Michael Lait v. Medical Data Systems, Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit, Case No. 18-12255

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 5, 2018 at 3:19 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11010212415 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Appendix filed [1 VOLUMES] by Appellant Michael Lait. (ECF: David McDevitt)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11010204332 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION to correct or amend brief filed by Michael Lait. Motion is Unopposed. [8516160-1] (ECF: David McDevitt)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11010202345 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Appellant's brief filed by Michael Lait. (ECF: David McDevitt)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11010195545 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney David Neal McDevitt for Appellant Michael Lait.
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11010195532 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ORDER: Motion for Leave to File Civil Appeal Statement Out of Time filed by Appellant Michael Lait is GRANTED by clerk. [8489125-2]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11010162107 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Michael Lait. The appellant's brief is due on or before 07/05/2018. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief.
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11010162029 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Appellate fee was paid on 06/04/2018 as to Appellant Michael Lait.
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11010161852 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Ryan James Hebson for Appellee Medical Data Systems, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Ryan Hebson)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11010158200 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION for leave to file Civil Appeal Statement out of time filed by Michael Lait. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [8489125-1] (ECF: David McDevitt)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11010126886 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Michael Lait on 05/25/2018. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/08/2018 as to Appellant Michael Lait. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/22/2018 as to Appellee Medical Data Systems, Inc.
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 12 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?