Eaton, County of v. Purdue Pharma, L.P.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Western District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-00823
District Judge Janet T. Neff, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 3, 2018 at 1:20 AM DT (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Eaton, County of, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sommers, Schwartz, Silver & Schwartz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Michelle Esser +1 248 355 0300 lesser@sommerspc.com
v.
No Logo ACTAVIS LLC, Defendant
No Logo Actavis Pharma, Inc., Defendant
Allergan Finance, LLC Allergan Finance, LLC, Defendant
Allergan PLC Allergan PLC, Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc. Cardinal Health, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Acusphere, Inc.
No Logo CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, Defendant
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc. Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Johnson & Johnson, Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC Mallinckrodt PLC, Defendant
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Noramco, Inc., Defendant
Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Defendant
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation Rite Aid Corporation, Defendant
No Logo RITE AID OF MARYLAND, INC., Defendant
No Logo Specgx LLC, Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant
No Logo The Kroger Co., Defendant
No Logo THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., Defendant
No Logo Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Defendant
Wal-mart, Inc. Wal-mart, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Watson Laboratories, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (pjw) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Carmody indicating that this case is cognate to 1:17-cv-1114 (jlb) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by County of Eaton, County of (Esser, Lisa) Modified text on 7/25/2018 (jlg) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 27 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?