Montenegro v. 1 World Trade Center, L.L.C.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-06018
District Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 2, 2018 at 7:07 PM EDT (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Martha Montenengro, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, (Inactive), LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY William Joseph Dubanevich +1 212 267 3700 wdubanevich@napolibern.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC-New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher R. LoPalo +1 212 267 3700 +1 212 587 0031 clopalo@napolilaw.com
No Logo Otto Montenegro, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, (Inactive), LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY William Joseph Dubanevich +1 212 267 3700 wdubanevich@napolibern.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC-New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher R. LoPalo +1 212 267 3700 +1 212 587 0031 clopalo@napolilaw.com
v.
No Logo 1 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 1 WTC Holdings L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 2 WTC Holdings L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 4 WTC Holdings L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 5 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 5 WTC Holdings L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 7 World Trade Company, L.P., Defendant
No Logo A Russo Wrecking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Abatement Professionals (contractor), Defendant
No Logo ABM, Defendant
No Logo ABM Indutries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo ABM Janitorial Northeast, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Abscope Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo AMEC Construction Management, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Applied Environmental Inc. (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Atlantic Heydt Corp., Defendant
No Logo Bechtel Construction, Inc., Defendant
Bechtel Corporation Bechtel Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Bechtel Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Berkel & Company Contractors, Inc., Defendant
No Logo BFP Tower C Co., L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Boston Properties, Defendant
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Breeze Carting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Breeze National Inc., Defendant
No Logo Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Defendant
No Logo Bristol Environmental Inc (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.C., Defendant
No Logo C& D FireProofing & Plastering Corp., Defendant
No Logo C.B. Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Canron Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Cantor Seinuk Group, Defendant
No Logo Catamount Environmental Inc. (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Certified Fence Corp., Defendant
No Logo Civetta-Cousins JV, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Clayton Environmental Consultants, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Harris, Beach Law Firm - Pittsford Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Abbie Eliasberg Fuchs +1 212 313 5408 +1 212 687 0659 afuchs@harrisbeach.com
No Logo Component Assembly Systems, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Comprehensive Environmental Service Co. (contractor), Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Contaminant Control Inc. (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Coordinated Metals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cord Contracting Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Covino Environmental Associates Inc. (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Craig Test Boring Company Inc., Defendant
No Logo Criterion Laboratories Inc. (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Criticom International Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., Defendant
No Logo D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., Defendant
No Logo Dakota Demo-Tech, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Darling Asbestos Disposal Company Inc. (contractor), Defendant
No Logo DCM Erectors, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Diamond Point Excavating Corp., Defendant
No Logo Diego Construction, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Diversified Carting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Diversified Environmental Corporation (contractor), Defendant
No Logo DMT Enterprise, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Dynaserv Industries, Inc. (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle One Roofing Contractors Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle Scaffolding Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo EJ Davies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo En-Tech Corp., Defendant
No Logo Environmental Products and Services Inc. (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Environmental Services and Technologies, Inc (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Environmental Testing Inc. (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo ET Environmental, Defendant
No Logo Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC), Defendant
No Logo Ewell W. Finley, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Executive Medical Services, P.C., Defendant
No Logo F&G Mechanical, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Fleet Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Frank Micelli, Jr. Contracting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo FTI Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, L.L.P., Defendant
No Logo Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, P.L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Hallen Welding Service, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Helmsman Management Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo HGC Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo High Rise-Hoisting and Scaffolding, Inc., Defendant
No Logo High-Rise Electric, Inc., Defendant
No Logo HILLMANN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Robinson & Yablon, P.C

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Salvatore J. Calabrese +1 914 948 5700 +1 914 948 9612 salvatore.calabrese@admlaw.com
No Logo JP Equipment Rental Materials, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Laquila Construction Inc., Defendant
No Logo LaStrada General Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Defendant
No Logo Liberty Mutual Managed Care Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lockwood Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lucius Pitkin, Inc., Defendant
No Logo LVI Environmental Services Inc. (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo LVI Services Inc. (contractor), Defendant
No Logo LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, Defendant
No Logo Manafort Brothers, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Manafort Brothers Incorporated"
No Logo Marcor Remediation Inc. (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Meridian Construction Group, Defendant
No Logo Milro Associates Inc. (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Moody's Investors Service, Defendant
No Logo MRA Engineering, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Musco Sports Lighting, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Nacirema Industries Incorporated, Defendant
No Logo New York Crane & Equipment Corp., Defendant
No Logo Nicholson Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Norwich Laboratories (contractor), Defendant
No Logo NYC Industrial Development Agency, Defendant
No Logo Olympic Plumbing & Heating Corp., Defendant
No Logo Ove Arup & Partners, P.C., Defendant
No Logo PAR Environmental Corporation (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Parson Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pinnacle, Defendant
No Logo Pinnacle Environmental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Plaza Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Plaza Construction Management Corp., Defendant
No Logo Port Authority of New York & New Jersey, Defendant
No Logo Potomac Abatement Inc. (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Pro Safety Services L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo PT & L Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Regional Scaffolding & Hoisting Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rober Silman Associates, Defendant
No Logo Robert Errat, Defendant
No Logo Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Royal Environmental Inc. (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Royal GM, Inc., Defendant
No Logo SAB Trucking Inc., Defendant
No Logo Safeway Environmental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Seasons Industrial Contracting, Defendant
No Logo Sencam, Inc. (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Sheldrake Organization, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Silverite Contracting Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Development Corp., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Properties, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Properties, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC Facility Manager L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC Mgmt. Co., L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC Properties L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Simpson Gumpertz & Heger Inc., Defendant
No Logo Skidmore, Owing & Merrill L.L.P., Defendant
No Logo Specialty Service Contracting Inc. (Contractor), Defendant
No Logo Star Delta Electric, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Stier Anderson, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Survivair, Defendant
No Logo Syska and Hennessy (contractor), Defendant
No Logo Syska Hennessy Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Tellabs Operations, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Defendant
No Logo Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Defendant
No Logo Tishman Interiors Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Tishman Speyer Properties, Defendant
No Logo Tomasetti Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Torretta Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Total Safety Consulting, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Trio Asbestos Removal, Defendant
No Logo TTI Environmental Services, Inc (contractor), Defendant
No Logo Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Tully Construction Co Inc, Defendant
No Logo Tully Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Tully Environmental Inc., Defendant
No Logo Tully Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Turner Construction Co., Defendant
Turner Construction Company Turner Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Turner Construction International, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling (Joint Venture), Defendant
No Logo United States Rebar, Inc., Defendant
Verizon New York Inc. Verizon New York Inc., Defendant
No Logo Vollmer Associates L.L.P., Defendant
No Logo W HARRIS & SONS INC, Defendant
No Logo Weeks Marine, Inc., A Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., Defendant
No Logo WFP Tower D. Co., L.P., Defendant
No Logo Whitney Contracting Inc., Defendant
No Logo William F. Collins Architects, Defendant
No Logo William F. Collins, Architect (contractor), Defendant
No Logo Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp., Defendant
No Logo World Trade Center Properties L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Yannuzzi & Sons, Inc., Defendant
No Logo YONKERS CONTRACTING Company INC., Defendant
No Logo York Hunter Construction, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Ziegenfuss Drilling, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331pi
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Andrew William Amend on behalf of Office of New York State Attorney General Eric. T. Schneiderman. New Address: New York State Office of the Attorney General, 28 Liberty Street, New York, NY, 10005, 212-416-8022. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Amend, Andrew) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER COMPELLING SETTLEMENT MEDIATION CONFERENCES: that a settlement process is established for the remaining non-settled defendants, as identified on Exhibit A, in the 21-mc-102 docket. Counsel for plaintiffs and counsel for the non-settled defendants, along with representatives of their respective insurance carriers, who have the authority (but not the obligation) to settle as at the last made demand and/or offer, shall meet for settlement mediation conferences with the Special Masters. These mediation conferences will be held on February 25, 26, and 27, 2015; March 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 2015; and March 9, 10, 11, 12 and 13, 2015. The in-person settlement mediation conferences shall be held at the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, located at 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 in Courtroom 14D or such other rooms as shall be designated by the Court. The conference schedule is annexed hereto as Exhibit A; and as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/23/2015) As per chambers, Filed In Member Cases only: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(tn) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on (5014 AFFIRMATION of Daniel S. Corde in Opposition in case 1:21-mc-00102-AKH). ENDORSEMENT: Mr. Corde's responses are accepted, and the Court's Order to show cause (doc. no. 5006) is terminated as to the Jones Hirsch law firm. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/24/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(ft) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the parties' counsel, that the plaintiffs' time to respond to the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' claims for failure to prosecute, filed and served on May 24, 2013, originally set for June 7, 2013, shall be and hereby extended for 7 days, and thus shall be filed and served on or before Friday, June 14, 2013. The Defendants Reply papers shall be filed and served on or before Friday June 21, 2013., ( Responses due by 6/14/2013., Replies due by 6/21/2013.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/31/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(lmb) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          STIPULATION. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the parties' counsel, that the Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant NYSE Euronext to appear for depositions, that was filed and served on May 14, 2013 is resolved as follows: Defendant NYSE Euronext will produce Antoine P. Sultana, Managing Director, Global Real Estate and Corporate Services, for a deposition pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on June 3, 2013 at 10:00 AM at a location to be agreed upon by the parties. This deposition will continue day to day until completed. Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant NYSE Euronext to appear for depositions, that was filed and served on May 14, 2013 is withdrawn without prejudice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/20/2013). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al. (rjm) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/18/2013 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ann Hairston, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/31/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 2/22/2013 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ann Hairston, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/6/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION: Please take notice, that McGivney & Kluger, P.C. 80 Broad Street, 23rd Floor, New York, New York 10004, has been substituted as counsel in place and stead of Callan, Koster, Brady & Brennan, LLP. as attorneys for defendants Hudson View East Condominium and Board of Managers of the Hudson View East Condominium in the 21 MC 102 Docket for the Civil Action Numbers listed in Exhibit "A" attached hereto. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/7/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(js) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/16/2013 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Drevis, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/22/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/4/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/2/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/16/2013 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Drevis, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/19/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/28/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/26/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      PROTECTIVE ORDER NO. 1 GOVERNING THE DISCLOSURE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND CONFIDENTIAL INSURANCE INFORMATION...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...(Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/2/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(djc) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/11/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/11/2012 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/7/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/18/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 8/2/2011 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/10/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2011.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              MEMO-ENDORSEMENT: re: in case 1:04-cv-05338-AKH; denying (4073) Motion for Reconsideration in case 1:21-mc-00102-AKH. ENDORSEMENT: The motion is denied. These law suits, approximately 2,000 in number, cannot be prosecuted effectively unless liaison counsels direct costs are equitably shared on a current basis. My order of August 19, 2011 so provides. Movants argument based on consensus and inequitable and partial sharing is rejected. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/29/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(pl) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 8/2/2011 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/19/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/29/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/28/2011.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 8/2/2011 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/19/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/29/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/28/2011.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT WITH TAYLOR RECYCLING AND DISMISSING CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE: The Court has been advised that Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel, Worby Groner Edelman & Napoli Bern, LLP, and counsel for Taylor Recycling, LLP, have reached a settlement of all claims against Taylor Recycling in the above-captioned cases. The Court has received a pair of stipulations to dismiss settled cases. I rule as follows. The Settlement with Taylor Recycling is Fair and Reasonable, and the Claims of the 1,802 Plaintiffs who Filed Proper Settlement Paperwork is Endorsed. The Complaints of 26 Derivative Plaintiffs who Alleged Claims Against Taylor Recycling, but who did not File Proper Settlement Paperwork, Are Dismissed Involuntarily for Failure to Prosecute. A group of Plaintiffs who had to cure their paperwork held claims against Taylor Recycling. I have been informed that 26 of these Plaintiffs have not cured the defects in their paperwork. Accordingly, I dismiss the complaints of these 26 Plaintiffs for failure to prosecute under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). The dismissals are with prejudice. The list of 26 Plaintiffs is attached to this Order. One final point deserves notice. Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel submitted a proposed stipulation dismissing these 26 Plaintiffs, which suggests the dismissals are voluntary, that is, specifically requested by each such Plaintiff. It seems that this is not the case. Liaison Counsel's stipulation and proposed order of dismissal is rejected, and is being returned. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/21/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(jpo) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from James E. Tyrrell, Jr. dated 1/19/2011 re: Requesting an extension of time to object to the terms contained in the Order Accepting Report of Special Counsel and Providing for Effectiveness of Settlement. ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/20/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(jpo) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER: On June 23, 2010, I entered Case Management Order Nos. 10, 7, and 2 in the 21 MC 100, 21 MC 102, and 21 MC 103 Consolidated Master Dockets, respectively. On October 27, 2010, I extended the potential expiration date of all three Case Management Orders to December 21, 2010. For the reasons stated on the record at the conference held on December 22, 2010, I hereby extend the December 21, 2010 deadline to February 2, 2011. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/28/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(db) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY ADOPTION/CHECK-OFF COMPLAINT Related to the Master Complaint 19 Complaint By Adoption/Check-Off Complaint against ABM, ABM Indutries, Inc., ABM Janitorial Northeast, Inc., AMEC Construction Management, Inc., Abscope Environmental, Inc., Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc., Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling L.L.C., Atlantic Heydt Corp., BFP Tower C Co., L.L.C., Bechtel Construction, Inc., Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Environmental, Inc., Berkel & Company Contractors, Inc., Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Boston Properties, Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Breeze Carting Corp., Breeze National Inc., Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.C., C& D FireProofing & Plastering Corp., C.B. Contracting Corp., Canron Construction Corp., Cantor Seinuk Group, Certified Fence Corp., Civetta-Cousins JV, L.L.C., Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc., Clayton Environmental Consultants, Component Assembly Systems, Inc., Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Coordinated Metals, Inc., Cord Contracting Co., Inc., Craig Test Boring Company Inc., Criticom International Corporation, Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., DCM Erectors, Inc., DMT Enterprise, Inc., Dakota Demo-Tech, Inc., Diamond Point Excavating Corp., Diego Construction, Inc., Diversified Carting, Inc., EJ Davies, Inc., ET Environmental, Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Eagle One Roofing Contractors, Inc., Eagle Scaffolding Co., Inc., En-Tech Corp., Robert Errat, Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC), Ewell W. Finley, P.C., Executive Medical Services, P.C., F&G Mechanical, Inc., FTI Trucking, Inc., Fleet Trucking, Inc., Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., Frank Micelli, Jr. Contracting, Inc., Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, L.L.P., Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, P.L.L.C., HGC Contracting Corp., HILLMANN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP, Hallen Welding Service, Inc., Helmsman Management Services, Inc., High Rise-Hoisting and Scaffolding, Inc., High-Rise Electric, Inc., JP Equipment Rental Materials, Inc., LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, LaStrada General Contracting Corp., Laquila Construction Inc., Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers, P.C., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Managed Care Inc., Lockwood, Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Lucius Pitkin, Inc., MRA Engineering, P.C., Manafort Brothers Incorporated, Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Meridian Construction Group, Moody's Investors Service, Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Musco Sports Lighting, L.L.C., NYC Industrial Development Agency, Nacirema Industries Incorporated, New York Crane & Equipment Corp., Nicholson Construction Company, Olympic Plumbing & Heating Corp., Ove Arup & Partners, P.C., PT & L Contracting Corp., Parson Group, Inc., Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Pinnacle, Pinnacle Environmental Corp., Plaza Construction Corp., Plaza Construction Management Corp., Port Authority of New York & New Jersey, Pro Safety Services L.L.C., Regional Scaffolding & Hoisting Co., Inc., Rober Silman Associates, Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Royal GM, Inc., SAB Trucking Inc., Safeway Environmental Corp., Seasons Industrial Contracting, Sheldrake Organization, Inc., Silverite Contracting Corporation, Silverstein Development Corp., Silverstein Properties, Silverstein Properties Inc., Silverstein WTC Facility Manager L.L.C., Silverstein WTC L.L.C., Silverstein WTC Mgmt. Co., L.L.C., Silverstein WTC Properties L.L.C., Simpson Gumpertz & Heger Inc., Skidmore, Owing & Merrill L.L.P., Star Delta Electric, Inc., Stier Anderson, L.L.C., Survivair, Syska Hennessy Group, Inc., Tellabs Operations, Inc., Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Tishman Interiors Corporation, Tishman Speyer Properties, Tomasetti Group, Inc., Torretta Trucking, Inc., Total Safety Consulting, L.L.C., Trio Asbestos Removal, Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Construction Company, Tully Environmental Inc., Tully Industries, Inc., Turner Construction Co., Turner Construction Company, Turner Construction International, L.L.C., Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling (Joint Venture), United States Rebar, Inc., Verizon New York Inc., Vollmer Associates L.L.P., W Harris & Sons Inc., WFP Tower D. Co., L.P., Weeks Marine, Inc., A Corporation, Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., Whitney Contracting Inc., William F. Collins Architects, Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp., World Trade Center Properties L.L.C., 1 WTC Holdings L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 2 WTC Holdings L.L.C., 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 WTC Holdings L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 5 WTC Holdings L.L.C., 5 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 7 World Trade Company, L.P., A Russo Wrecking, Inc., Yannuzzi & Sons, Inc., Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc., York Hunter Construction, L.L.C., Ziegenfuss Drilling, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Otto Montenegro, Martha Montenengro. Related document: 19 Complaint By Adoption/Check-Off Complaint filed by Otto Montenegro, Martha Montenengro.(ama) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER ADJOURNING STATUS CONFERENCE 11/18/10 Status Conference reset for 12/3/2010 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/3/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(cd) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              STIPULATION: It is hereby sitpulated and agreed by and between the parties, that with respect to the actions listed "Schedule A" attached hereto, that each claim, cross-claim and counter-claim asserted by and against Defendant Pinnacle Environmental Corp., only as to the claims being made as to the premises identified in the First Amended Master Complaint and individual; Check-off Complaint as 140 West Street, New York, NY 1007, shall be and are hereby discontinued without prejudice and without costs as to any party against the other. It is further stipulated and agreed that upon Amended Master Complaint and Amended Form Check-Off Complaint, Plaintiffs will remove all references to Defendant Pinnacle Environmental Corp. with regard to 140 West Street, New York, NY 10007. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/30/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(jpo) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT BY ADOPTION/CHECK-OFF COMPLAINT against defendants with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Otto Montenegro, Martha Montenengro.(mro) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 8/19/2010 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/9/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(jpo) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO ABSCOPE ENVIRONMENTAL INC. This order relates to: Cases listed in Exhibit A. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, CONSENTED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for the parties to the above-titled action, that whereas no party hereto is an infant, incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed or conservatee and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, the above entitled action be, and the same hereby is discontinued without prejudice as against defendant ABSCOPE ENVIRONMENTAL INC. only, without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/27/10) (rjm) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Syska Hennessy Group, Inc.. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Tellabs Operations, Inc.. (Avila, Allyson) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by William F. Collins Architects. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT ON NOTICE OF MOTION for Sanctions against the Worby Groner Edelman & Napoli Bern, LLP Firm in case 1:04-cv-05338-AKH; denying (3450) Motion for Sanctions in case 1:21-mc-00102-AKH. ENDORSEMENT: Motion for sanctions is denied. There has been no showing that a ruling in 21 MC 100 is applicable to litigation in 21 MC 102 or 21 MC 103. Defendants may consider filing a motion for injunction against plaintiff's splitting essentially the same courses of action: suing some defendants in federal court, and other defendants in state court. An Order to Show Course may be presented immediately following the oral arguments scheduled to be heard 7/28/09. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/24/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Tishman Interiors Corporation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-06018-AKH(Schwarz, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the parties' counsel, that the Defendant, Battery Park City Authority's time to submit a Reply to its Motion to Dismiss Complaint which was filed and served on May 14, 2009, shall be and hereby is extended until July 24, 2009. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/7/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  FIRST NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by HILLMANN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP. (Calabrese, Salvatore) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER, by and between the undersigned, the parties' counsel, that the plaintiffs' time to respond to the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaints on behalf of the Battery Park City Authority, filed and served on May 14, 2009, originally set for May 28, 2009, shall be and hereby is extended for 21 days, and thus shall be filed and served on or before Friday, June 19, 2009. SO ORDERED ( Responses due by 6/19/2009) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/28/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(jmi) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER. That the Defendant's motion to have Thomas R. Harrington, Esquire admitted to practice law in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York pro hac vice in connection with the above-captioned case is GRANTED. Counsel is directed to immediately apply for an ECF password at www.nysd.uscourts.gov and shall forward the pro hac vice fee to the Clerk of the Court. THIS DOCUMENT APPLIES TO ALL CASES IN THE WORLD TRADE CENTER LOWER MANHATTAN DISASTER SITE LITIGATION IN WHICH AIG REALTY, INC., AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC. AND AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL REALTY CORP. IS A DEFENDANT. Relates to 21mc102, 21mc103. granting (3250 in Case No. 21mc102) Motion for Thomas R. Harrington to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:21-mc-00102-AKH. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/19/09). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Abscope Environmental, Inc.. (Gallagher, Timothy) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Salvatore J. Calabrese on behalf of HILLMANN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP (Calabrese, Salvatore) (Entered: 04/06/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Clayton Environmental Consultants. (Eliasberg Fuchs, Abbie) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Abbie Lynn Eliasberg Fuchs on behalf of Clayton Environmental Consultants (Eliasberg Fuchs, Abbie) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                NOTICE of Adoption of Answer to Master Complaint. Document filed by Verizon New York Inc.. (Reisman, Michael) (Entered: 12/11/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE of ADOPTION (ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT). Document filed by HILLMANN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP. (Rosmarin, Sam) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Parson Group, Inc., Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Pinnacle, Pinnacle Environmental Corp., Plaza Construction Corp., Plaza Construction Management Corp., Port Authority of New York & New Jersey, Pro Safety Services L.L.C., PT & L Contracting Corp., Regional Scaffolding & Hoisting Co., Inc., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Rober Silman Associates, Royal GM, Inc., Robert Errat, Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., SAB Trucking Inc., Safeway Environmental Corp., Seasons Industrial Contracting, Sheldrake Organization, Inc., Silverite Contracting Corporation, Silverstein Development Corp., 4 WTC Holdings L.L.C., Silverstein Properties Inc., Silverstein Properties, Silverstein WTC Facility Manager L.L.C., Silverstein WTC L.L.C., Silverstein WTC Mgmt. Co., L.L.C., Silverstein WTC Properties L.L.C., Simpson Gumpertz & Heger Inc., Skidmore, Owing & Merrill L.L.P., Star Delta Electric, Inc., Stier Anderson, L.L.C., 5 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Survivair, Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Tishman Interiors Corporation, Tishman Speyer Properties, Tomasetti Group, Inc., Torretta Trucking, Inc., Total Safety Consulting, L.L.C., Trio Asbestos Removal, Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., 5 WTC Holdings L.L.C., Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Construction Company, Tully Environmental Inc., Tully Industries, Inc., Turner Construction Co., Turner Construction Company, Turner Construction International, L.L.C., Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling (Joint Venture), United States Rebar, Inc., Vollmer Associates L.L.P., 7 World Trade Company, L.P., W Harris & Sons Inc., Weeks Marine, Inc., A Corporation, Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., WFP Tower D. Co., L.P., Whitney Contracting Inc., Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp., World Trade Center Properties L.L.C., Yannuzzi & Sons, Inc., Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc., York Hunter Construction, L.L.C., A Russo Wrecking, Inc., Ziegenfuss Drilling, Inc., ABM, ABM Indutries, Inc., ABM Janitorial Northeast, Inc., AMEC Construction Management, Inc., Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc., Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling L.L.C., Atlantic Heydt Corp., Bechtel Construction, Inc., Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Environmental, Inc., Berkel & Company Contractors, Inc., BFP Tower C Co., L.L.C., Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Boston Properties, Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Breeze Carting Corp., Breeze National Inc., Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.C., C& D FireProofing & Plastering Corp., C.B. Contracting Corp., Canron Construction Corp., Cantor Seinuk Group, Certified Fence Corp., Civetta-Cousins JV, L.L.C., Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc., Component Assembly Systems, Inc., Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Coordinated Metals, Inc., Cord Contracting Co., Inc., Craig Test Boring Company Inc., Criticom International Corporation, Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., Dakota Demo-Tech, Inc., DCM Erectors, Inc., Diamond Point Excavating Corp., Diego Construction, Inc., Diversified Carting, Inc., DMT Enterprise, Inc., Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Eagle One Roofing Contractors, Inc., Eagle Scaffolding Co., Inc., EJ Davies, Inc., En-Tech Corp., ET Environmental, Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC), Ewell W. Finley, P.C., Executive Medical Services, P.C., F&G Mechanical, Inc., Fleet Trucking, Inc., Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., Frank Micelli, Jr. Contracting, Inc., 1 World Trade Center, L.L.C., FTI Trucking, Inc., Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, L.L.P., Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, P.L.L.C., Hallen Welding Service, Inc., Helmsman Management Services, Inc., HGC Contracting Corp., High-Rise Electric, Inc., High Rise-Hoisting and Scaffolding, Inc., JP Equipment Rental Materials, Inc., Laquila Construction Inc., 1 WTC Holdings L.L.C., LaStrada General Contracting Corp., Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers, P.C., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Managed Care Inc., Lockwood, Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Lucius Pitkin, Inc., LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, Manafort Brothers Incorporated, Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Meridian Construction Group, 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Moody's Investors Service, MRA Engineering, P.C., Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Musco Sports Lighting, L.L.C., Nacirema Industries Incorporated, New York Crane & Equipment Corp., NYC Industrial Development Agency, Nicholson Construction Company, Olympic Plumbing & Heating Corp., Ove Arup & Partners, P.C., 2 WTC Holdings L.L.C.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 587116)Document filed by Otto Montenegro, Martha Montenengro.(laq, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2006 (mbe, ). (Entered: 08/10/2006)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?