The City of Boston v. Purdue Pharma L.P.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-12174
Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 23, 2019 at 3:13 AM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo The Boston Housing Authority, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 620

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert T. Naumes +1 617 227 8444 robert@naumeslaw.com
No Logo The Boston Public Health Commission, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 620

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert T. Naumes +1 617 227 8444 robert@naumeslaw.com
No Logo The City of Boston, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 620

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert T. Naumes +1 617 227 8444 robert@naumeslaw.com
v.
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pierce, Atwood LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua D. Dunlap +1 207 791 1100 jdunlap@pierceatwood.com
Cardinal Health, Inc. Cardinal Health, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Acusphere, Inc.
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Fathalla Mashali, Defendant
No Logo Insys Therapeutics, Defendant
No Logo Jane Does 1 - 50, Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Johnson & Johnson, Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. O'Connor +1 617 235 4650 +1 617 235 9882 andrew.oconnor@ropesgray.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY BRIEN T. O'CONNOR +1 617 951 7000 +1 617 951 7050 Brien.O'Connor@ropesgray.com
Mallinckrodt PLC Mallinckrodt PLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. O'Connor +1 617 235 4650 +1 617 235 9882 andrew.oconnor@ropesgray.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY BRIEN T. O'CONNOR +1 617 951 7000 +1 617 951 7050 Brien.O'Connor@ropesgray.com
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant
No Logo New England Wellness & Pain Management, P.C., Defendant
Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant
No Logo Specgx LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. O'Connor +1 617 235 4650 +1 617 235 9882 andrew.oconnor@ropesgray.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY BRIEN T. O'CONNOR +1 617 951 7000 +1 617 951 7050 Brien.O'Connor@ropesgray.com
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant
No Logo THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., Defendant
No Logo Walgreens Boots Alliance, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
First MEMORANDUM in Support re 12 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by The City of Boston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Naumes, Robert) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    First MOTION to Remand to State Court by The City of Boston.(Naumes, Robert) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of Appearance by Robert T. Naumes on behalf of The City of Boston (Naumes, Robert) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 7 Manufacturer Defendants' Assented-to Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to 1 Complaint until 30 days after a court rules on any motion to remand or a determination by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation regarding transfer, whichever is later. (Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew O'Connor on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, SPECGX LLC (O'Connor, Andrew) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, SPECGX LLC. (O'Connor, Brien) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time [Manufacturer Defendants' Assented-to Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond] by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, SPECGX LLC.(O'Connor, Brien) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 5 Distributor Defendants' Assented- Motion for Extension of Time to Answer 1 Complaint until the later 30 days after (1) the Court rules on any motion to remand filed by Plaintiffs, or (2) a determination by the JPML regarding transfer, subject to orders by the MDL court.(Montes, Mariliz) Modified on 10/24/2018 (Montes, Mariliz).NEF Regenerated (Entered: 10/24/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer [Distributor Defendants' Assented-to Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint] by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation.(Dunlap, Joshua) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation.. (Dunlap, Joshua) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Manolakis, Ashley) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7370970 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Process Served on AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Category Form)(Dunlap, Joshua) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 22 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?