Glatt v. Curry
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-00101
District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 2, 2018 at 2:10 AM DT (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dashawn Hunter, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Consumer Litigation Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Leonard Anthony Bennett +1 757 930 3660 +1 757 930 3662 lenbennett@clalegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Elizabeth W. Hanes +1 757 930 3660 +1 757 930 3662 elizabeth@clalegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly & Crandall, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Joseph Guzzo +1 703 424 7576 +1 703 591 0167 aguzzo@kellyandcrandall.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kristi Cahoon Kelly +1 703 424 7572 +1 703 591 1067 kkelly@kellyandcrandall.com
No Logo Heather Ball, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Consumer Litigation Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Leonard Anthony Bennett +1 757 930 3660 +1 757 930 3662 lenbennett@clalegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Elizabeth W. Hanes +1 757 930 3660 +1 757 930 3662 elizabeth@clalegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly & Crandall, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Joseph Guzzo +1 703 424 7576 +1 703 591 0167 aguzzo@kellyandcrandall.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kristi Cahoon Kelly +1 703 424 7572 +1 703 591 1067 kkelly@kellyandcrandall.com
No Logo John Glatt, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Consumer Litigation Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Leonard Anthony Bennett +1 757 930 3660 +1 757 930 3662 lenbennett@clalegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Elizabeth W. Hanes +1 757 930 3660 +1 757 930 3662 elizabeth@clalegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly & Crandall, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Joseph Guzzo +1 703 424 7576 +1 703 591 0167 aguzzo@kellyandcrandall.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kristi Cahoon Kelly +1 703 424 7572 +1 703 591 1067 kkelly@kellyandcrandall.com
No Logo Michael Corona, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Consumer Litigation Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Leonard Anthony Bennett +1 757 930 3660 +1 757 930 3662 lenbennett@clalegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Elizabeth W. Hanes +1 757 930 3660 +1 757 930 3662 elizabeth@clalegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly & Crandall, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Joseph Guzzo +1 703 424 7576 +1 703 591 0167 aguzzo@kellyandcrandall.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kristi Cahoon Kelly +1 703 424 7572 +1 703 591 1067 kkelly@kellyandcrandall.com
No Logo Sonji Grandy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Consumer Litigation Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Leonard Anthony Bennett +1 757 930 3660 +1 757 930 3662 lenbennett@clalegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Elizabeth W. Hanes +1 757 930 3660 +1 757 930 3662 elizabeth@clalegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly & Crandall, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Joseph Guzzo +1 703 424 7576 +1 703 591 0167 aguzzo@kellyandcrandall.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kristi Cahoon Kelly +1 703 424 7572 +1 703 591 1067 kkelly@kellyandcrandall.com
v.
No Logo American Web Loan, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Awl, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Mark Curry, Defendant
No Logo Medley Capital Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Medley Opportunity Fund II LP, Defendant
No Logo Red Stone, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Anne Adams and Certification of Local Counsel Leonard A. Bennett Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6239492. by Heather Ball, Michael Corona, John Glatt, Sonji Grandy, Dashawn Hunter. (Bennett, Leonard) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Beth Ellen Terrell and Certification of Local Counsel Leonard A. Bennett Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6239484. by Heather Ball, Michael Corona, John Glatt, Sonji Grandy, Dashawn Hunter. (Bennett, Leonard) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Six (6) Summonses Issued as to AWL, Inc., American Web Loan, Inc., Mark Curry, Medley Capital Corporation, Medley Opportunity Fund II LP, Red Stone, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        COMPLAINT against AWL, Inc., American Web Loan, Inc., Mark Curry, Medley Capital Corporation, Medley Opportunity Fund II LP, Red Stone, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6220673.), filed by Sonji Grandy, Heather Ball, Michael Corona, Dashawn Hunter, John Glatt. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(epri) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 4 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?