United States v. In the Matter of the Extradition of Traian Rostas
Federal Court Proceeding Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:18-mj-01123
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 4, 2018 at 5:00 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James D. Herbert +1 617 748 3100 +1 617 748 3963 James.Herbert@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo In the Matter of the Extradition of Traian Rostas, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by FEDERAL DEFENDERS OF THE MD GA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Cara McNamara +1 907 646 3400 +1 907 646 3480 cara_mcnamara@fd.org
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. ORDER as to In the Matter of the Extradition of Traian Rostas (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
    AFFIDAVIT of Consent and or waiver of Extradition by Traian Rostas. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None terminate hearingsCourt Filing
      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: Status Conference as to In the Matter of the Extradition of Traian Rostas held on 7/12/2018. The def't wishes to return to Monaco as soon as possible and wishes to waive extradition and not go through the state department. The court asks for some support this is the proper way to proceed. The court has the def't execute the waiver in open court this date and will take the procedural issue under advisement with the hope that it can be resolved quickly. Def't remanded to the custody of the USM. (Attorneys present: Herbert, McNamara. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. Interpreter name: Joaquin Font, Language: Spanish. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Notice of ReschedulingCourt Filing
        ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING (Time only) as to In the Matter of the Extradition of Traian Rostas: Status Conference set for 7/12/2018 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen) Modified on 7/12/2018 (Russo, Noreen). (Entered: 07/12/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Notice of ReschedulingCourt Filing
          ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING (TIME ONLY) as to In the Matter of the Extradition of Traian Rostas:Hearing set for 7/12/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Notice of hearingCourt Filing
            ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to In the Matter of the Extradition of Traian Rostas: Hearing set for 7/12/2018 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Status report
              STATUS REPORT Supplemental Joint Status Report by USA as to In the Matter of the Extradition of Traian Rostas (Attachments: # 1 Waiver of Extradition, # 2 Proposed Order)(Herbert, James) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                NOTICE of Filing of Declaration and Extradition Request by USA as to In the Matter of the Extradition of Traian Rostas (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration, Certification, Treaty, # 2 Exhibit Extradition Request)(Herbert, James) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Status report
                  STATUS REPORT (Joint) by USA as to In the Matter of the Extradition of Traian Rostas (Herbert, James) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None initial appearanceCourt Filing
                    Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: Initial Appearance as to In the Matter of the Extradition of Traian Rostas held on 6/21/2018. The court informs the def't of the nature of the extradition proceedings. The court will appoint FD McMara. The court requests the extradition paperwork from the gov't and requests that the parties file a status report by 6/29/18 as to the status and any request for an extradition hearing. Def't remanded to the custody of the USM. (Attorneys present: Herbert, McNamara. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Motion for Detention
                      MOTION for Detention and Memorandum of Extradition Law as to In the Matter of the Extradition of Traian Rostas by USA. (Herbert, James) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Notice of Hearing for Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING for Initial Appearance as to In the Matter of the Extradition of Traian Rostas. Initial Appearance set for 6/21/2018 at 01:45 PM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Unseal CaseCourt Filing
                          Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 6 Motion to Unseal Case as to In the Matter of the Extradition of Traian Rostas (1) (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Motion to Unseal Case
                            MOTION to Unseal Case as to In the Matter of the Extradition of Traian Rostas by USA. (Russo, Noreen) (Russo, Noreen). (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to In the Matter of the Extradition of Traian Rostas; Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Arrest Warrant Issued Court Filing
                                Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell as to In the Matter of the Extradition of Traian Rostas. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Sealed Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Complaint (Sealed)
                                  SEALED COMPLAINT as to In the Matter of the Extradition of Traian Rostas (1). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of James D. Herbert)(Alves-Baptista, Antonia) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Case +Court Filing
                                    Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 1 Motion to Seal Case as to In the Matter of the Extradition of Traian Rostas (1) (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Motion to Seal Case
                                      MOTION to Seal Case as to In the Matter of the Extradition of Traian Rostas by USA. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?