City of Demorest, Georgia v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-00161
District Judge Richard W. Story, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 2, 2018 at 6:44 AM DT (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo City of Demorest, Georgia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tate Law Group, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark A. Tate +1 912 234 3030 +1 912 234 9700 marktate@tatelawgroup.com
v.
No Logo ACTAVIS LLC, Defendant
No Logo Actavis Pharma, Inc., Defendant
Allergan PLC Allergan PLC, Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc. Cardinal Health, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Acusphere, Inc.
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Johnson & Johnson, Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC Mallinckrodt PLC, Defendant
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Noramco, Inc., Defendant
Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant
No Logo THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., Defendant
No Logo Watson Laboratories, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Andrx Corp
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1964
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-56 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio. Case assigned to Judge Dan A. Polster. (Entered: 10/02/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION for Extension of Time to Provide Governmental Plaintiff Fact Sheet with Brief In Support by City of Demorest, Georgia. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(dgr) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      COMPLAINT filed by City of Demorest, Georgia. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8131933) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/07/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 28 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?