Island County v. Purdue Pharma, L.P.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-01127

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 3, 2018 at 3:08 AM DT (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Island County, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ISLAND COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory M Banks +1 360 679 7363 +1 360 678 5111 gregb@co.island.wa.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Keller Rohrback

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J Ko +1 206 623 1900 david-ko-8713@ecf.pacerpro.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gretchen Freeman Cappio +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 gcappio@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alison Smith Gaffney +1 206 623 1900 agaffney@kellerrohrback.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erika M Keech +1 206 623 1900 ekeech@kellerrohrback.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Derek W Loeser +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 dloeser@kellerrohrback.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Parke Mensher +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 dmensher@kellerrohrback.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lynn Lincoln Sarko +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 lsarko@kellerrohrback.com
v.
No Logo ACTAVIS LLC, Defendant
No Logo Actavis Pharma, Inc., Defendant
Allergan Finance, LLC Allergan Finance, LLC, Defendant
Allergan PLC Allergan PLC, Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc. Cardinal Health, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Acusphere, Inc.
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Jane Does 1-100, Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo John Does 1-100, Defendant
No Logo Johnson & Johnson, Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC Mallinckrodt PLC, Defendant
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd."
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant
No Logo THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., Defendant
No Logo Watson Laboratories, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Case Transferred Out - Email notification
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None MDL Transfer Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
      Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to All Defendants. (ST) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Notice of Related Case
        NOTICE of Related Case(s) 1:17-md-02804, by Plaintiff Island County. (Loeser, Derek) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Complaint
          COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., John and Jane Does 1 through 100, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5419076), filed by Island County. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Loeser, Derek) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 10 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?