Temporary Time Capital Corp. - Adversary Proceeding
Bankruptcy Case New York Southern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 01-03575
District Judge Robert D. Drain, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 2, 2018 at 4:41 PM EDT (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Savitt Metropolitan, LLC, On Duty Metropolitan, LLC, On Duty Metropolitan Connecticut, LLC, On Duty Metropolitan Ohio, LLC, On Duty Metropolitan Massachusetts, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown Raysman, et al LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Lawrence P. Gottesman +1 212 895 2000 +1 212 895 2900
LEAD ATTORNEY Jean L. Schmidt +1 212 895 2000 +1 212 895 2900
No Logo Temporary Time Capital Corp., Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Ian Beningsohn, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Anderson Kill & Olick, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Linda Gerstel +1 212 278 1388 +1 212 278 1733 lgerstel@andersonkill.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gupta, Chandan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Roy Babitt +1 212 278 1874 +1 212 278 1733
No Logo Kevin Kelly, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Anderson Kill & Olick, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Linda Gerstel +1 212 278 1388 +1 212 278 1733 lgerstel@andersonkill.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gupta, Chandan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Roy Babitt +1 212 278 1874 +1 212 278 1733
No Logo On Duty Staffing, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Anderson Kill & Olick, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Linda Gerstel +1 212 278 1388 +1 212 278 1733 lgerstel@andersonkill.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gupta, Chandan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Roy Babitt +1 212 278 1874 +1 212 278 1733
No Logo Prestige Capital Corp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Anderson Kill & Olick, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Linda Gerstel +1 212 278 1388 +1 212 278 1733 lgerstel@andersonkill.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gupta, Chandan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Roy Babitt +1 212 278 1874 +1 212 278 1733
Nature of Suit 434 - Injunctive Relief
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Answer to Complaint (Related Doc # 1) filed by Linda Gerstel on behalf of Ian Beningsohn, Kevin Kelly, On Duty Staffing, Inc., Prestige Capital Corp.. (Gerstel, Linda) (Entered: 12/10/2001)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Order Signed On: 11/26/2001 Granting Motion For Permanent Injunction (Related Doc # 2). (Li, Dorothy) Modified on 11/27/2001 (McFadden, Darryl) (Entered: 11/26/2001)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. filed by Roy Babitt on behalf of Ian Beningsohn, Kevin Kelly, On Duty Staffing, Inc., Prestige Capital Corp.. (Babitt, Roy) (Entered: 11/20/2001)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/18/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Certificate of Service (related document(s)4, 5, 6) filed by Roy Babitt on behalf of Ian Beningsohn, Kevin Kelly, On Duty Staffing, Inc., Prestige Capital Corp.. (Babitt, Roy) (Entered: 11/18/2001)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/18/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Declaration of Harvey L. Kaminski (related document(s)4) filed by Roy Babitt on behalf of Ian Beningsohn, Kevin Kelly, On Duty Staffing, Inc., Prestige Capital Corp.. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit) (Babitt, Roy) (Entered: 11/18/2001)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/18/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Declaration (Certification) of Kevin Kelly (related document(s)4) filed by Roy Babitt on behalf of Ian Beningsohn, Kevin Kelly, On Duty Staffing, Inc., Prestige Capital Corp.. (Babitt, Roy) (Entered: 11/18/2001)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/18/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Memorandum of Law of Defendants Kevin Kelly, Ian Beningsohn, and On Duty Staffing, Inc. in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Roy Babitt on behalf of Ian Beningsohn, Kevin Kelly, On Duty Staffing, Inc., Prestige Capital Corp.. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit) (Babitt, Roy) (Entered: 11/18/2001)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/15/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Ian Beningsohn Answer Due: 12/17/2001; Kevin Kelly Answer Due: 12/17/2001; On Duty Staffing, Inc. Answer Due: 12/17/2001; Prestige Capital Corp. Answer Due: 12/17/2001. Filed by Clerk's Office, U.S. Bankruptcy Court. with Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/29/2002 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 610 (JLG), (Bullock, Nathaniel) (Entered: 11/15/2001)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/15/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (by Order to Show Cause) filed by Lawrence P. Gottesman on behalf of Savitt Metropolitan, LLC, On Duty Metropolitan, LLC, On Duty Metropolitan Connecticut, LLC, On Duty Metropolitan Ohio, LLC, On Duty Metropolitan Massachusetts, LLC, Temporary Time Capital Corp.. (Attachments: 1 Pleading Memo of Law In Support of TRO and Preliminary Injunction2 Appendix to Memo of Law3 Certification of Mario Molano4 Molano Cert. Exhibits 1-75 Certification of Dominique DiMaggio6 Affidavit of Jean L. Schmidt) (Gottesman, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/15/2001)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Complaint against Prestige Capital Corp., Kevin Kelly, Ian Beningsohn, On Duty Staffing, Inc. by Savitt Metropolitan, LLC, et al., and Temporary Time Capital, et al. (Debtors) Filed by Lawrence P. Gottesman, Lawrence P. Gottesman, Jean L. Schmidt, Savitt Metropolitan, LLC, On Duty Metropolitan, LLC, On Duty Metropolitan Connecticut, LLC, On Duty Metropolitan Ohio, LLC, On Duty Metropolitan Massachusetts, LLC on behalf of Savitt Metropolitan, LLC, On Duty Metropolitan, LLC, On Duty Metropolitan Connecticut, LLC, On Duty Metropolitan Ohio, LLC, On Duty Metropolitan Massachusetts, LLC, Temporary Time Capital Corp.. (Gottesman, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/14/2001)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 2 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?