Kyle B. Waldron - Adversary Proceeding
Bankruptcy Case Georgia Southern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 04-05035
District Judge James D. Walker Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 3, 2018 at 10:23 AM EDT (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Gary Brown, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland & Garmon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Jeffrey D. Garmon +1 912 285 4030 +1 912 285 8319
No Logo Jae Montano, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland & Garmon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Jeffrey D. Garmon +1 912 285 4030 +1 912 285 8319
No Logo Karen Brown, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland & Garmon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Jeffrey D. Garmon +1 912 285 4030 +1 912 285 8319
No Logo Michael Montano, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland & Garmon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Jeffrey D. Garmon +1 912 285 4030 +1 912 285 8319
v.
No Logo Kyle B. Waldron, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Clyde W. Royals

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clyde W. Royals +1 912 384 5551 +1 912 384 4560 cdroyals@accessatc.net
Nature of Suit 424 - (Obj/Revocation Discharge 727
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Adversary Case 04-05035 Closed (King, Caryn) (Entered: 12/12/2005)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Order Dismissing Adversary Filed on 10/20/2005. (Wynn, Leigh) (Entered: 10/26/2005)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Order APPROVING Item #10 - Adversaries 04-05029, 04-05035, 04-05039, 04-05043 and 04-05044 are consolidated for trial, limited to actions pursuant to Section 727 of the Bankruptcy Code [MH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 11 (Entered: 07/11/2005)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Agreed Motion to Consolidate Certain Pending Adversary Proceedings for Trial [MH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 10 (Entered: 07/11/2005)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Adoption of Pretrial Order Entered in Adversary Case No. 04-05029 filed by Plaintiffs [AP] Original NIBS Entry Number: 9 (Entered: 11/29/2004)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ENTERED IN ERROR - Motion belongs in Adv Proceeding 04-05043. [MH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 8C (Entered: 01/22/2005)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Order APPROVING Item # 8a [MH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 8B (Entered: 01/22/2005)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Motion to Consolidate Cases [Disposed] [MH] Original NIBS Entry Number: 8A (Entered: 01/22/2005)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  COPY of Discovery Order on Non-Dischargeability Action [CK] (Entered: 09/10/2004)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    COPY of Order Consolidating Discovery of Pending Non-Dischargeability Actions - Refer to Adversary Case No.04-05029 for Original Order [CK] (Entered: 06/16/2004)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Scheduling Order, Complete Discovery by September 27, 2004 due by 10/12/2004 [CK] (Entered: 06/03/2004)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Hearing Held [CK] (Entered: 06/03/2004)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Answer by Defendant with Defenses RE: Item# 1 [CK] (Entered: 05/14/2004)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Certificate of Service RE: Item# 2 [CK] (Entered: 04/30/2004)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Summons and notice of pre-trial conference hearing on 06/24/2004 at 9:30 a.m. at U.S. Courtroom, 3rd Floor, Federal Building, Carswell Street, Waycross, Ga [CK] (Entered: 04/21/2004)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Complaint to Object to or Revoke a Discharge [CK] (Entered: 04/21/2004)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?