S. Pearson-Ruddy v. State Of California (Department Of Transportation), et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2015-1-CV-285426

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 2, 2018 at 3:08 AM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pearson-Ruddy, Stephanie, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mary Alexander & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sophia Mallhia Aslami , +1 415 433 4440 +1 415 433 5440 saslami@maryalexanderlaw.com
Space Jennifer L Fiore +1 415 433 4440 +1 415 433 5440 jfiore@maryalexanderlaw.com
v.
No Logo City Of Santa Clara, Defendant
County Of Santa Clara County Of Santa Clara, Defendant
No Logo Hunt, Stephen C., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wayne M. Collins
No Logo State Of California, Department of Transportation, Defendant
VMware, Inc. VMware, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Gopivotal, Inc.
No Logo DeFazio, Kimberley, Guardian Ad Litem

Toggle Switch Represented by Scarlett, Randall Hoyt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scarlett, Randall Hoyt +1 415 834 1111
No Logo Ruddy, Dylan James, Minor - Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Scarlett, Randall Hoyt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scarlett, Randall Hoyt +1 415 834 1111
No Logo Ruddy, Forest Avery, Minor - Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Scarlett, Randall Hoyt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scarlett, Randall Hoyt +1 415 834 1111
No Logo Ruddy, Liam, Minor - Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mary Alexander & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer L Fiore +1 415 433 4440 +1 415 433 5440 jfiore@maryalexanderlaw.com
Case Type Auto Unlimited (22)
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
  Entries (154) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 154 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Request Dismissal
Request for Partial Dismissal
    Blank 153 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Request Dismissal
    Partial, With Prejudice, as to Def VMWare Inc. ONLY
      Blank 152 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
        Blank 151 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Order: Approve Compromise of Claim
          Blank 150 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Application
          HRG 07/31/18 Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action-Minor
            Blank 149 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
              Blank 148 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Order: Deposit into Blocked AccountCourt Filing
              GRANTED in the sum of $514,384.19, signed Judge Kirwan.
                Blank 147 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Order: Approve Compromise of ClaimCourt Filing
                GRANTED; The entire proceeds of the $1,566,666.67 from Defs VMware Inc. and Stephen C. Hunt will be made within 14 days of this order (see file for further details), signed Judge Kirwan.
                  Blank 146 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                  Further Declaration Of Randall H. Scarlett
                    Blank 145 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                    Declaration Of Brendan D.S. Way
                      Blank 144 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Notice
                      Notice of Settlement of Entire Case
                        Blank 143 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
                          Blank 142 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
                            Blank 141 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None stipulationCourt Filing
                            to Temp. Judge
                              Blank 140 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None stipulationCourt Filing
                              Granting Stip & Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore by Judge Kirwan
                                Blank 139 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
                                  Blank 138 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
                                    Blank 137 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Statement: Settlement Conference
                                    SUPPLEMENTAL MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT
                                      Blank 136 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Statement: Settlement Conference
                                      Settlement Conference Statement
                                        Blank 135 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                        RE Telephonic Appearance of Carrier at Mandatory Settlement Conference. ; GRANTED by Judge Kirwan
                                          Blank 134 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
                                          Application for leave for telephonic appearance at MSC, by atty Kronenberg.
                                            Blank 133 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
                                            Stipulation for an OST re: hearing to approve compromise of minor's claim (by atty Scarlett) is GRANTED and shall be heard on 5-10-18 at 9:00AM in Dept. 19, signed Judge Kirwan.
                                              Blank 132 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro TemporeCourt Filing
                                              signed by Judge Kirwan.
                                                Blank 131 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                  Blank 130 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Motion Order
                                                  Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action Minor. 051018 D19 9am.
                                                    Blank 129 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Substitution-Attorney
                                                    Old- Vucinich New- Kronenberg
                                                      Blank 128 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                      Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore
                                                        Blank 127 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                        Declaration of Jennifer L. Fiore in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant VMware, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint to Allege Punitive Damages
                                                          Blank 126 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                          Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant VMware, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint to Allege Punitive Damages
                                                            Blank 125 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
                                                            Stipulation for determination of good faith settlement (by atty Scarlett) is GRANTED (see file for details), signed Judge Kirwan.
                                                              Blank 124 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                              Proof of Service
                                                                Blank 123 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                DECLARATION OF JEFFREY M. VUCINICH
                                                                  Blank 122 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                  DEFENDANT VMWARE, INC.???S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS??? MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT
                                                                    Blank 121 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                    DEFENDANT VMWARE???S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS??? EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT
                                                                      Blank 120 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore
                                                                      K. Huseby, Inc.
                                                                        Blank 119 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                                          Blank 118 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Order: Submitted Matter
                                                                          With POS.
                                                                            Blank 117 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                              Blank 116 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None stipulation
                                                                              Stipulation and Appointment of Official Court Reporter Pro Tempore
                                                                                Blank 115 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                re: reply re: msj 3/27/18
                                                                                  Blank 114 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                                  to additional material facts re: MSJ
                                                                                    Blank 113 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                    to obj evidence re: MSJ
                                                                                      Blank 112 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                      to plts PEARSON-RUDDY and RUDDY opp MSJ (atty: Vucinich) 3/27/18 D-19 @9
                                                                                        Blank 111 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Proof Of Service - Electronic
                                                                                          Blank 110 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                          of Mary E. Alexander
                                                                                            Blank 109 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                              Blank 108 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Motion: Amend
                                                                                              Notice of Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint to Allege Punitive Damages; 4/26/18; 9 AM; D19; Atty Alexander
                                                                                                Blank 107 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
                                                                                                Mtn to amend Complaint shall be set on 4-26-18, 9:00, d-19. Plt shall file Mtn on 3-22-18, signed by Judge Kirwan.
                                                                                                  Blank 106 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
                                                                                                  Application to specially set hearing on motion for leave to file a 1st amended complaint, by atty Alexander.
                                                                                                    Blank 105 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                    Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant VMware, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication
                                                                                                      Blank 104 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                      Proof of Service
                                                                                                        Blank 103 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Objection: Evidence
                                                                                                        Plaintiffs' Objections to Evidence Submitted by Defendant VMware, Inc. in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication
                                                                                                          Blank 102 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                          Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant VMware, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication
                                                                                                            Blank 101 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                            Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant VMware, Inc.'s Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts and Plaintiffs' Additional Material Facts
                                                                                                              Blank 100 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                Blank 99 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                  Blank 98 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                    Blank 97 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                    Ntc of mtn and mtn for summary judgment
                                                                                                                      Blank 96 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Index
                                                                                                                      Index of exhibits
                                                                                                                        Blank 95 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Separate Statement
                                                                                                                          Blank 94 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                          of Ken Durazzo
                                                                                                                            Blank 93 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                            of Robert Engle
                                                                                                                              Blank 92 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                              of Jeffrey M. Vucinich
                                                                                                                                Blank 91 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                  Blank 90 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Motion-Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                  Ntc of renewed mtn and mtn for summary judgment 03/27/2018 9:00am Dept. 19. Atty Vucinich.
                                                                                                                                    Blank 89 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                      Blank 88 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                        Blank 87 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Notice: Association/Co-Counsel
                                                                                                                                          Blank 86 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                            Blank 85 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                              Blank 84 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Withdrawal of
                                                                                                                                              of mtn for summary jgmt
                                                                                                                                                Blank 83 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                (Randall H. Scarlett) hrg 10/3/17 11am D-8
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 82 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                  (Mary E. Alexander) hrg 10/3/17 11am D-8
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 81 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 80 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 79 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None statement
                                                                                                                                                        statement re: adr compliance hearing
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 78 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None statement
                                                                                                                                                          Defendant Stephen Hunt's Mediation Status Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 77 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 76 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                              w/pos
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 75 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Court Reporter Fee < 1 hour
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 74 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 73 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Index
                                                                                                                                                                    of exhibits in suppt
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 72 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                      of Robert Engle
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 71 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                        of Aaron Chaisson
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 70 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                          Samuel P. Marraccini
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 69 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                            Jeffrey M. Vucinich
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 68 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Separate Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 67 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 66 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Motion-Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                  10/3/17 9am D9
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 65 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 64 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                      To mediation status statement of def. 5/11/17 @ 10:30am D8.
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 63 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                        Mediation status statement of pltf Stephanie Pearson-Ruddy
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 62 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                          Atty Rhodes
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 61 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                            Amendment to Complaint filed on 10/19/2016 in Subordinate case 115CV285409. Duplicate filing.
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 60 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                              RE: Granting consolidation of action.
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 59 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 58 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Referral: Mediation
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 57 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 56 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 55 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        for consolidation of actions with 115cv285409 (D,. Ruddy vs S. Hunt) - GRANTED. 115cv285426 shall be the lead case - signed by Judge Folan
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 54 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                          atty: Collins
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 53 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            $150 jury fee deposited.
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Fiore
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Substitution-Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    former: Sabrina A. Larson; new: Jeffrey M. Vucinich
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 48 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Answer/Response (No Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      To first amended complt; Atty Collins
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 47 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 46 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          1st amended complt. No summons issued. Atty Alexander.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 45 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Request: ActionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            1st amended complt - multiple defs have answered in this case. The atty is demanding the document be filed. Please advise.; *** Allow filing of amended complt. It likely addresses arguments in demurrer filed by VMWare set for hrg 9/20/16. CCP 472(3) allow for amending complt by time opp is due for demurrer. Granted by Judge Folan.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 44 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                1st amended complt - An Order of Court is required prior to filing this document.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 42 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    for pleadings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Notice of Hearing (no fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Court Reporter Fee < 1 hour
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Notice of Hearing (no fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Proof of Service: Fax
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Ex Parte Appl for Leave allowing Amendment to Complaint (Jennifer Fiore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Complaint: Amendment To (New Party)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Doe 51 true name is VMWARE Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Ex Parte Application - Notice RequiredCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          for Leave allowing Amendment to Complaint (Jennifer Fiore) -GRANTED Signed by Judge Folan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Notice: Unavailability of Counsel/no fee
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minutes Non-Criminal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                to OSC re service of DEF Stephen Hunt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Atty Bengtson.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Demand-Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        $150 jury fee deposited.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Atty Collins.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Atty Jacobs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  atty korb
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minutes Non-Criminal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Jury Fee Deposit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          $150
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Application and Order: Appoint Guardian ad Litem
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            $60 pd; Legacy Name = CV Appl/Ord:Appt Guardian Ad Litem; Decision = G; Closed = 09/17/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CV Summons Filed; Decision = M; Closed = 09/09/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                of Stephanie Pearson-Ruddy; Legacy Name = CV Declaration; Decision = M; Closed = 09/09/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued; Decision = M; Closed = 09/09/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CV Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 09/09/2015

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?