Richard Winans v. Franklin Collection Service
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 18-2072

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 3, 2018 at 11:02 AM DT (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407187232 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Mediation forms. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [18-2072] MRB [Entered: 10/18/2018 09:03 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ORDER filed [1000386610] updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 12/07/2018. Response brief due 01/04/2019 Copies to all parties. [18-2072] JR [Entered: 10/17/2018 04:18 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jonathan Robert Miller for Richard L. Winans.[1000384786] [18-2072] Jonathan Miller [Entered: 10/15/2018 03:57 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Richard L. Winans. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000384494] [18-2072] Brian Bromberg [Entered: 10/15/2018 12:49 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Brian Lewis Bromberg for Richard L. Winans.[1000384485] [18-2072] Brian Bromberg [Entered: 10/15/2018 12:43 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Richard L. Winans re: filing of appearance form. Appearance form due on 10/15/2018 from Brian Lewis Bromberg and Jonathan Robert Miller, filing of disclosure form; Disclosure statement due from Richard L. Winans on 10/15/2018. [18-2072] JR [Entered: 10/11/2018 11:53 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ORDER filed [1000382074] updating briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 11/07/2018. Response brief due 12/05/2018. Copies to all parties. [18-2072] JR [Entered: 10/10/2018 12:49 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [18-2072] MRB [Entered: 10/03/2018 11:53 AM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  DOCKETING STATEMENT by Richard L. Winans. [18-2072] Jonathan Miller [Entered: 10/01/2018 10:51 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Franklin Collection Service, Inc. and Dan Franklin. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000376713] [18-2072] Caren Enloe [Entered: 10/01/2018 03:33 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 10/29/2018. Response Brief due 11/26/2018 [18-2072] JR [Entered: 09/17/2018 11:05 AM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00659-TDS-LPA.. [18-2072] JR [Entered: 09/17/2018 11:02 AM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00659-TDS-LPA. Case manager: JRice. [18-2072] JR [Entered: 09/17/2018 11:01 AM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 3 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?