Dr. Koop.com Inc IPO v. Drkoop.com, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-06242
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 6, 2018 at 6:00 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Glenn S. Davis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Safirstein Metcalf LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY PETER GEORGE SAFIRSTEIN +1 212 201 2845 +1 212 201 2858 psafirstein@safirsteinmetcalf.com
No Logo Ned P. Brafford, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Safirstein Metcalf LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY PETER GEORGE SAFIRSTEIN +1 212 201 2845 +1 212 201 2858 psafirstein@safirsteinmetcalf.com
No Logo Raisa Gertsberg, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Flexer, Akiva

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Tzivia Brody +1 212 687 7230

Toggle Switch Represented by Safirstein Metcalf LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY PETER GEORGE SAFIRSTEIN +1 212 201 2845 +1 212 201 2858 psafirstein@safirsteinmetcalf.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strull Strull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WeissLaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph Harry Weiss +1 212 682 3025 +1 212 682 3010 jweiss@weisslawllp.com
No Logo Richard A. Brafford, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Safirstein Metcalf LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY PETER GEORGE SAFIRSTEIN +1 212 201 2845 +1 212 201 2858 psafirstein@safirsteinmetcalf.com
No Logo Zachary Maragoudakis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Safirstein Metcalf LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY PETER GEORGE SAFIRSTEIN +1 212 201 2845 +1 212 201 2858 psafirstein@safirsteinmetcalf.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strull Strull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com
v.
No Logo Bancboston Robertson Stephens Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bear Stearns & Co Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY RANDY MICHAEL MASTRO +1 212 351 4000 +1 212 351 5219 rmastro@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Donald W. Hackett, Defendant
No Logo Drkoop.com, Inc., Defendant
No Logo G. Carl Everett, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Hambrecht & Quist, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey C. Ballowe, Defendant
No Logo John F. Zaccaro, Defendant
No Logo M.D. C. Everett Koop, Defendant
No Logo M.D. Nancy L. Snyderman, Defendant
No Logo Mardian J. Blair, Defendant
No Logo Richard D. Helppie, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Robertson Stephens, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Brendan Joseph Dowd +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 bdowd@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Jay Frackman +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 afrackman@omm.com
No Logo Susan M. Georgen-Saad, Defendant
No Logo Bt Alex. Brown Inc., Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Joel M. Mitnick +1 212 839 5300 +1 212 839 5599 jmitnick@sidley.com
No Logo Banc of America Securities LLP, Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Brendan Joseph Dowd +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 bdowd@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Jay Frackman +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 afrackman@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Jeehae Jennifer Koh +1 212 326 2194 +1 212 326 2061 jkoh@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Matthew Joseph Merrick +1 212 326 4450 +1 212 326 2061 mmerrick@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 02/15/2005 Jonathan D. Polkes +1 212 504 6021 +1 212 504 6666 jonathan.polkes@weil.com
No Logo Deutsche Banc Alex. Brown, Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Joel M. Mitnick +1 212 839 5300 +1 212 839 5599 jmitnick@sidley.com
No Logo Fleetboston Robertson Stephens Inc., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Goldman, Sachs & Co., Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Gandolfo V. Diblasi +1 212 558 4992 +5583 558 558 3588 diblasig@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY John Louis Hardiman +1 212 558 4070 +1 212 558 3588 hardimanj@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY David Maxwell James Rein +1 212 558 3035 +1 212 558 3588 reind@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Penny Shane +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 shanep@sullcrom.com
No Logo J.P. Morgan Sec., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Louis Scalpati, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc, Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Mark Holland +1 212 813 8800 +1 212 355 3333 mholland@goodwinlaw.com
No Logo Glenn Davis, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strull Strull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com
No Logo Jack Schwartz, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strull Strull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com
No Logo Jimmy Chin, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Gustavo Fabian Bruckner +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 gfBruckner@pomlaw.com
No Logo Ned Brafford, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strull Strull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com
No Logo Richard Brafford, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strull Strull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com
No Logo Stourbridge Investments Ltd., Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com
No Logo Michael Atlas, Intervenor Plaintiff
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT settling ation. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/24/09) (dt) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ANSWER by Goldman, Sachs & Co. to [19-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Penny Shane from the Firm: Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 09/19/2003)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ANSWER by Deutsche Banc Alex., B.T. Alex Brown, Inc to [19-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Joel M. Mitnick from the Sidley, Austin, Brown & Wood, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 09/19/2003)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ANSWER by Merrill Lynch to [19-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Mark Holland from the Firm: Clifford Chance US, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 09/16/2003)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ANSWER by Robertson Stephens to [19-1] corrected amended complaint. (Attorney Brendan Joseph Dowd from the O'Melveny & Myers, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 7:12 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/21/2003)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ANSWER by J.P. Morgan Sec. to [19-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Joseph M. McLaughlin from the Simpson, Thacher & Bartlett, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 6:32 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/12/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ANSWER by Bear, Stearns & Co. to [19-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Randy Mastro from the Firm: Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 08/06/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ANSWER by Banc of America to [19-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Andrew J. Frackman from the Firm: Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 07/25/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTY AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; substituting Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft (Jonathan D. Polkes appearing) in place of Brobeck, Phleger & Harrison LLP (Kenneth J. King appearing) as attys for deft Banc of America Securities LLC in this action. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (sac) (Entered: 03/31/2003)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE of REGISTRATION AND FIRM NAME CHANGE by Goldman, Sachs & Co. Re: Sullivan & Cromwell LLP. (jw) (Entered: 03/06/2003)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE OF JOINDER of plaintiffs Raisa Gertsberg, Zachary Maragoudakis, Richard A. Brafford, Glenn S. Davis, Ned P. Brafford, purs. to FRCP 20. (sac) (Entered: 08/22/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        CORRECTED CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT by Jack Schwartz amending [15-1] amended complaint ; Summons issued. (sac) (Entered: 07/18/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ERRATA to consolidated amended class action complaint for violations of the Federal Securities Laws by Jack Schwartz for striking & adding paragraphs as set forth in this document. (sac) (Entered: 07/18/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Bear, Stearns & Co. by Roy G. Locke, Jr., V.P., on 4/23/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/17/2002)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Banc of America by John Mahoney, atty, on 4/24/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/17/2002)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                AMENDED COMPLAINT by Jack Schwartz amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (ac) (Entered: 06/24/2002)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Robertson Stephens. (sac) (Entered: 02/06/2002)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Banc of America. (sac) (Entered: 01/24/2002)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Hambrecht & Quist. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Hambrecht & Quist. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            DECLARATION of Aaron Brody by Ned Brafford, Richard Brafford, Glenn Davis, Zachary Maragoudakis, Jack Schwartz in support Re: [7-1] motion to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-06242, 1:01-cv-06875 and 1:01-cv-06871, [7-2] motion to appoint Ned Brafford, Richard Brafford, Glenn Davis, Zachary Maragoudakis and Jack Schwartz as lead plaintiffs, [7-3] motion to approve Ned Brafford, Richard Brafford, Glenn Davis, Zachary Maragoudakis and Jack Schwartz selection of Stull, Stull & Brody as lead counsel. [Received in the Night Deposit Box on 09-10-01 at 11:10 P.M.] (dcap) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ned Brafford, Richard Brafford, Glenn Davis, Zachary Maragoudakis, Jack Schwartz in support of [7-1] motion to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-06242, 1:01-cv-06875 and 1:01-cv-06871, [7-2] motion to appoint Ned Brafford, Richard Brafford, Glenn Davis, Zachary Maragoudakis and Jack Schwartz as lead plaintiffs, [7-3] motion to approve Ned Brafford, Richard Brafford, Glenn Davis, Zachary Maragoudakis and Jack Schwartz selection of Stull, Stull & Brody as lead counsel. [Received in the Night Deposit Box on 09-10-01 at 11:10 P.M.] (dcap) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE OF MOTION by Ned Brafford, Richard Brafford, Glenn Davis, Zachary Maragoudakis, Jack Schwartz to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-06242, 1:01-cv-06875 and 1:01-cv-06871, and to appoint Ned Brafford, Richard Brafford, Glenn Davis, Zachary Maragoudakis and Jack Schwartz as lead plaintiffs, and to approve Ned Brafford, Richard Brafford, Glenn Davis, Zachary Maragoudakis and Jack Schwartz selection of Stull, Stull & Brody as lead counsel . No Return Date. [Received in the Night Deposit Box on 09-10-01 at 11:10 P.M.] (dcap) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Bank of America Securities, LLC. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Deutsche Banc Alex. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER,... that all cases involving Drkoop in this IPO Securities Litigation, as set forth in the attached Rider (1:01-cv-06871 and 1:01-cv-06875), shall be consolidated into case number 01 Civ. 6242. The Clerk of Court is hereby ordered to consolidate any future cases that are designated as related to 01 Civ. 6242,... the Clerk of Court is further ordered to close all cases that have been consolidated, subject to re-opening at a late date on proper application by a party ... ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. [Original filed in 1:01-cv-06242 Document No. 4. Document Docketed in 1:01-cv-06871; 1::01-cv-06875] (dcap) (Entered: 10/02/2001)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Copy of notice mailed to Attorney(s) of record. Pursuant to the Order of Chief Judge Mukasey dated August 8, 2001, the above entitled action is reassigned to the calendar of Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for inclusion in the coordinated pretrial proceedings being conducted by that judge. Two originals of all future documents submitted in this action are to be presented in the Clerk's Office for filing. One original is to be filed in this docket number and one original is to be filed in the miscellaneous case number 21mc92 (SAS). Each shall bear the original assigned judge's ( ) initials after the original docket number. Attached is a copy of Judge Mukasey's ORDER re: coordinating the proceedings before Judge Scheindlin. Also attached is a copy of Judge Scheindlin's ORDER re: set initial PTC 09/07/01 and directing all counsel to comply with Judge Scheindlin's requirements. [Original Orders docketed in 21mc92 (SAS) as documents numbers 1 and 2] (dcap) (Entered: 08/10/2001)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Raisa Gertsberg. (db) (Entered: 07/12/2001)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 411278. (db) (Entered: 07/12/2001)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?