JOHNS v. SESSIONS
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-40106
Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 2, 2018 at 9:10 AM DT (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Deepti Vitthal BHAKTA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Curran & Berger LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Megan E. Kludt +1 413 584 3232 megan@curranberger.com
No Logo Gregory David JOHNS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Curran & Berger LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Megan E. Kludt +1 413 584 3232 megan@curranberger.com
v.
Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III, Defendant
Officially listed as "JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS"
United States Department of Justice Attorney General, United States Department of Justice, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018
United States of America Attorney General, United States of America, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018
Nielsen, Kirstjen Nielsen, Kirstjen, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kirstjen M NIELSEN"
No Logo Lewis LUKENS, Defendant
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Richard POMPEO"
No Logo Robert Wood JOHNSON IV, Defendant
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 702
Nature of Suit 465 - Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Summons Issued as to Robert Wood JOHNSON IV, Lewis LUKENS, Kirstjen M NIELSEN, Michael Richard POMPEO, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7187343 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Deepti Vitthal BHAKTA. (Attachments: # 1 MA Category Form, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet MA Civil Cover Sheet)(Kludt, Megan) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 14 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?