Warsco, Trustee v. OneMain Financial Services, Inc.
Bankruptcy Case Indiana Northern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 18-01042

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 5, 2018 at 10:05 AM ST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mark A. Warsco, Trustee, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rothberg Logan & Warsco LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Warsco +1 260 422 9454 +1 260 422 1622 bshanebrook@rlwlawfirm.com
v.
No Logo OneMain Financial Services, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Brooks J. Grainger

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brooks J. Grainger +1 574 272 1000 +1 574 272 4303 bankruptcy@krisorlaw.com
No Logo Nancy J. Gargula, U.S. Trustee
Nature of Suit -
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Extend Time
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Extend Time
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None response
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            BNC Certificate of Mailing.(related document(s)9 Order on Motion to Extend Time). Notice Date 07/08/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Extend Time
              Order Denying Motion to Extend Time (Related Doc # 5). (csd) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                Notice of Appearance Amended by Brooks J. Grainger Filed by Defendant OneMain Financial Services, Inc. (Grainger, Brooks) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Proposed Order Filed by Defendant OneMain Financial Services, Inc. (Grainger, Brooks) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                    Notice of Appearance by Brooks J. Grainger Filed by Defendant OneMain Financial Services, Inc. (Grainger, Brooks) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Extend Time
                      Motion to Extend Time Filed by Defendant OneMain Financial Services, Inc. Objections to Motion due by 7/19/2018. (Grainger, Brooks) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Certificate of Service of Summons on OneMain Financial Services, Inc. 6/22/2018 by Certified U.S. Mail addressed to an officer for the Defendant. (Warsco, Mark) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Certificate of Service of Summons on OneMain Financial Services, Inc. 6/22/2018 by Certified U.S. Mail, addressed to the Registered Agent for the Defendant. (Warsco, Mark) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Summons Issued on OneMain Financial Services, Inc. Date Issued 6/21/2018, Answer Due 7/23/2018. (jll) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Adversary case 18-01042. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Mark A. Warsco, Trustee against OneMain Financial Services, Inc.. Receipt Number OC, Fee Amount $350. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, B and C) (Warsco, Mark) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?