Rasnake v. Baxter Healthcare, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:97-cv-03750-AH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Thelma Rasnake, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A Pretl +1 443 323 3060 +1 410 689 3833 mikepretl@aol.com
v.
No Logo American Heyer-schulte Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "American Heyer-Schulte, Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodell, DeVries, Leech & Dann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bonnie J Beavan +1 410 783 4000 +1 410 783 4040 bjb@gdldlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce Robert Parker +1 410 244 7534 +1 410 244 7742 brparker@venable.com
No Logo AMERICAN HOSPITAL SUPPLY CORP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodell, DeVries, Leech & Dann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bonnie J Beavan +1 410 783 4000 +1 410 783 4040 bjb@gdldlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce Robert Parker +1 410 244 7534 +1 410 244 7742 brparker@venable.com
No Logo Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Baxter Healthcare Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodell, DeVries, Leech & Dann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bonnie J Beavan +1 410 783 4000 +1 410 783 4040 bjb@gdldlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce Robert Parker +1 410 244 7534 +1 410 244 7742 brparker@venable.com
No Logo Baxter International, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Baxter Healthcare, SA
Unknown Role, Baxalta Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodell, DeVries, Leech & Dann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bonnie J Beavan +1 410 783 4000 +1 410 783 4040 bjb@gdldlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce Robert Parker +1 410 244 7534 +1 410 244 7742 brparker@venable.com
Office Baltimore
Filed 11/7/1997
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $40000000
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Baltimore County
Terminated 11/17/1999
Origin 4
Reopened 11/12/1999
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 926, CLOSED, XMDL
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 15 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: 11/17/1999 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING this action with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed. The entry of this order is without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause within 45 days to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated ( signed by Sr Judge Alexander Harvey II 11/17/99) (c/m 11/17/99 jl) MICROFILMED 11/17/99) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: 11/17/1999 Terminated Case
    Case closed (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 11/12/1999, Entered: 11/12/1999 Remark
      Certified copy of docket entries, Order of dismissal/administrative closing, motion to vacate rec'd from the USDC Northern District of Alabama (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 11/12/1999, Entered: 11/12/1999 OrderCourt Filing
        CERTIFIED ORDER No. 54C Remand to Transferor Courts (signed by Chief Judge Sam C. Pointer, Jr. 11/2/99) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 11/12/1999, Entered: 11/12/1999 Case Reopened
          Case reopened (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 12 Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: 2/27/1998 Order
            CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL ORDER from MDL Panel transferring this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama (jnl, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/27/1998
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: 2/27/1998 Remark
              Certified copy of docket entries sent to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: 2/27/1998 Terminated Case
                Case closed (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 11 Filed: 1/9/1998, Entered: 1/12/1998 Local Rule
                  Local Rule 103.3 Certification of Baxter International. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 10 Filed: 1/9/1998, Entered: 1/12/1998 Answer
                    ANSWER to Complaint by Baxter International (Attorney Bruce R. Parker, Bonnie J. Beavan, Jennifer Lilore Huesman). (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 9 Filed: 1/9/1998, Entered: 1/12/1998 Answer
                      ANSWER and Adoption by reference to Complaint by Baxter Healthcare, American Heyer, American Hospital (Attorney Bruce R. Parker, Bonnie J. Beavan, Jennifer Lilore Huesman). (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 8 Filed: 1/9/1998, Entered: 1/12/1998 Local Rule
                        Local Rule 103.3 Certification of Baxter Healthcare Corporation. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 7 Filed: 12/18/1997, Entered: 12/18/1997 Summons Returned Executed
                          RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Baxter International 12/5/97 Answer due on 2/4/98 for Baxter International (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 6 Filed: 12/18/1997, Entered: 12/18/1997 Summons Returned Executed
                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Baxter Healthcare 12/2/97 Answer due on 2/1/98 for Baxter Healthcare (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 5 Filed: 12/4/1997, Entered: 12/4/1997 Summons Returned Executed
                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to American Heyer 12/1/97 Answer due on 1/30/98 for American Heyer (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 4 Filed: 12/4/1997, Entered: 12/4/1997 Summons Returned Executed
                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to American Hospital 12/1/97 Answer due on 1/30/98 for American Hospital (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 3 Filed: 11/7/1997, Entered: 11/13/1997 Summons Issued
                                  SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for Baxter Healthcare, Baxter International, American Heyer, American Hospital. (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 2 Filed: 11/7/1997, Entered: 11/13/1997 Jury Demand
                                    DEMAND for jury trial by Thelma Rasnake (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 11/7/1997, Entered: 11/13/1997 Complaint
                                      COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 145134 (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 73 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?