Yost v. Zihlmann
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 3:07-cv-08159-PGR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 3, 2018 at 3:55 AM EDT (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER pursuant to 35 Stipulation of Dismissal; the Clerk shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 9/15/08. (REW, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER that the original Scheduling Order (doc. #9 in CV-07-229-TUC-CKJ) is vacated in its entirety, and the parties shall instead comply with the requirements of the Second Amended Scheduling Order (doc. # 23 ).. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 2/29/08. (DMT, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time. Discovery due by 9/2/2008. Dispositive motions due by 10/1/2008. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/31/2008. Jury Trial reset for 1/13/2009 09:00 AM before Judge Paul G Ros enblatt. Pretrial Conference reset for 12/8/2008 03:00 PM before Judge Paul G Rosenblatt.. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 2/22/08.(DMT, ) Modified on 2/25/2008 (DMT, ). THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS INCORRECT FROM THE DOCKET TEXT 10/1/08 FOR PRETRIAL ORDER CHANGED TO 10/31/08.
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 3 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?