Yi v. SK Bakeries, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-05627

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 16, 2019 at 1:47 AM EDT (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Kyla Yi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ackermann & Tilajef PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated Craig Justin Ackermann +1 310 277 0614 +1 310 277 0635 cja@ackermanntilajef.com
individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated Brian Denlinger +1 253 507 4619 bd@ackermanntilajef.com

Toggle Switch Represented by India Lin Bodien Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY India Lin Bodien +1 253 212 7913 india@indialinbodienlaw.com
v.
No Logo Cinnabon Franchisor Spv LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CALFO EAKES & OSTROVSKY, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware limited liability company Angelo J Calfo +1 206 294 7440 +1 206 623 8717 angeloc@calfoeakes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware limited liability company Robert A Atkins +1 212 373 3183 +1 212 373 2225 ratkins@paulweiss.com
a Delaware limited liability company Adam Jacob Bernstein +1 212 373 3297 +1 212 492 0297 abernstein@paulweiss.com
a Delaware limited liability company Daniel J. Howley +1 202 223 7372 +1 202 223 7420 dhowley@paulweiss.com
No Logo Does 1 through 10, Defendant
No Logo SK Bakeries, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by ROBERTS JOHNS & HEMPHILL, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Washington limited liability company Michael K Hemphill +1 253 858 8606 mikeh@rjh-legal.com
a Washington limited liability company Michael W Johns +1 253 858 8606 +1 253 858 8646 mike@rjh-legal.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Joint Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Answer
        ANSWER to 1 Complaint by SK Bakeries, LLC.(Hemphill, Michael) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Answer
          ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Cinnabon Franchisor SPV, LLC.(Calfo, Angelo) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claimCourt Filing
            ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS, denying 25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 26 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: 11/2/2018 Reply to Response to motion
              REPLY, filed by Defendant SK Bakeries, LLC, TO RESPONSE to 25 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) (Hemphill, Michael)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: 11/2/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                REPLY, filed by Defendant Cinnabon Franchisor SPV, LLC, TO RESPONSE to 25 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) (Calfo, Angelo)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Proposed Order (Unsigned)
                  PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re 29 Response to 25 Motion, 28 Order,, Util - Set/Reset Motion Noting Date,, Set Deadlines, (Bodien, India) Modified on 11/5/2018 (GMR).
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Response to motion
                    RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Kyla Yi, to 26 MOTION for Joinder In 25 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), 25 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). Oral Argument Requested. (Bodien, India)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: 10/17/2018 Court Filing
                      ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO STAY DISCOVERY PENDING RULING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND RESETTING DEADLINES, re 27 Stipulation filed by Cinnabon Franchisor SPV, LLC. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/3/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/10/2018, Joint Status Report due 12/17/18. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 stipulation
                        STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on MTD by parties (Calfo, Angelo)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: 10/11/2018 Joinder
                          MOTION for Joinder In 25 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), filed by Defendant SK Bakeries, LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/2/2018, (Hemphill, Michael)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: 10/11/2018 Dismiss
                            MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), filed by Defendant Cinnabon Franchisor SPV, LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/2/2018, (Calfo, Angelo)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: 10/4/2018 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                              ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO STAY DISCOVERY PENDING RULING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS, denying 23 Motion. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                ORDER on the 18 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Robert A Atkins for Cinnabon Franchisor SPV, LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CMG) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: 10/3/2018 stipulation
                                  STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by parties (Calfo, Angelo) Modified on 10/4/2018 to change to Motion (JL) .
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    ORDER on the 17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Daniel J Howley for Cinnabon Franchisor SPV, LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CMG) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - Corporate Parent or Affiliate indicated by filer, but not added in CM/ECF. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Cinnabon Franchisor SPV, LLC (Calfo, Angelo)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        ORDER on the 16 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Adam J Bernstein for Cinnabon Franchisor SPV, LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CMG) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                          APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Robert A. Atkins FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Cinnabon Franchisor SPV, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5462790 (Calfo, Angelo)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                            APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Daniel J. Howley FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Cinnabon Franchisor SPV, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5462783 (Calfo, Angelo)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                              APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Adam J. Bernstein FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Cinnabon Franchisor SPV, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5462774 (Calfo, Angelo)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 8/31/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Craig J Ackerman Brian Walter Denlinger on behalf of Plaintiff Kyla Yi. (Denlinger, Brian) Modified on 9/12/2018: corrected the name of the attorney making the appearance. Document actually filed by another attorney in the firm. (CMG).
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 8/31/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian Walter Denlinger on behalf of Plaintiff Kyla Yi. (Denlinger, Brian)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 Order on Stipulated MotionCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting 11 Stipulated Motion. Answer due 10/22/18. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael K Hemphill on behalf of Defendant SK Bakeries, LLC. (Hemphill, Michael)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Stipulated Motion
                                                        Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time and Proposed Order, filed by Defendant Cinnabon Franchisor SPV, LLC. Noting Date 8/28/2018, (Calfo, Angelo)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/23/2018 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                          MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Bryan for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke no longer assigned to case. By Traci Whiteley, Deputy Clerk, for Clerk William M. McCool. (TW)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/23/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Angelo J Calfo on behalf of Defendant Cinnabon Franchisor SPV, LLC. (Calfo, Angelo)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: 8/20/2018 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint
                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on SK Bakeries, LLC on 8/16/2018, filed by Plaintiff Kyla Yi. (Bodien, India)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: 8/20/2018 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint
                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Cinnabon Franchisor SPV, LLC on 8/16/2018, filed by Plaintiff Kyla Yi. (Bodien, India)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: 8/7/2018 Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: 8/7/2018 Joint Status Report Order Form for Magistrate JudgesCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 11/5/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/22/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/29/2018, If declining consent, return the executed form by 10/5/2018. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: 8/7/2018
                                                                      NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 10/5/2018. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TW)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Notice to Filer
                                                                        NOTICE TO FILER re 1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency: Secondary Attorney Signatures ** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (CMG) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                          Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Cinnabon Franchisor SPV, LLC, and SK Bakeries, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 summons for SK Bakeries LLC)(CMG) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                            COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5422362), filed by Kyla Yi. (Attachments: # 1 Summons for Cinnabon Franchisor SPV, LLC, # 2 Summons for SK Bakeries, LLC, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bodien, India) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Attorney Craig Ackermann added for Kyla Yi per 15 Notice of Appearance filed by another attorney. (CMG)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Attorney Michael W Johns added for SK Bakeries, LLC per the 12 Notice of Appearance. (CMG)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                JSR due 11/5/2018. (JL)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  ***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** re 4 Consent Form. This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. (TW)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (CMG)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 13 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?