Twohig v. God
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-04194

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 20, 2019 at 11:29 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Joshua A Twohig, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua A Twohig
v.
No Logo God, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: 11/15/2018 Judgment - FinalCourt Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT. This action is dismissed with prejudice. Case terminated on 11/15/2018. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: 11/15/2018 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 2 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, dismissing 1 Complaint. Email sent to Manager of Three Strikes List. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018 Certified Mail Receipt Returned
      Certified Mail Receipt Returned, executed on 11/8/2018 re: 4 Document(s) Sent - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (JenniferLongoria, 1) (Main Document 5 replaced on 11/14/2018) (JenniferLongoria, 1).
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: 11/5/2018 Notice to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening (FORM, noticing)
        NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (rnieto, 1)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
            MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Joshua A Twohig, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/21/2018. (rnieto, 1) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights
                Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against God (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Joshua A Twohig. (rnieto, 1) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 3 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?