Walker v. Medeiros
Appeal Court of Appeals for the First Circuit, Case No. 16-1479

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 3, 2018 at 11:18 AM EDT (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107324997 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Catherine J. Hinton for Appellant Andre Walker. Certificate of service dated 08/10/2018. [16-1479] (CJH) [Entered: 08/10/2018 11:10 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107324986 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    REPLY BRIEF filed by Appellant Andre Walker. Certificate of service dated 08/09/2018. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 08/17/2018. [16-1479]. (AMM) [Entered: 08/10/2018 10:54 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107324807 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      BRIEF tendered by Appellant Andre Walker. [16-1479] (CJH) [Entered: 08/09/2018 05:57 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107321706 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Matthew P. Landry for Appellee Sean Medeiros. Certificate of service dated 08/02/2018. [16-1479] (MPL) [Entered: 08/02/2018 04:32 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107321532 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellant Andre Walker. Reply brief due 08/09/2018 for appellant Andre Walker. No further extension of this deadline should be expected. [16-1479] (GA) [Entered: 08/02/2018 02:46 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107321252 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file reply brief filed by Appellant Andre Walker. Certificate of service dated 08/02/2018. [16-1479] (CJH) [Entered: 08/02/2018 10:07 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107320108 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              CASE calendared: Tuesday, 09/11/2018 AM Boston, MA Panel Courtroom. Designation form due 08/14/2018. [16-1479] (DT) [Entered: 07/31/2018 10:57 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107313841 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ORDER entered: Upon consideration, attorney Jessica V. Barnett's motion to withdraw as counsel of record for defendant-appellant Sean Medeiros is allowed. Medeiros shall continue to be represented by his remaining counsel of record. [16-1479] (GA) [Entered: 07/16/2018 08:28 AM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107313459 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION for Attorney Jessica V. Barnett to withdraw as counsel filed by Appellee Sean Medeiros. Certificate of service dated 07/13/2018. [16-1479] (JVB) [Entered: 07/13/2018 11:09 AM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107313029 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellant Andre Walker. Reply brief due 08/02/2018 for appellant Andre Walker. We are disinclined to grant a request for further enlargement of this deadline. [16-1479] (GA) [Entered: 07/12/2018 10:50 AM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 2 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?