Pham v. Chase Bank USA NA
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arkansas Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-00005-JMM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 5, 2018 at 9:04 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER finding that Chase Bank is entitled to reasonable attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $5,000. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/20/08. (bkp)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    JUDGMENT re 33 Order dismissing plaintiff's claims against deft with prejudice and confirming the Arbitration Award of $16,402.87. Signed by Judge James M Moody on 1/7/08. (bkp)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER granting 29 deft's Motion for Summary Judgment and for Confirmation of the Arbitration Award; denying pltf's 22 Motion to Dismiss and directing deft to submit a fee application for attorney's fees for consideration by the Court. Signed by Judge James M Moody on 1/7/08. (bkp)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER withdrawing 23 Order on Motion to Dismiss and directing the Clerk to reopen the case and reinstate any pending motions. Defendant is given 11 days from the date of this Order to file a response to plaintiff's motion. Signed by Judge James M Moody on 12/5/07. (bkp)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER granting 22 plaintiff's voluntary Motion to Dismiss and dismissing complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M Moody on 12/5/07. (bkp) THIS ORDER WITHDRAWN BY ORDER DATED 12/5/07. Modified on 12/5/2007 (bkp).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER granting 14 Motion to Compel and directing plaintiff to respond to Interrogatories and to make his initial disclosures on or before October 26, 2007, and extending ddl for the limited purpose of deposing pltf up to and including November 26, 2007. Dispositive motions are due by December 17, 2007, with any response due by December 28, 2008; pretrial disclosure sheets are due on January 7, 2008. Signed by Judge James M Moody on 10/17/07. (bkp)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 0 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?