Miller v. Baxter Healthcare, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:97-cv-03794-MJG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Brenda Forand Miller, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A Pretl +1 443 323 3060 +1 410 689 3833 mikepretl@aol.com
v.
No Logo American Heyer-schulte Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "American Heyer-Schulte, Corp."
No Logo AMERICAN HOSPITAL SUPPLY CORP, Defendant
No Logo Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodell, DeVries, Leech & Dann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bonnie J Beavan +1 410 783 4000 +1 410 783 4040 bjb@gdldlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce Robert Parker +1 410 244 7534 +1 410 244 7742 brparker@venable.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara A. Milnamow +1 212 581 1600
Space Laurie J. Sternberg +1 212 581 1600
No Logo Baxter International, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Baxter Healthcare, SA
Unknown Role, Baxalta Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodell, DeVries, Leech & Dann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bonnie J Beavan +1 410 783 4000 +1 410 783 4040 bjb@gdldlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce Robert Parker +1 410 244 7534 +1 410 244 7742 brparker@venable.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara A. Milnamow +1 212 581 1600
Space Laurie J. Sternberg +1 212 581 1600
Office Baltimore
Filed 11/10/1997
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $40000000
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County 88888
Terminated 12/5/2000
Origin 4
Reopened 10/4/1999
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 926, ARCHIVE, CLOSED, XMDL
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/6/2000 Settlement OrderCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING Case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause within 30 days to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 12/5/00 ) (c/m 12/5/00-jw) (MICROFILMED 12/6/00) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/6/2000 Terminated Case
    Case closed (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/24/2000, Entered: 4/25/2000 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [16-1] motion for Laurie J. Sternberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 4/24/00 ) (c/i 4/25/00) (fee paid) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 16 Filed: 4/24/2000, Entered: 4/25/2000, Terminated: 4/24/2000 motion to appear pro hac vice
        MOTION by Baxter International, Baxter Healthcare for Laurie J. Sternberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice (cag, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/24/2000, Entered: 4/25/2000 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [14-1] motion for Barbara A. Milnamow to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 4/24/00 ) (c/i 4/25/00) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 14 Filed: 4/24/2000, Entered: 4/25/2000, Terminated: 4/24/2000 motion to appear pro hac vice
            MOTION by Baxter International, Baxter Healthcare for Barbara A. Milnamow to Appear Pro Hac Vice (cag, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 13 Filed: 10/4/1999, Entered: 10/7/1999 Order
              ORDER NO. 53B REMAND TO TRANSFEROR COURTS. (Chief J. Sam C. Pointer, Jr.) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 10/4/1999, Entered: 10/7/1999 Case Reopened
                Case reopened (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 12 Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: 2/27/1998 Correspondence
                  CORRESPONDENCE mailed to the USDC Northern District of Alabama RE: Transfer of Case. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 11 Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: 2/27/1998 Order
                    CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel "DIRECTING" Clerk to Transfer Case to USDC Northern District of Alabama. ( signed by Patrica D. Howard, Clerk of the Panel 2/2/98 (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: 2/27/1998 Remark
                      A Certified Copy of Docket Entries Only, mailed to USDC Northern District of Alabama. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: 2/27/1998 Terminated Case
                        Case closed (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 10 Filed: 1/9/1998, Entered: 1/12/1998 Answer
                          ANSWER and ADOPTION BY REFERENCE to Complaint by Baxter Healthcare (Attorney Bruce R. Parker, Bonnie J. Beavan, Jennifer Lilore Huesman). (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 9 Filed: 1/9/1998, Entered: 1/12/1998 Answer
                            ANSWER and ADOPTION BY REFRENCE to Complaint by Baxter International (Attorney Bruce R. Parker, Bonnie J. Beavan, Jennifer Lilore Huesman). (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 8 Filed: 1/9/1998, Entered: 1/12/1998 Local Rule
                              Local Rule 103.3 Certification of Baxter Healthcare. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 7 Filed: 1/9/1998, Entered: 1/12/1998 Local Rule
                                Local Rule 103.3 Certification of Baxter International (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 6 Filed: 12/18/1997, Entered: 12/18/1997 Summons Returned Executed
                                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Baxter International 12/5/97 Answer due on 2/5/98 for Baxter International (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 5 Filed: 12/18/1997, Entered: 12/18/1997 Summons Returned Executed
                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Baxter Healthcare 12/2/97 Answer due on 2/2/98 for Baxter Healthcare (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 4 Filed: 12/4/1997, Entered: 12/4/1997 Summons Returned Executed
                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to American Heyer, American Hospital 12/1/97 Answer due on 2/1/98 for American Heyer, for American Hospital (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 3 Filed: 11/12/1997, Entered: 11/14/1997 Summons Issued
                                        SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for Baxter Healthcare, Baxter International, American Heyer, American Hospital (td, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 2 Filed: 11/10/1997, Entered: 11/14/1997 Jury Demand
                                          DEMAND for jury trial by Brenda Forand Miller (td, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 11/10/1997, Entered: 11/14/1997 Complaint
                                            COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # B145212 (td, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 139 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?