ALVERSON v. HINRICHS
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 1986-1-CV-616787

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 2, 2018 at 6:16 AM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alverson, Norma, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Koshiba Agena & Kubota

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles A. Price cprice@koshibalaw.com
No Logo Alverson, Robert W., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles A. Price cprice@koshibalaw.com
v.
No Logo Hinrichs Jr., Bert K., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clayton W Brunsell +1 510 748 0581
No Logo Hinrichs Realty, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clayton W Brunsell +1 510 748 0581
No Logo Hinrichs, Jay L., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clayton W Brunsell +1 510 748 0581
Case Type Breach of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 6/28/2003, Entered: None Document: Other
ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type -; BRUNSELL, CLAYTON W.; 1330 BROADWAY, SUITE 1700; OAKLAND, CA. 94612; (510) 836-1866; Legacy Name = Attorney Information; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
    Blank 7 Filed: 6/28/2003, Entered: None Document: Other
    ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type -; BRUNSELL, CLAYTON W.; 1330 BROADWAY, SUITE 1700; OAKLAND, CA. 94612; (510) 836-1866; Legacy Name = Attorney Information; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
      Blank 6 Filed: 6/28/2003, Entered: None Document: Other
      ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type -; BRUNSELL, CLAYTON W.; 1330 BROADWAY, SUITE 1700; OAKLAND, CA. 94612; (510) 836-1866; Legacy Name = Attorney Information; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
        Blank 5 Filed: 6/28/2003, Entered: None Document: Other
        ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type -; PRICE, CHARLES A.; P.O. BOX 6338; INCLINE VILLAGE, NEVADA 89450; (702) 831-7725; Legacy Name = Attorney Information; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
          Blank 4 Filed: 6/28/2003, Entered: None Document: Other
          ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type -; PRICE, CHARLES A.; P.O. BOX 6338; INCLINE VILLAGE, NEVADA 89450; (702) 831-7725; Legacy Name = Attorney Information; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
            Blank 3 Filed: 6/28/2003, Entered: None Not Active
            Case data converted on 06/28/2003; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
              Blank 2 Filed: 4/23/1991, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
              ** CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT/PAYMENT TO BE MADE; UNTIL 5-15-92 **; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                Blank 1 Filed: 11/13/1990, Entered: None Memorandum-At-Issue
                AT-ISSUE MEMO: C. PRICE P/J; 5 DAYS; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 2 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?