Clancy v. Vacationaire Estates, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:18-cv-02249
District Judge John R. Tunheim, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 3, 2019 at 1:53 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1964
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 15 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Nicole L. Clancy, Timothy J. Clancy, Clancy's on Island Lake Inc. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kirscher, Bradley) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    (Text-Only) Notice to Attorney regarding Dispositive Motions briefing schedule: All dispositive motions must comply with Local Rule 7.1(c). Responses to dispositive motions shall be filed with the Court on or before 21 days after the service of the supporting memorandum to the original motion. Replies to responsive briefs shall be filed 14 days after the service of the response to the dispositive motion. Upon the motion being fully briefed and filed, counsel for the moving party shall email Chief Judge Tunheims chambers at Tunheim_Chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov to request a hearing date. Upon receiving from Chief Judge Tunheims Courtroom Deputy a hearing date, time and location, the moving party shall file the amended notice of hearing at that time. (HAZ) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel E Gustafson on behalf of Craig Bingen, Donald L. and Sandra S. Flamm Community Property Trust, the, Daniel Russ Elsey, Dena Ann Flamm, Donald L. Flamm, Eric Phillip Flamm, Richard Joseph Jungwirth, Todd Joel Jungwirth, Vacationaire Estates, Inc.. (Gustafson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE of Appearance by Eric S Taubel on behalf of Craig Bingen, Donald L. and Sandra S. Flamm Community Property Trust, the, Daniel Russ Elsey, Dena Ann Flamm, Donald L. Flamm, Eric Phillip Flamm, Richard Joseph Jungwirth, Todd Joel Jungwirth, Vacationaire Estates, Inc.. (Taubel, Eric) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Sung-Yun K Smith on behalf of Craig Bingen, Donald L. and Sandra S. Flamm Community Property Trust, the, Daniel Russ Elsey, Dena Ann Flamm, Donald L. Flamm, Eric Phillip Flamm, Richard Joseph Jungwirth, Todd Joel Jungwirth, Vacationaire Estates, Inc.. (Smith, Catherine Sung-Yun) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J Nordin on behalf of Craig Bingen, Donald L. and Sandra S. Flamm Community Property Trust, the, Daniel Russ Elsey, Dena Ann Flamm, Donald L. Flamm, Eric Phillip Flamm, Richard Joseph Jungwirth, Todd Joel Jungwirth, Vacationaire Estates, Inc.. (Nordin, Daniel) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re 15 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Craig Bingen, Donald L. and Sandra S. Flamm Community Property Trust, the, Daniel Russ Elsey, Dena Ann Flamm, Donald L. Flamm, Eric Phillip Flamm, Richard Joseph Jungwirth, Todd Joel Jungwirth, Vacationaire Estates, Inc..(Smith, Catherine Sung-Yun) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re 15 Motion to Dismiss/General, filed by Craig Bingen, Donald L. and Sandra S. Flamm Community Property Trust, the, Daniel Russ Elsey, Dena Ann Flamm, Donald L. Flamm, Eric Phillip Flamm, Richard Joseph Jungwirth, Todd Joel Jungwirth, Vacationaire Estates, Inc..(Smith, Catherine Sung-Yun) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  AFFIDAVIT of Eric S. Taubel in SUPPORT OF 15 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Craig Bingen, Donald L. and Sandra S. Flamm Community Property Trust, the, Daniel Russ Elsey, Dena Ann Flamm, Donald L. Flamm, Eric Phillip Flamm, Richard Joseph Jungwirth, Todd Joel Jungwirth, Vacationaire Estates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-C)(Smith, Catherine Sung-Yun) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 15 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Craig Bingen, Donald L. and Sandra S. Flamm Community Property Trust, the, Daniel Russ Elsey, Dena Ann Flamm, Donald L. Flamm, Eric Phillip Flamm, Richard Joseph Jungwirth, Todd Joel Jungwirth, Vacationaire Estates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Smith, Catherine Sung-Yun) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 15 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Date and time to be determined. (Smith, Catherine Sung-Yun) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Craig Bingen, Donald L. and Sandra S. Flamm Community Property Trust, the, Daniel Russ Elsey, Dena Ann Flamm, Donald L. Flamm, Eric Phillip Flamm, Richard Joseph Jungwirth, Todd Joel Jungwirth, Vacationaire Estates, Inc.. (Smith, Catherine Sung-Yun) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          TEXT ONLY ORDER -canceling hearing. Pursuant to Docket No. 13, the hearing set for September 17, 2018, is hereby CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 9/11/2018. (VLM) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for extension of time to answerCourt Filing
                            ORDER denying as moot 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; the relief requested in Defendants Letter, [Docket No. 11], is GRANTED; Defendants shall have an extension of time until September 20, 2018, in which to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint; and Defendants Motion for Extension of Time to Respond, [Docket No. 5], is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 9/11/2018. (VLM) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint 11 Letter to Magistrate Judge. (Smith, Catherine Sung-Yun) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Vacationaire Estates, Inc. . (Smith, Catherine Sung-Yun) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  AFFIDAVIT of Bradley Kirscher in OPPOSITION TO 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, filed by Nicole L. Clancy, Timothy J. Clancy, Clancy's on Island Lake Inc.(Kirscher, Bradley) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, filed by Nicole L. Clancy, Timothy J. Clancy, Clancy's on Island Lake Inc. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kirscher, Bradley) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, filed by Craig Bingen, Donald L. and Sandra S. Flamm Community Property Trust, the, Daniel Russ Elsey, Dena Ann Flamm, Donald L. Flamm, Eric Phillip Flamm, Richard Joseph Jungwirth, Todd Joel Jungwirth, Vacationaire Estates, Inc..(Smith, Catherine Sung-Yun) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, : Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (DUL) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Smith, Catherine Sung-Yun) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, filed by Craig Bingen, Donald L. and Sandra S. Flamm Community Property Trust, the, Daniel Russ Elsey, Dena Ann Flamm, Donald L. Flamm, Eric Phillip Flamm, Richard Joseph Jungwirth, Todd Joel Jungwirth, Vacationaire Estates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Smith, Catherine Sung-Yun) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, filed by Craig Bingen, Donald L. and Sandra S. Flamm Community Property Trust, the, Daniel Russ Elsey, Dena Ann Flamm, Donald L. Flamm, Eric Phillip Flamm, Richard Joseph Jungwirth, Todd Joel Jungwirth, Vacationaire Estates, Inc.. (Smith, Catherine Sung-Yun) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Summons Issued as to Craig Bingen, Donald L. and Sandra S. Flamm Community Property Trust, the, Daniel Russ Elsey, Dena Ann Flamm, Donald L. Flamm, Eric Phillip Flamm, Richard Joseph Jungwirth, Todd Joel Jungwirth, Vacationaire Estates, Inc.. (kt) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Sixth Div Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 18-cv-2249 JRT/LIB. (kt) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Clancy's on Island Lake Inc. (Kirscher, Bradley) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6266114) filed by Clancy's on Island Lake Inc, Nicole L. Clancy, Timothy J. Clancy. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A to J, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kirscher, Bradley) Modified text on 8/1/2018 (MGV). (Entered: 07/31/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 11 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?