(PS) Ka'anoi v. Kerr
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:06-cv-02730-JKS-EFB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 3, 2018 at 4:59 AM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/24/08 ORDERING that case Civ. S-07-2722 GEB JFM is REASSIGNED to Judge James K. Singleton and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan for all further proceedings. The caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as No. Civ. S-07-2722 JKS EFB PS. (Engbretson, K.)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER signed by Judge James K Singleton on 1/14/08 ADOPTING 22 Findings and Recommendations and GRANTING 12 Motion to Dismiss. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to exhaust; and The Clerk is directed to enter judgment for Defendant. CASE CLOSED. (Becknal, R)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/20/07 RECOMMENDING that Dft's Motion to Dismiss 12 be granted and this action be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Clerk be directed to close this case. Objections to the F&Rs due within 10 days. (Engbretson, K.)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER signed by Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/7/07 DENYING pltf's 2/27/07 14 Request for Entry of Default . (Brown, T)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 0 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?