Dwight v. Kemp
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02869
District Judge Richard W. Story, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 23, 2019 at 2:49 AM DT (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Benjamin Dotson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Krevolin Horst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Halsey G. Knapp, Jr. +1 404 888 9700 +1 404 888 9577 hknapp@khlawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Adam Martin Sparks +1 404 888 9700 sparks@khlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Marc Erik Elias +1 202 628 6600 +1 202 434 1690 melias@perkinscoie.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Abha Khanna +1 206 359 8312 akhanna@perkinscoie.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Uzoma Nkwonta +1 202 654 6200 unkwonta@perkinscoie.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bruce Van Spiva +1 202 654 6203 +1 202 654 9664 bspiva@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Hudman Evans, Sr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Krevolin Horst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Halsey G. Knapp, Jr. +1 404 888 9700 +1 404 888 9577 hknapp@khlawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Adam Martin Sparks +1 404 888 9700 sparks@khlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Marc Erik Elias +1 202 628 6600 +1 202 434 1690 melias@perkinscoie.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Abha Khanna +1 206 359 8312 akhanna@perkinscoie.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Uzoma Nkwonta +1 202 654 6200 unkwonta@perkinscoie.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bruce Van Spiva +1 202 654 6203 +1 202 654 9664 bspiva@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Marion Warren, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Krevolin Horst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Halsey G. Knapp, Jr. +1 404 888 9700 +1 404 888 9577 hknapp@khlawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Adam Martin Sparks +1 404 888 9700 sparks@khlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Marc Erik Elias +1 202 628 6600 +1 202 434 1690 melias@perkinscoie.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Abha Khanna +1 206 359 8312 akhanna@perkinscoie.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Uzoma Nkwonta +1 202 654 6200 unkwonta@perkinscoie.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bruce Van Spiva +1 202 654 6203 +1 202 654 9664 bspiva@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Pamelia Dwight, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Krevolin Horst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Halsey G. Knapp, Jr. +1 404 888 9700 +1 404 888 9577 hknapp@khlawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Adam Martin Sparks +1 404 888 9700 sparks@khlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Marc Erik Elias +1 202 628 6600 +1 202 434 1690 melias@perkinscoie.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Abha Khanna +1 206 359 8312 akhanna@perkinscoie.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Uzoma Nkwonta +1 202 654 6200 unkwonta@perkinscoie.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bruce Van Spiva +1 202 654 6203 +1 202 654 9664 bspiva@perkinscoie.com
v.
Kemp, Brian P. Kemp, Brian P., Defendant
Officially listed as "Brian Kemp"

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of RONALD J STAY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cristina Correia +1 404 656 6676 ccorreia@law.ga.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Ahern Monyak +1 404 463 0816 +1 404 651 6920 emonyak@law.ga.gov
Citation Section 52 U.S.C. § 20501
Nature of Suit 441 - Civil Rights: Voting
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time complete expert witness disclosures by Brian Kemp. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Expert Disclosures by Benjamin Dotson, Pamelia Dwight, Hudman Evans, Sr, Marion Warren.(Nkwonta, Uzoma) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories by Brian Kemp.(Belinfante, Joshua) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
        NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan P. Tyson on behalf of Brian Kemp (Tyson, Bryan) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Benjamin Dotson, Pamelia Dwight, Hudman Evans, Sr, Marion Warren.(Nkwonta, Uzoma) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER: The Scheduling Order 26 entered September 12, 2018, is hereby VACATED, and the following Scheduling Order is entered in its stead. The Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan 22 submitted by the parties is accepted, except as modified below. Discovery Period: September 4, 2018-March 29, 2019. See Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 09/13/2018. (dgr) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
              ---VACATED PER 27 ORDER---SCHEDULING ORDER: re: 22 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/12/18. (jpa) Modified on 9/13/2018 (dgr). (Entered: 09/13/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None statementCourt Filing
                STATEMENT Regarding Assignment of Three-Judge Panel by Benjamin Dotson, Pamelia Dwight, Hudman Evans, Sr, Marion Warren. (Nkwonta, Uzoma) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Certificate of service
                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Material by Benjamin Dotson, Pamelia Dwight, Hudman Evans, Sr, Marion Warren.(Nkwonta, Uzoma)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Initial Disclosures
                    Initial Disclosures by Brian Kemp.(Correia, Cristina)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan
                      JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Benjamin Dotson, Pamelia Dwight, Hudman Evans, Sr, Marion Warren. (Nkwonta, Uzoma)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: 8/17/2018 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Planning Report and Initial Disclosures. The Court hereby GRANTS the Joint Motion and ORDERS that the parties shall have through and including September 4, 2018, to file their Joint Planning Report and Initial Disclosures. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 08/17/2018. (dgr)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None MOTION for Extension of Time
                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Planning Report and Initial Disclosures by Benjamin Dotson, Pamelia Dwight, Hudman Evans, Sr, Marion Warren. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sparks, Adam) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                            ORDER denying as moot 13 Motion to Dismiss in light of the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 8/9/18. (jpa) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                              ANSWER to 14 Amended Complaint by Brian Kemp. Discovery ends on 12/31/2018.(Correia, Cristina) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for extension of time to answerCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the 14 Amended Complaint. Brian Kemp Answer due 8/3/2018. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 07/24/2018. (dgr) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None motion for extension of time to file answer
                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Brian Kemp. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Monyak, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 14 Amended Complaint, filed by Benjamin Dotson, Pamelia Dwight, Hudman Evans, Sr, Marion Warren (Sparks, Adam) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brian Kemp filed by Benjamin Dotson, Hudman Evans, Sr, Pamelia Dwight, Marion Warren.(Sparks, Adam) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                        MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Brian Kemp. (Attachments: # 1 Brief 2011 Georgia Congressional Districts, # 2 Exhibit 2011 Georgia Congressional Districts)(Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Leave of Absence
                                          Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): July 6, 2018-July 25, 2018, by Cristina Correia. (Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Notice of filingCourt Filing
                                            COURT NOTICE of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Cristina Correia on behalf of Brian Kemp (Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 2 Electronic Summons Issued, 1 Complaint, by Benjamin Dotson, Pamelia Dwight, Hudman Evans, Sr, Marion Warren.(Sparks, Adam) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Leave of Absence
                                                  Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 29-July 9 2018, October 18-19 2018, October 31 2018, November 6-7 2018, November 21-26 2018, December 24 2018-January 2 2019, by Adam Martin Sparks. (Sparks, Adam) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                    APPLICATION for Admission of Uzoma Nkwonta Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7951167)by Benjamin Dotson, Pamelia Dwight, Hudman Evans, Sr, Marion Warren. (Sparks, Adam) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                      APPLICATION for Admission of Marc E. Elias Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7951146)by Benjamin Dotson, Pamelia Dwight, Hudman Evans, Sr, Marion Warren. (Sparks, Adam) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                        APPLICATION for Admission of Bruce V. Spiva Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7951116)by Benjamin Dotson, Pamelia Dwight, Hudman Evans, Sr, Marion Warren. (Sparks, Adam) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                          APPLICATION for Admission of Abha Khanna Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7951047)by Benjamin Dotson, Pamelia Dwight, Hudman Evans, Sr, Marion Warren. (Sparks, Adam) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Order of recusalCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Mark H. Cohen recused. Case reassigned to Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. for all further proceedings NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:18-cv-02869-WSD. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 6/14/18. (bnw) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued
                                                              Electronic Summons Issued as to Brian Kemp. (bnw) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                COMPLAINT filed by Benjamin Dotson, Hudman Evans, Sr., Pamelia Dwight, Marion Warren. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-7941957) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Submission of 32 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time complete expert witness disclosures, to District Judge Richard W. Story. (rsg)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Submission to District Judge
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Submission of the 13 MOTION to Dismiss to District Judge Richard W. Story. (aaq)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Case Reassigned to Judge Richard W. Story. Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:18-cv-02869-RWS. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (dgr)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            ORDER (by docket entry only) granting attorney Abha Khanna's 4, attorney Bruce V. Spiva's 5, attorney Marc E. Elias's 6, and attorney Uzoma Nkwonta's 7 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Benjamin Dotson, Pamelia Dwight, Hudman Evans, Sr, and Marion Warren. Ordered by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 6/21/2018. (bgt)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Marc E. Elias Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7951146). Attorney Marc E. Elias added appearing on behalf of Benjamin Dotson, Pamelia Dwight, Hudman Evans, Sr., Marion Warren (pmb)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Uzoma Nkwonta Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7951167). Attorney Uzoma Nkwonta added appearing on behalf of Benjamin Dotson, Pamelia Dwight, Hudman Evans, Sr., Marion Warren (pmb)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Approval of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Bruce V. Spiva Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7951116). Attorney Bruce V. Spiva added appearing on behalf of Benjamin Dotson, Pamelia Dwight, Hudman Evans, Sr., Marion Warren (pmb)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Order on Application for Admission PHV
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      ORDER (by docket entry only) granting attorney Abha Khanna's 4, attorney Bruce V. Spiva's 5, attorney Marc E. Elias's 6, and attorney Uzoma Nkwonta's 7 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Benjamin Dotson, Pamelia Dwight, Hudman Evans, Sr, and Marion Warren. Ordered by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 6/21/2018. (bgt)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 30 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?