Garcia et al v. SolarCity Corp. et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Mateo, Case No. 18CIV03640

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Tesla, Inc.

This docket is featured in the January 7, 2020 article Reality Check: Tesla, Inc..

Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Fernando Garcia, Plaintiff
No Logo Rejino Navarro, Plaintiff
v.
SolarCity Corporation SolarCity Corporation, Defendant
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018
Case Management Conference
    Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: 11/6/2018
    Case Management Statement
      Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: 10/31/2018
      Case Management Statement
        Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018
        Answer (Unlimited)
          Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: 8/1/2018
          Proof of Service on CORPORATION, LLC, etc.
            Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: 7/16/2018
            Civil Case Cover Sheet
              Blank 5 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018
              Cause Of Action
                Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018
                Notice of Case Management Conference
                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018
                  Summons Issued / Filed
                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018
                    Complaint
                      Blank 1 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018
                      New Filed Case

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 134 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?