HOLL v. BUCK

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 1992-1-CV-722005
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 2, 2018 at 9:45 PM EDT (6.5 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Holl, Richard, Plaintiff

Represented by Severson & Werson, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John B. Sullivan +1 415 398 3344 +1 415 956 0439 jbs@severson.com
v.
No Logo Buck, John, Defendant
Attributes
Case Type Other Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
Timeline
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 6/28/2003, Entered: None Document: Other
ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type -; SEVERSON & WERSON - SAN FRANCISCO; SULLIVAN, JOHN B.; ONE EMBARCADERO CENTER; SUITE 2600; SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94111; Legacy Name = Attorney Information; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 5 Filed: 6/28/2003, Entered: None Not Active
Case data converted on 06/28/2003; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request RequestSpace
Blank 4 Filed: 3/18/1993, Entered: None other
JUDGMENT ON STIOULATION FOR ENTRY OF; JUDGMENT PER JUDGE FOGEL; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 3 Filed: 3/18/1993, Entered: None Request Dismissal
DISMISSAL WOP AS TO DEFT DEPENDABLE; INS. COMPANY BY MARK LONERGAN; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 2 Filed: 12/31/1992, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
** CMC FILED 12-24-92;BY JOHN B. SULLIVAN; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 1 Filed: 6/9/1992, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
CMC COMPLAINT BY JOHN SULLIVAN; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space

Statistics

This case has been viewed 0 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?