GRACIANO INC v. SANASY
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maine District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-00374
District Judge NANCY TORRESEN, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 3, 2018 at 11:32 AM DT (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GRACIANO INC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by bransonlawoffice.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY JOHN H. BRANSON +1 207 780 8611 jbranson@bransonlawoffice.com
No Logo JOSE GRACIANO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by bransonlawoffice.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY JOHN H. BRANSON +1 207 780 8611 jbranson@bransonlawoffice.com
No Logo THAI LOTUS RESTAURANT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by bransonlawoffice.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY JOHN H. BRANSON +1 207 780 8611 jbranson@bransonlawoffice.com
v.
No Logo ACHARA WEYDT, Defendant
No Logo AER SENESOMBATH, Defendant
No Logo ANIMA NIKONTHET, Defendant
No Logo ASIAN CAFE, Defendant
No Logo KHONE SANASY, Defendant
No Logo SOURASAY SENESOMBATH, Defendant
No Logo SPRUCE CREEK RETAIL OUTLET GROUND TENANT LLC, Defendant
No Logo SPRUCE CREEK RETAIL OUTLET LLC, Defendant
No Logo THAI & I CORPORATION, Defendant
No Logo WATERSTONE PROPERTIES GROUP INC, Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by THAI LOTUS RESTAURANT. (bfa) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GRACIANO INC. (bfa) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        COMPLAINT against ASIAN CAFE, ANIMA NIKONTHET, KHONE SANASY, AER SENESOMBATH, SOURASAY SENESOMBATH, SPRUCE CREEK RETAIL OUTLET GROUND TENANT LLC, SPRUCE CREEK RETAIL OUTLET LLC, THAI & I CORPORATION, WATERSTONE PROPERTIES GROUP INC, ACHARA WEYDT PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by JOSE GRACIANO, GRACIANO INC, THAI LOTUS RESTAURANT. (Service of Process Deadline 12/13/2018) Fee due by 9/17/2018.(bfa) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 9 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?