HOWARD MISLE
Bankruptcy Case Nevada Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 18-15705

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 30, 2020 at 3:38 PM ST (8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CASS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, Petitioning Creditor

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Michael Smith 1 +1 +1 +1

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of ANDREW R. MUEHLBAUER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , ANDREW R. MUEHLBAUER +1 702 330 4505

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Langley & Chang

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , HEIDI M CHENG
No Logo CHAL SULPRIZIO, AN INDIVIDUAL, Petitioning Creditor

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Michael Smith 1 +1 +1 +1

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of ANDREW R. MUEHLBAUER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , ANDREW R. MUEHLBAUER +1 702 330 4505

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Langley & Chang

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , HEIDI M CHENG
No Logo DENYSE MACMILLAN, AN INDIVIDUAL, Petitioning Creditor

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Michael Smith 1 +1 +1 +1

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of ANDREW R. MUEHLBAUER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , ANDREW R. MUEHLBAUER +1 702 330 4505

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Langley & Chang

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , HEIDI M CHENG
No Logo LARRY LEVINE, AN INDIVIDUAL, Petitioning Creditor

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Michael Smith 1 +1 +1 +1

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of ANDREW R. MUEHLBAUER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , ANDREW R. MUEHLBAUER +1 702 330 4505

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Langley & Chang

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , HEIDI M CHENG
No Logo NICO ALLOYS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, Petitioning Creditor

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Michael Smith 1 +1 +1 +1

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of ANDREW R. MUEHLBAUER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , ANDREW R. MUEHLBAUER +1 702 330 4505

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Langley & Chang

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , HEIDI M CHENG
No Logo HOWARD MISLE, Alleged Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by SCHWARTZER & MCPHERSON LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lenard E. Schwartzer +1 702 228 7590 +1 702 892 0122 usdcfilings@s-mlaw.com
No Logo U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 7, U.S. Trustee
  Entries (77) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 159 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None ?
    LREF
    Blank 157 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: None ?
      LREF
      Blank 127 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: None ?
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Answer
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Leave to Appeal
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Dismiss Case
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Opposition
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None reply
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s)42 Order Approving Verified Petition) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/06/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Hearing scheduled 1/3/2019 at 01:30 PM at BTB LV-Courtroom 4, Foley Federal Bldg. (Related document(s)47 Motion to Strike filed by Petitioning Creditor CASS, INC., Petitioning Creditor NICO ALLOYS, INC., Petitioning Creditor CHAL SULPRIZIO, Petitioning Creditor LARRY LEVINE, Petitioning Creditor DENYSE MACMILLAN) (mag) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Certificate of Service OF NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE EXHIBITS AND DECLARATION OF HOWARD MISLE (48) AND MOTION TO STRIKE EXHIBITS AND THE DECLARATION OF HOWARD MISLE (47) with Certificate of Service Filed by MICHAEL SMITH on behalf of CASS, INC., LARRY LEVINE, DENYSE MACMILLAN, NICO ALLOYS, INC., CHAL SULPRIZIO (Related document(s)47 Motion to Strike filed by Petitioning Creditor CASS, INC., Petitioning Creditor NICO ALLOYS, INC., Petitioning Creditor CHAL SULPRIZIO, Petitioning Creditor LARRY LEVINE, Petitioning Creditor DENYSE MACMILLAN) (SMITH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/05/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Notice of Hearing MOTION TO STRIKE EXHIBITS AND THE DECLARATION OF HOWARD MISLE Hearing Date: 01/03/2019 Hearing Time: 1:30 pm Filed by MICHAEL SMITH on behalf of CASS, INC., LARRY LEVINE, DENYSE MACMILLAN, NICO ALLOYS, INC., CHAL SULPRIZIO (Related document(s)47 Motion to Strike filed by Petitioning Creditor CASS, INC., Petitioning Creditor NICO ALLOYS, INC., Petitioning Creditor CHAL SULPRIZIO, Petitioning Creditor LARRY LEVINE, Petitioning Creditor DENYSE MACMILLAN) (SMITH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/05/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Motion to Strike EXHIBITS AND THE DECLARATION OF HOWARD MISLE Filed by MICHAEL SMITH on behalf of CASS, INC., LARRY LEVINE, DENYSE MACMILLAN, NICO ALLOYS, INC., CHAL SULPRIZIO (Related document(s)31 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Alleged Debtor HOWARD MISLE)(SMITH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/05/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Certificate of Service Filed by MONIQUE DEBRIKKA JEWETT-BREWSTER on behalf of RUBIN JURMAN (Related document(s)41 Joinder filed by Creditor RUBIN JURMAN) (JEWETT-BREWSTER, MONIQUE) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Certificate of Service Filed by MONIQUE DEBRIKKA JEWETT-BREWSTER on behalf of RUBIN JURMAN (Related document(s)44 Errata filed by Creditor RUBIN JURMAN) (JEWETT-BREWSTER, MONIQUE) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Errata Notice of Errata to Exhibit A to Declaration of Perry J. Woodward in Support of Judgment Credit Rubin Jurman's Joinder in Objection by Petitioning Creditors to Debtor's Motion for Dismissal of Involuntary Bankruptcy Case Filed by MONIQUE DEBRIKKA JEWETT-BREWSTER on behalf of RUBIN JURMAN (Related document(s)41 Joinder filed by Creditor RUBIN JURMAN) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (JEWETT-BREWSTER, MONIQUE) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Receipt of Filing Fee for Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice(18-15705-btb) [misc,verpeta] ( 250.00). Receipt number 18578749, fee amount $ 250.00.(re: Doc#36) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Order Approving Verified Petition (Related document(s)36 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Creditor RUBIN JURMAN, Designation of Local Counsel.) (mag) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Joinder in Opposition by Petitioning Creditors to Motion to Dismiss, Filed by MONIQUE DEBRIKKA JEWETT-BREWSTER on behalf of RUBIN JURMAN (Related document(s)39 Notice filed by Petitioning Creditor CASS, INC., Petitioning Creditor NICO ALLOYS, INC., Petitioning Creditor CHAL SULPRIZIO, Petitioning Creditor LARRY LEVINE, Petitioning Creditor DENYSE MACMILLAN) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Perry J. Woodward # 2 Exhibit A) (JEWETT-BREWSTER, MONIQUE) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Certificate of Service OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF INVOLUNTARY CASE (37), Declaration of Michael Smith (38) and Notice of Opposition to Motion for Dismissal of Involuntary Case (39) with Certificate of Service Filed by MICHAEL SMITH on behalf of CASS, INC., LARRY LEVINE, DENYSE MACMILLAN, NICO ALLOYS, INC., CHAL SULPRIZIO (Related document(s)37 Opposition filed by Petitioning Creditor CASS, INC., Petitioning Creditor NICO ALLOYS, INC., Petitioning Creditor CHAL SULPRIZIO, Petitioning Creditor LARRY LEVINE, Petitioning Creditor DENYSE MACMILLAN) (SMITH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Notice OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF INVOLUNTARY CASE Filed by MICHAEL SMITH on behalf of CASS, INC., LARRY LEVINE, DENYSE MACMILLAN, NICO ALLOYS, INC., CHAL SULPRIZIO (Related document(s)37 Opposition filed by Petitioning Creditor CASS, INC., Petitioning Creditor NICO ALLOYS, INC., Petitioning Creditor CHAL SULPRIZIO, Petitioning Creditor LARRY LEVINE, Petitioning Creditor DENYSE MACMILLAN) (SMITH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Declaration Of: Michael Smith IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF INVOLUNTARY CASE Filed by MICHAEL SMITH on behalf of CASS, INC., LARRY LEVINE, DENYSE MACMILLAN, NICO ALLOYS, INC., CHAL SULPRIZIO (Related document(s)37 Opposition filed by Petitioning Creditor CASS, INC., Petitioning Creditor NICO ALLOYS, INC., Petitioning Creditor CHAL SULPRIZIO, Petitioning Creditor LARRY LEVINE, Petitioning Creditor DENYSE MACMILLAN) (SMITH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Opposition TO MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF INVOLUNTARY CASE Filed by MICHAEL SMITH on behalf of CASS, INC., LARRY LEVINE, DENYSE MACMILLAN, NICO ALLOYS, INC., CHAL SULPRIZIO (Related document(s)31 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Alleged Debtor HOWARD MISLE.) (SMITH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Verified Petition for Permission to Practice in this Case Only by Attorney Not Admitted to the Bar of this Court. Fee Amount $250., Designation of Local Counsel VP Follow-up Date 12/17/2018 Filed by MONIQUE DEBRIKKA JEWETT-BREWSTER on behalf of RUBIN JURMAN (Attachments: # 1 Designation) (JEWETT-BREWSTER, MONIQUE) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                        Certificate of Service Filed by LENARD E. SCHWARTZER on behalf of HOWARD MISLE (Related document(s)31 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Alleged Debtor HOWARD MISLE, 32 Declaration filed by Alleged Debtor HOWARD MISLE, 33 Notice of Hearing filed by Alleged Debtor HOWARD MISLE) (SCHWARTZER, LENARD) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Hearing scheduled 12/17/2018 at 01:30 PM at LEB-Courtroom 3, Foley Federal Bldg. (Related document(s)31 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Alleged Debtor HOWARD MISLE) (mag) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Hearing (Bk)
                                                                            Notice of Hearing Regarding Motion For Dismissal Of Involuntary Case Hearing Date: 12/17/2018 Hearing Time: 1:30 p.m. Filed by LENARD E. SCHWARTZER on behalf of HOWARD MISLE (Related document(s)31 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Alleged Debtor HOWARD MISLE) (SCHWARTZER, LENARD) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                              Declaration Of: HOWARD MISLE In Support Of Motion For Dismissal Of Involuntary Case Filed by LENARD E. SCHWARTZER on behalf of HOWARD MISLE (Related document(s)31 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Alleged Debtor HOWARD MISLE) (SCHWARTZER, LENARD) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Dismiss Case
                                                                                Motion to Dismiss Case Motion For Dismissal Of Involuntary Case with Proposed Order Filed by LENARD E. SCHWARTZER on behalf of HOWARD MISLE (SCHWARTZER, LENARD) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/3/2018, Entered: None Involuntary Summons Service Executed
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Involuntary Summons Service Executed
                                                                                    Summons Service Executed in an Involuntary Case on HOWARD MISLE with Certificate of Service Filed by HEIDI M CHENG on behalf of CASS, INC., LARRY LEVINE, DENYSE MACMILLAN, NICO ALLOYS, INC., CHAL SULPRIZIO (CHENG, HEIDI) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: 11/2/2018 Involuntary Summons Issued
                                                                                      Involuntary Summons Issued On HOWARD MISLE Status Hearing to be held on 12/17/2018 at 01:30 PM at LEB-Courtroom 3, Foley Federal Bldg. (llh)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: 11/2/2018 Document
                                                                                        Document Request for Reissuance of Summons Filed by HEIDI M CHENG on behalf of CASS, INC., LARRY LEVINE, DENYSE MACMILLAN, NICO ALLOYS, INC., CHAL SULPRIZIO (Related document(s)1 Involuntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Petitioning Creditor CASS, INC., Alleged Debtor HOWARD MISLE, Petitioning Creditor NICO ALLOYS, INC., Petitioning Creditor CHAL SULPRIZIO, Petitioning Creditor LARRY LEVINE, Petitioning Creditor DENYSE MACMILLAN) (CHENG, HEIDI)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: 11/2/2018 Involuntary Summons Service Unexecuted
                                                                                          Amended Summons Not Executed on HOWARD MISLE Filed by ANDREW R. MUEHLBAUER on behalf of CASS, INC., LARRY LEVINE, DENYSE MACMILLAN, NICO ALLOYS, INC., CHAL SULPRIZIO (MUEHLBAUER, ANDREW)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: 10/31/2018
                                                                                            Request for Special Notice Filed by MICHAEL SMITH on behalf of CASS, INC., LARRY LEVINE, DENYSE MACMILLAN, NICO ALLOYS, INC., CHAL SULPRIZIO (SMITH, MICHAEL)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018
                                                                                              Request for Special Notice Filed by MONIQUE DEBRIKKA JEWETT-BREWSTER on behalf of Rubin Jurman (JEWETT-BREWSTER, MONIQUE)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 Involuntary Summons Issued
                                                                                                Involuntary Summons Issued On HOWARD MISLE Status Hearing to be held on 12/17/2018 at 01:30 PM at LEB-Courtroom 3, Foley Federal Bldg. (llh)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018
                                                                                                  Request for Special Notice Filed by HEIDI M CHENG on behalf of CASS, INC., LARRY LEVINE, DENYSE MACMILLAN, NICO ALLOYS, INC., CHAL SULPRIZIO (CHENG, HEIDI)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s)17 Order Approving Verified Petition) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/05/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/8/2018, Entered: 10/8/2018 Involuntary Summons Service Unexecuted
                                                                                                      Amended Summons Not Executed on HOWARD MISLE Filed by ANDREW R. MUEHLBAUER on behalf of CASS, INC., LARRY LEVINE, DENYSE MACMILLAN, NICO ALLOYS, INC., CHAL SULPRIZIO (MUEHLBAUER, ANDREW)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s)16 Order Approving Verified Petition) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/05/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/8/2018, Entered: 10/8/2018
                                                                                                          Request for Special Notice Filed by BMW Financial Services NA, LLC, c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP (AIS Portfolio Services, LP)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/8/2018, Entered: 10/8/2018
                                                                                                            Request for Special Notice Filed by BMW Financial Services NA, LLC, c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP (AIS Portfolio Services, LP)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/6/2018, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/6/2018, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: 10/3/2018
                                                                                                                  Order Approving Verified Petition (Related document(s)6 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Petitioning Creditor CASS, INC., Petitioning Creditor NICO ALLOYS, INC., Petitioning Creditor CHAL SULPRIZIO, Petitioning Creditor LARRY LEVINE, Petitioning Creditor DENYSE MACMILLAN.) (mag)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: 10/3/2018
                                                                                                                    Order Approving Verified Petition (Related document(s)13 Document filed by Petitioning Creditor CASS, INC., Petitioning Creditor NICO ALLOYS, INC., Petitioning Creditor CHAL SULPRIZIO, Petitioning Creditor LARRY LEVINE, Petitioning Creditor DENYSE MACMILLAN.) (mag)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018
                                                                                                                      Amended Designation of Local Counsel by Heidi M. Cheng Filed by ANDREW R. MUEHLBAUER on behalf of CASS, INC., LARRY LEVINE, DENYSE MACMILLAN, NICO ALLOYS, INC., CHAL SULPRIZIO (Related document(s)13 Document filed by Petitioning Creditor CASS, INC., Petitioning Creditor NICO ALLOYS, INC., Petitioning Creditor CHAL SULPRIZIO, Petitioning Creditor LARRY LEVINE, Petitioning Creditor DENYSE MACMILLAN) (MUEHLBAUER, ANDREW). Modified on 10/2/2018 to remove relationship to #'s 8 and 11 (Youngblood, CL).
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018
                                                                                                                        Amended Designation of Local Counsel by Michael Smith Filed by ANDREW R. MUEHLBAUER on behalf of CASS, INC., LARRY LEVINE, DENYSE MACMILLAN, NICO ALLOYS, INC., CHAL SULPRIZIO (Related document(s)6 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Petitioning Creditor CASS, INC., Petitioning Creditor NICO ALLOYS, INC., Petitioning Creditor CHAL SULPRIZIO, Petitioning Creditor LARRY LEVINE, Petitioning Creditor DENYSE MACMILLAN (MUEHLBAUER, ANDREW). Modified on 10/2/2018 to remove relationship to #10 (Youngblood, CL).
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018 Document
                                                                                                                          Amended Document Verified Petition for Permission to Practice in this Case by Heidi M. Cheng Filed by ANDREW R. MUEHLBAUER on behalf of CASS, INC., LARRY LEVINE, DENYSE MACMILLAN, NICO ALLOYS, INC., CHAL SULPRIZIO (Related document(s)8 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Petitioning Creditor CASS, INC., Petitioning Creditor NICO ALLOYS, INC., Petitioning Creditor CHAL SULPRIZIO, Petitioning Creditor LARRY LEVINE, Petitioning Creditor DENYSE MACMILLAN) (MUEHLBAUER, ANDREW)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Receipt of Filing Fee for Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice(18-15705-leb) [misc,verpeta] ( 250.00). Receipt number 18452473, fee amount $ 250.00.(re: Doc#8) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: 9/28/2018
                                                                                                                              Notice of Docketing Error (Related document(s)8 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Petitioning Creditor CASS, INC., Petitioning Creditor NICO ALLOYS, INC., Petitioning Creditor CHAL SULPRIZIO, Petitioning Creditor LARRY LEVINE, Petitioning Creditor DENYSE MACMILLAN, 10 Designation of Local Counsel filed by Petitioning Creditor CASS, INC., Petitioning Creditor NICO ALLOYS, INC., Petitioning Creditor CHAL SULPRIZIO, Petitioning Creditor LARRY LEVINE, Petitioning Creditor DENYSE MACMILLAN, 11 Designation of Local Counsel filed by Petitioning Creditor CASS, INC., Petitioning Creditor NICO ALLOYS, INC., Petitioning Creditor CHAL SULPRIZIO, Petitioning Creditor LARRY LEVINE, Petitioning Creditor DENYSE MACMILLAN) (mag)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018
                                                                                                                                Designation of Local Counsel by Heidi M. Cheng Filed by ANDREW R. MUEHLBAUER on behalf of CASS, INC., LARRY LEVINE, DENYSE MACMILLAN, NICO ALLOYS, INC., CHAL SULPRIZIO (Related document(s)8 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Petitioning Creditor CASS, INC., Petitioning Creditor NICO ALLOYS, INC., Petitioning Creditor CHAL SULPRIZIO, Petitioning Creditor LARRY LEVINE, Petitioning Creditor DENYSE MACMILLAN) (MUEHLBAUER, ANDREW)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  Receipt of Filing Fee for Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice(18-15705-leb) [misc,verpeta] ( 250.00). Receipt number 18452463, fee amount $ 250.00.(re: Doc#6) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018
                                                                                                                                    Designation of Local Counsel by Michael Smith Filed by ANDREW R. MUEHLBAUER on behalf of CASS, INC., LARRY LEVINE, DENYSE MACMILLAN, NICO ALLOYS, INC., CHAL SULPRIZIO (Related document(s)6 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Petitioning Creditor CASS, INC., Petitioning Creditor NICO ALLOYS, INC., Petitioning Creditor CHAL SULPRIZIO, Petitioning Creditor LARRY LEVINE, Petitioning Creditor DENYSE MACMILLAN) (MUEHLBAUER, ANDREW)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018
                                                                                                                                      Verified Petition for Permission to Practice in this Case Only by Attorney Not Admitted to the Bar of this Court. Fee Amount $250. VP Follow-up Date 10/11/2018 Filed by ANDREW R. MUEHLBAUER on behalf of CASS, INC., LARRY LEVINE, DENYSE MACMILLAN, NICO ALLOYS, INC., CHAL SULPRIZIO (MUEHLBAUER, ANDREW)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018
                                                                                                                                        Verified Petition for Permission to Practice in this Case Only by Attorney Not Admitted to the Bar of this Court. Fee Amount $250. VP Follow-up Date 10/11/2018 Filed by ANDREW R. MUEHLBAUER on behalf of CASS, INC., LARRY LEVINE, DENYSE MACMILLAN, NICO ALLOYS, INC., CHAL SULPRIZIO (MUEHLBAUER, ANDREW)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          (NONCONFORMING ENTRY) Involuntary Summons Issued On HOWARD MISLE Status Hearing to be held on 11/5/2018 at 01:30 PM at LEB-Courtroom 3, Foley Federal Bldg. (npc) Modified on 10/1/2018 to reflect docket entry change. See #5(Youngblood, CL). (Entered: 09/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: 9/25/2018 Involuntary Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                            Amended Involuntary Summons Issued On HOWARD MISLE Status Hearing to be held on 11/5/2018 at 01:30 PM at LEB-Courtroom 3, Foley Federal Bldg. (npc)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 Involuntary Summons Service Unexecuted
                                                                                                                                              Summons Not Executed on Howard Misle Filed by ANDREW R. MUEHLBAUER on behalf of CASS, INC., Larry Levine, Denyse MacMillan, Nico Alloys, Inc., Chal Sulprizio (MUEHLBAUER, ANDREW)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Receipt of Filing Fee for Involuntary Petition (Chapter 7)(18-15705) [misc,invol7] ( 335.00). Receipt number 18444399, fee amount $ 335.00.(re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 Involuntary Petition Chapter 7
                                                                                                                                                  Chapter 7 Involuntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $335. Re: Howard Misle Filed by Petitioning Creditor(s): CASS, INC. (attorney ANDREW R. MUEHLBAUER), Nico Alloys, Inc. (attorney ANDREW R. MUEHLBAUER), Chal Sulprizio (attorney ANDREW R. MUEHLBAUER), Larry Levine (attorney ANDREW R. MUEHLBAUER), Denyse MacMillan (attorney ANDREW R. MUEHLBAUER). (MUEHLBAUER, ANDREW)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Appeal Court Number Assigned
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Auto-docket of online payment
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/1/2018, Entered: None Appeal Court Number Assigned
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 243 times.

                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?