City of Berlin, NH v. Purdue Pharma L.P.
Federal Court Proceeding Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-op-46040
District Judge Dan Aaron Polster, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 15, 2019 at 6:24 PM DT (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo City of Berlin, NH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Raiche Vogelman Barry & Slawsky PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P. Slawsky +1 603 669 7070 +1 603 669 7080 dslawsky@nixonraiche.com
v.
No Logo Actavis Inc., Defendant
No Logo ACTAVIS LLC, Defendant
No Logo Actavis Pharma, Inc., Defendant
Allergan PLC Allergan PLC, Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc. Cardinal Health, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Acusphere, Inc.
No Logo CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, Defendant
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc. Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Johnson & Johnson, Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant
Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Defendant
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant
No Logo Ride Aid of Maryland Inc, Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Defendant
Wal-mart, Inc. Wal-mart, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Watson Laboratories, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 245 - Real Property: Tort Product Liability
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New Hampshire. Case number 1:18-cv-00721. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/05/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Transfer Case (District)
      ORDER MDL FINAL ORDER case is transferred to Northern District of Ohio for proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407. (vln) [Transferred from nhd on 9/5/2018.] (Entered: 09/05/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ORDER MDL No. 1 re: conditional transfer to Northern District of Ohio. Order is not effective until filed in the transferee court. MDL No. 2804. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 9/26/2018. (ko) [Transferred from nhd on 9/5/2018.] (Entered: 08/28/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MDL - Notice of Filing, copy of the docket sheet, and a copy of the complaint sent to the MDL Panel for review. MDL Follow Up Deadline set for 10/22/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Public Docket Sheet) (mc) [Transferred from nhd on 9/5/2018.] (Entered: 08/21/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Notice of Lawsuit/Waivers issued electronically as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Ride-Aid of Maryland, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waivers and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: # 1 Notice ECF) (mc) [Transferred from nhd on 9/5/2018.] (Entered: 08/21/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NEW CASE/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1698653 filed by City of Berlin. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Notices and Waivers)(Slawsky, David) [Transferred from nhd on 9/5/2018.] (Entered: 08/17/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 19 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?