United States v. Approximately $13,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Federal Court Proceeding California Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:18-mc-00128-MCE-CKD

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 30, 2018 at 1:36 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Civil Miscellaneous Case
Nature of Suit Drug Related Seizure of Property
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/23/18 EXTENDING the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture to 11/26/18. (Becknal, R)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/26/2018 ACCORDINLY the parties agree that the deadline by which the U.S. shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture shall be EXTENDED to 10/25/2018.(Reader, L)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/6/2018 ORDERING that the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture shall be EXTENDED to 9/25/2018.(Reader, L)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 0 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?