Charles Gilbert, Jr. v. ATF
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 18-1215

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 4, 2018 at 9:43 AM ST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 2240 - Real Property: Torts to Land
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Corrected BRIEF by Appellants Gilbert Indoor Range, LLC, Charles Richard Alsop Gilbert, Jr., Bryon Gossard, Indoor Range Operating Company, LLC and Burgandy Park Associates, LLC in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 07/10/2018. [1000327015] [18-1215] Athan Tsimpedes [Entered: 07/10/2018 04:07 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Docket correction requested from Athan Theodore Tsimpedes for Gilbert Indoor Range, LLC, Charles Richard Alsop Gilbert, Jr., Bryon Gossard, Burgandy Park Associates, LLC and Indoor Range Operating Company, LLC. [18-1215] AW [Entered: 07/05/2018 08:44 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ORDER filed [1000323984] granting Motion to extend filing time [26] Number of days granted: 25. administratively terminating Motion to file formal brief [26], administratively terminating Motion to file formal brief [21]; administratively terminating Motion for other relief [26]; administratively terminating Motion to extend filing time [1000309010-2. Response brief due 08/03/2018 Copies to all parties. [18-1215] AW [Entered: 07/05/2018 08:41 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        BRIEF by Appellants Burgandy Park Associates, LLC, Gilbert Indoor Range, LLC, Bryon Gossard, Indoor Range Operating Company, LLC and Charles Richard Alsop Gilbert, Jr. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 07/03/2018. [1000323861] [18-1215] Athan Tsimpedes [Entered: 07/03/2018 11:49 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Joint FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellants Burgandy Park Associates, LLC, Gilbert Indoor Range, LLC, Charles Richard Alsop Gilbert, Jr., Bryon Gossard and Indoor Range Operating Company, LLC. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 07/03/2018. [1000323860] [18-1215] Athan Tsimpedes [Entered: 07/03/2018 11:47 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION by Appellants Burgandy Park Associates, LLC, Gilbert Indoor Range, LLC, Charles Richard Alsop Gilbert, Jr., Bryon Gossard and Indoor Range Operating Company, LLC to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until July 3, 2018., file formal brief, to Rule 45 Compliance.. Date and method of service: 07/03/2018 ecf. [1000323859] [18-1215] Athan Tsimpedes [Entered: 07/03/2018 11:43 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Athan Theodore Tsimpedes for Gilbert Indoor Range, LLC, Charles Richard Alsop Gilbert, Jr., Bryon Gossard, Burgandy Park Associates, LLC and Indoor Range Operating Company, LLC re: failure to file brief and appendix Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. [18-1215] AW [Entered: 06/18/2018 07:28 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ORDER filed [1000312159] deferring action on Motion to extend filing time filed by Appellants Gilbert Indoor Range, LLC, Charles Richard Alsop Gilbert, Jr., Bryon Gossard, Burgandy Park Associates, LLC and Indoor Range Operating Company, LLC [23] Copies to all parties. [18-1215] DL [Entered: 06/14/2018 08:39 AM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION by Appellants Burgandy Park Associates, LLC, Gilbert Indoor Range, LLC, Charles Richard Alsop Gilbert, Jr., Bryon Gossard and Indoor Range Operating Company, LLC to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until June 12, 2018 for Appellants and Appellees Reply Brief is due on July 14, 2018.. Date and method of service: 06/08/2018 ecf. [1000309010] [18-1215] Athan Tsimpedes [Entered: 06/08/2018 07:44 AM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ORDER filed [1000305762] granting Motion to extend filing time [21] Number of days granted: 7. Opening brief and appendix due 06/08/2018. Response brief due 07/09/2018 Copies to all parties. [18-1215] AW [Entered: 06/04/2018 07:03 AM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION by Appellants Burgandy Park Associates, LLC, Gilbert Indoor Range, LLC, Charles Richard Alsop Gilbert, Jr., Bryon Gossard and Indoor Range Operating Company, LLC to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until Appellants due date for opening brief and appendix is 6/1/18 and Appellees Reply due date is 7/10/18., file formal brief. Date and method of service: 06/01/2018 ecf. [1000305380] [18-1215] Athan Tsimpedes [Entered: 06/01/2018 10:49 AM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        ORDER filed [1000298390] granting Motion to extend filing time [19] Number of days granted: 11. Opening brief and appendix due 06/01/2018. Response brief due 07/02/2018; administratively terminating Motion to file formal brief [19] Copies to all parties. [18-1215] AW [Entered: 05/22/2018 07:41 AM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION by Appellants Burgandy Park Associates, LLC, Gilbert Indoor Range, LLC, Charles Richard Alsop Gilbert, Jr., Bryon Gossard and Indoor Range Operating Company, LLC to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until Appellants brief and joint appendix due on June 1, 2018 and Appellees Reply due on July 2, 2018., file formal brief. Date and method of service: 05/21/2018 ecf. [1000298340] [18-1215] Athan Tsimpedes [Entered: 05/21/2018 10:12 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            ORDER filed [1000294573] granting Motion to extend filing time [17] Number of days granted: 3. administratively terminating Motion to file formal brief [17]. Opening brief and appendix due 05/21/2018. Response brief due 06/21/2018 Copies to all parties. [18-1215] AW [Entered: 05/15/2018 10:48 AM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              MOTION by Appellants Burgandy Park Associates, LLC, Charles Richard Alsop Gilbert, Jr., Bryon Gossard and Indoor Range Operating Company, LLC to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until May 21, 2018 for Appellants and June 20, 2018 for Appellees., file formal brief. Date and method of service: 05/15/2018 ecf. [1000294552] [18-1215] Athan Tsimpedes [Entered: 05/15/2018 10:33 AM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                ORDER filed [1000294494] granting Motion to extend filing time [15] Number of days granted: 4., administratively terminating Motion to file formal brief [15]. Opening brief and appendix due 05/18/2018. Response brief due 06/18/2018 Copies to all parties. [18-1215] AW [Entered: 05/15/2018 09:58 AM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?