Jones v. Attorney Grievance

Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:97-cv-02878-WMN
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Gil W. Jones, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Attorney Grievance Commission of Maryland, Defendant
Attributes
Office Baltimore
Filed 8/21/1997
Jury Demand None
Demand $3000
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Baltimore City
Terminated 8/28/1997
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases 97-2450[], 0101-0038428-96[Dist. Ct. Balto City]
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, CLOSED
Timeline
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: 5/1/1998 Remark
Complete record on appeal returned to USDC. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 10/22/1997, Entered: 11/5/1997 USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
NOTICE of Docketing ROA from USCA Re: [5-1] appeal by Gil W. Jones USCA NUMBER: 97-2450 (Case Manager: Yevone Jeffreys) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 10/20/1997, Entered: 10/20/1997 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
Certified and transmitted record on appeal to U.S. Court of Appeals: [5-1] appeal by Gil W. Jones (Volume 1) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 10/20/1997, Entered: 10/20/1997 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
Notice of appeal and certified copy of docket to USCA: [5-1] appeal by Gil W. Jones (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 10/10/1997, Entered: 10/20/1997 Notice of Appeal
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Gil W. Jones . Fee Status: (IFP) Appeal record due on 11/9/97 (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 8/28/1997, Entered: 8/29/1997 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER "GRANTING" [2-1] motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; and "DISMISSING" this action without requireing service upon and response from the named defendants. ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 8/27/97; c/m & micro )) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 8/28/1997, Entered: 8/29/1997 MemorandumCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 8/27/97; c/m chambers ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 8/28/1997, Entered: 8/29/1997 Terminated Case
Case closed (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 8/21/1997, Entered: 8/22/1997, Terminated: 8/28/1997 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
MOTION with memorandum in support by Gil W. Jones to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and affidavit. (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 8/21/1997, Entered: 8/22/1997 Complaint
COMPLAINT and attachments filed; (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 8/21/1997, Entered: 8/22/1997 Remark
ABOVE PLEADINGS ARE ALL COPIES OF PAPERS FILED IN THE DISTRICT COURT OF MARYLAND FOR BALTIMORE CITY. (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 7 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?