Gadzooks Network IPO v. Gadzoox Networks
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-05039
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 5, 2018 at 6:04 PM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Adeline P. Murphy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Eric Cooper, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Nadeem Faruqi +1 212 983 9330 +1 212 983 9331 nfaruqi@faruqilaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SEEGER WEISS LP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY David R. Buchanan +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 DBuchanan@SeegerWeiss.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen A. Weiss +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 sweiss@seegerweiss.com
No Logo Gabriel T. Forrest, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY MICHAEL S. EGAN +1 201 592 3201
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Linda N. Parsons, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Stanley Haiduk, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY MICHAEL S. EGAN +1 201 592 3201
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
v.
No Logo Alistair Black, Defendant
No Logo Bancboston Robertson Stephens Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bill Sickler, Defendant
No Logo Christine E. Munson, Defendant
Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Gadzoox Networks, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hambrecht and Quist, Defendant
No Logo Robertson Stephens, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Brendan Joseph Dowd +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 bdowd@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Jay Frackman +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 afrackman@omm.com
No Logo Bank of America Securities, LLC, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Bear Stearns & Co Inc., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Chase Securities Inc., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo CIBC World Markets, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Dain Rauscher Inc., Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stewart David Aaron +1 212 715 1000
No Logo DB Alex. Brown, Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Joel M. Mitnick +1 212 839 5300 +1 212 839 5599 jmitnick@sidley.com
No Logo Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Douglas W. Henkin +1 212 408 2520 +1 212 259 2520 douglas.henkin@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY David B. Gordon +1 917 546 7701 +1 917 546 7671 dbg@msk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Joel M. Mitnick +1 212 839 5300 +1 212 839 5599 jmitnick@sidley.com
No Logo Fleetboston Robertson Stephens Inc., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Goldman Sachs & Co., Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Gandolfo V. Diblasi +1 212 558 4992 +5583 558 558 3588 diblasig@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY John Louis Hardiman +1 212 558 4070 +1 212 558 3588 hardimanj@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY David Maxwell James Rein +1 212 558 3035 +1 212 558 3588 reind@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Penny Shane +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 shanep@sullcrom.com
No Logo J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph M. McLaughlin +1 212 455 2000 jmclaughlin@stblaw.com
Lehman Brothers, Inc. Lehman Brothers, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
Unknown Role, Lehman Abs Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Debra Lee Bogo-Ernst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Emanuel Tauber +1 202 263 3324 +1 202 263 5324 atauber@mayerbrown.com
No Logo Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Morgan Keegan & Co., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Morgan Stanley Dean Witter & Co., Inc., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Robert Fleming Inc., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Salomon Smith Barney, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Dominic Cottrill, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Herbert Black, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Edward G Schloss Law Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Victor E. Stewart +1 201 445 3661 +1 201 445 5301 victornj@ix.netcom.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Christopher J. Gray, P.C

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher J. Gray +1 212 838 3221 +1 212 508 3695 gray@cjgraylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovell Stewart Halebian Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher Lovell +1 212 608 1900 +1 212 719 4677 clovell@lshllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sirota & Sirota, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Saul Roffe +1 609 791 7007 +1 609 896 9060 saul@sirotalaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Howard Barry Sirota +1 212 425 9055 +1 212 425 9055 howard.sirota@gmail.com
No Logo Joe Goldgrab, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Leon J. Roomberg, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Simon Katz, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Steven Lin, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY MICHAEL S. EGAN +1 201 592 3201
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT settling action. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/24/09) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ANSWER to Second Corrected Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. Related document: 29 Amended Complaint filed by Gabriel T. Forrest, Stanley Haiduk, Linda N. Parsons, Adeline P. Murphy.(sac, ) (Entered: 03/29/2004)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ANSWER by Deutsche Bank Sec., DB Alex. Brown to [29-1] second amended complaint. (Attorney Joel M. Mitnick from the Sidley, Austin, Brown & Wood, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 09/16/2003)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ANSWER by Robertson Stephens to [29-1] second corrected amended complaint. (Attorney Brendan Joseph Dowd from the O'Melveny & Myers, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 7:27 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ANSWER by J.P. Morgan Sec. to [29-1] second corrected amended complaint. (Attorney Joseph M. McLaughlin from the Simpson, Thacher & Bartlett, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 6:43 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/13/2003)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ANSWER by Dain Rauscher, Inc. to [29-1] second amended complaint. (Attorney Andrew J. Frackman from the Firm: Dorsey & Whitney, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/18/03 at 5:43 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 07/23/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE of Firm Registration as an LLP and Name Change by Lehman Brothers, Inc. (sac) (Entered: 04/07/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE of REGISTRATION AND FIRM NAME CHANGE by Goldman Sachs & Co. Re: Sullivan & Cromwell LLP. (jw) (Entered: 03/06/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  SECOND CORRECTED CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT by Gabriel T. Forrest, Stanley Haiduk, Linda N. Parsons, Adeline P. Murphy amending [1-1] complaint. Summons issued. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/11/02 at 7:41 p.m.) (sac) (Entered: 07/29/2002)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ERRATA to consolidated amended class action complaint for violations of The Federal Securities Laws by Gabriel T. Forrest, Stanley Haiduk, Linda N. Parsons, Adeline P. Murphy by adding & striking paragraphs. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/11/02 at 7:41 p.m.) (sac) (Entered: 07/29/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      CORRECTED CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT by Gabriel T. Forrest, Stanley Haiduk, Linda N. Parsons, Adeline P. Murphy amending [25-1] amended complaint ; Summons issued. (sac) (Entered: 07/18/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        ERRATA to consolidated amended class action complaint for violations of the Federal Securities Laws by Gabriel T. Forrest, Stanley Haiduk, Linda N. Parsons, Adeline P. Murphy to strike paragraphs 5,12 in the amended complaint. (sac) (Entered: 07/18/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          AMENDED COMPLAINT by Gabriel T. Forrest, Stanley Haiduk, Linda N. Parsons, Adeline P. Murphy amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (ac) (Entered: 06/18/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/9/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            AMENDED RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Goldman Sachs & Co. (sac) (Entered: 02/13/2002)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Robertson Stephens. (sac) (Entered: 02/07/2002)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                REVISED LIST OF CASES BY COUNSEL; purs. to Item I(A) of this Court's Order dated 8/8/01, Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP and Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP to appear as counsel for Deutsche Banc Alex. Brown, Inc. (sac) (Entered: 02/04/2002)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Bank of America. (sac) (Entered: 01/24/2002)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Goldman Sachs & Co. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by J.P. Morgan Chase, J.P. Morgan & Co., J.P. Morgan, Robert Fleming, Inc. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Morgan Stanley Dean. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Credit Suisse First. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by CIBC World Markets. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Royal Bank of Canada. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Eric Cooper. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Salomon Smith. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Lehman Brothers, Inc. (Rec'd in night deposit box on 9/6/01 9:17 p.m.) (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER, that all cases against Gadzoox in this IPO Securities Litigation, as set forth in the attached Rider (1:01-cv-5127, 1:01-cv-5141, 1:01-cv-5798, 1:01-cv-6119, 1:01-cv-7051) shall be consolidated into case number 01 Civ. 5039. The Clerk of the Court is ordered to consolidate any future cases filed against Gadzoox subsequent to the date of this Order into lead case number 01 Civ. 5039. The Clerk of the Court is further ordered to close all cases that have been consolidated, subject to re-opening at a later date on proper application by a party. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (sac) (Entered: 09/26/2001)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Gabriel T. Forrest, Stanley Haiduk, Steven Lin IN FURTHER SUPPORT re: [5-1] motion to consolidate cases 01cv5039(SAS), 01cv5127, 01cv5141, 01cv5798 and 01cv6119, [5-2] motion appointing them as Lead Plaintiff, [5-3] motion approving their selection of the law firm of Milberg, Weiss, Bershad, Hynes & Lerach, LLP and Bernstein, Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP to serve as Lead Counsel, and IN OPPOSITION re: [8-1] motion to consolidate cases 01cv5039(SAS), 01cv5127, 01cv5141, 01cv6119 and 01cv7050, [8-2] motion appointing class member Herbert Black to serve as lead plaintiff, [8-3] motion appointing Lovell & Stewart, LLP and Sirota & Sirota, LLP as co-lead counsel for the class. [Original filed in 01cv5039(SAS) as Doc# 10 and docketed to 01cv5127, 01cv5141, 01cv5798 and 01cv6119.] (dcap) Modified on 08/27/2001 (Entered: 08/27/2001)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Herbert Black in support of [8-1] motion to consolidate cases 01cv5039(SAS), 01cv5127, 01cv5141, 01cv6119 and 01cv7050, [8-2] motion appointing class member Herbert Black to serve as lead plaintiff, [8-3] motion appointing Lovell & Stewart, LLP and Sirota & Sirota, LLP as co-lead counsel for the class. (Received in Night Box on 8/6/01 at 11:40pm) [Original filed in 01cv5039(SAS) as Doc# 9 and docketed to 01cv5127, 01cv5141, 01cv6119 and 01cv7050.] (dcap) (Entered: 08/20/2001)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) by Herbert Black to consolidate cases 01cv5039(SAS), 01cv5127, 01cv5141, 01cv6119 and 01cv7050, appointing class member Herbert Black to serve as lead plaintiff and appointing Lovell & Stewart, LLP and Sirota & Sirota, LLP as co-lead counsel for the class . No return date indicated. Supporting affidavit of Christopher J. Gray attached. (Received in Night Box on 8/6/01 at 11:40pm) [Original filed in 01cv5039(SAS) as Doc# 8 and docketed to 01cv 5127, 01cv5141, 01cv6119 and 01cv7050.] (dcap) (Entered: 08/20/2001)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Gabriel T. Forrest, Stanley Haiduk, Steven Lin in support of [5-1] motion to consolidate cases 01cv5039(SAS), 01cv5127, 01cv5141, 01cv5798 and 01cv6119, [5-2] motion appointing them as Lead Plaintiff, [5-3] motion approving their selection of the law firm of Milberg, Weiss, Bershad, Hynes & Lerach, LLP and Bernstein, Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP to serve as Lead Counsel. (Received in Night Box on 8/6/01 at 10:36pm) [Original filed in 01cv5039(SAS) as Doc# 7 and docketed to 01cv5127, 01cv5141, 01cv5798 and 01cv6119.] (dcap) (Entered: 08/20/2001)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                DECLARATION of Samuel H. Rudman by Gabriel T. Forrest, Stanley Haiduk, Steven Lin in support Re: [5-1] motion to consolidate cases 01cv5039(SAS), 01cv5127, 01cv5141, 01cv5798 and 01cv6119, [5-2] motion appointing them as Lead Plaintiff, [5-3] motion approving their selection of the law firm of Milberg, Weiss, Bershad, Hynes & Lerach, LLP and Bernstein, Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP to serve as Lead Counsel. (Received in Night Box on 8/6/01 at 10:36pm) [Original filed in 01cv5039(SAS) as Doc# 6 and docketed to 01cv5127, 01cv5141, 01cv5798 and 01cv6119.] (dcap) (Entered: 08/20/2001)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/2/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) by Gabriel T. Forrest, Stanley Haiduk, Steven Lin to consolidate cases 01cv5039(SAS), 01cv5127, 01cv5141, 01cv5798 and 01cv6119, appointing them as Lead Plaintiff and approving their selection of the law firm of Milberg, Weiss, Bershad, Hynes & Lerach, LLP and Bernstein, Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP to serve as Lead Counsel . No return date indicated. (Received in Night Box on 8/2/01 at 10:36pm) [Original filed in 01cv5039(SAS) as Doc# 5 and docketed in 01cv5127, 01cv5141, 01cv5798 and 01cv6119.] (dcap) Modified on 08/27/2001 (Entered: 08/20/2001)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Copy of notice mailed to Attorney(s) of record. Pursuant to the Order of Chief Judge Mukasey dated August 8, 2001, the above entitled action is reassinged to the calendar of Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for inclusion in the coordinated pretrial proceedings being conducted by that judge. Two originals of all future documents submitted in this action are to be presented in the Clerk's Office for filing. One original is to be filed in this docket number and one original is to be filed in the miscellaneous case number 21mc92 (SAS). Each shall bear the original assigned judge's ( ) initials after the original docket number. Attached is a copy of Judge Mukasey's ORDER re: coordinating the proceedings before Judge Scheindlin. Also attached is a copy of Judge Scheindlin's ORDER re: set initial PTC 09/07/01 and directing all counsel to comply with Judge Scheindlin's requirements. [Original Orders docketed in 21mc92 (SAS) as documents numbers 1 and 2] (dcap) Modified on 10/31/2001 (Entered: 08/10/2001)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      STIPULATION and ORDER, that the time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action is extended through and including the later of sixty (60) days after the (i) the assignment of lead plaintiffs' counsel; or (ii) the filing of an amended complaint in this action . ( signed by Judge Richard Owen ) (tp) (Entered: 08/02/2001)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Gadzoox Networks, Bill Sickler, Christine E. Munson, Alistair Black. (sac) (Entered: 07/12/2001)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 407913. (db) (Entered: 06/07/2001)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 11 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?