offices of John L. Burris; Airport Corporate Centre 7677 Oakport St, Suite 1120, Oakland CA 94621 (510) 839-5200; Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 05/11/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                            CV Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 05/11/2015

                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?