Think Computer Corporation v. California Department Of Business Oversight, et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 2015-1-SC-059236

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 10, 2021 at 8:56 PM ST (1.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Think Computer Corporation Think Computer Corporation, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo California Department Of Business Oversight, Defendant
No Logo McQuinn, Michael P, Defendant
Case Type Small Claims $0 - $1500
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Case Purged
(Case dimissed over one year.)
    Blank 5 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party
    SC Decl:Authority to Represent; Decision = M; Closed = 04/24/2015
      Blank 4 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None Request: Postponement (Small Claims)
      SC Req:Continuance/After Service
        Blank 3 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
        Cert Mail Service.; Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc
          Blank 2 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
          Cert Mail Service.; Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc
            Blank 1 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Plaintiff's Claim-$1,500 or Less
            SC Plaintiff Claim $0-$1500; Decision = M; Closed = 01/30/2015

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 84 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?